Babcock v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Chad Ashley Babcock
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv01110
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Benderson, Heather)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Within ninety (90) days from filing the entry of appearance, the Acting Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of Social Security proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/9/2021. (nms)
August 5, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edward A. Wicklund for Chad Ashley Babcock added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2021. (nms)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward A. Wicklund, filed by Chad Ashley Babcock. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2021. (nms)
August 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward A. Wicklund - filed by Chad Ashley Babcock. (Linarducci, Gary)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed against Kilolo Kijakazi, Social Security Administration - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (No Fee Paid, IFP Provided)- filed by Chad Ashley Babcock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Chad Ashley Babcock. (myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babcock v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Ashley Babcock
Represented By: Gary C. Linarducci
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?