WSOU Investments, LLC v. Netgear, Inc.
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments, LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01119
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file its answering brief to November 9, 2021, to and for Defendant to file its reply brief to November 30, 2021 (Set Briefing Schedule: re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 35 U.S.C. 101 - Answering Brief due 11/9/2021. Reply Brief due 11/30/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/28/2021. (dlw)
September 27, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to file its answering brief to November 9, 2021, to and for Defendant to file its reply brief to November 30, 2021 - filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. (Lennon, James)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed, coordinated order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/27/2021. (dlw)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amr O. Aly, Yusuf Esat, Lisa M. Schoedel and Mitchell L. Denti filed by Netgear, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/27/2021. (dlw)
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amr O. Aly, Yusuf Esat, Lisa M. Schoedel and Mitchell L. Denti - filed by Netgear, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Netgear, Inc. filed by Netgear, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Netgear, Inc. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/8/2021. (Ying, Jennifer) Modified on 9/27/2021 (dlw).
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 35 U.S.C. 101 - filed by Netgear, Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) Modified on 9/27/2021 (dlw).
August 11, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Shelley Ivan for WSOU Investments, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
August 10, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John W. Downing for WSOU Investments, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01120-MN, 1:21-cv-01117-MN, 1:21-cv-01119-MN(srs).
August 10, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jack Shaw for WSOU Investments, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01120-MN, 1:21-cv-01117-MN, 1:21-cv-01119-MN(srs).
August 10, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Heather S. Kim for WSOU Investments, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
August 10, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Marcus A. Barber, Paul G. Williams, ThucMinh Nguyen for WSOU Investments, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
August 10, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Darcy L. Jones for WSOU Investments, LLC, added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01117-MN, 1:21-cv-01119-MN, 1:21-cv-01120-MN(myr)
August 10, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jonathan K. Waldrop for WSOU Investments, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re (8 in 1:21-cv-01120-MN, 8 in 1:21-cv-01117-MN, 8 in 1:21-cv-01119-MN) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 24, 2021. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/9/2021. (dlw)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 24, 2021 - filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. (Lennon, James)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WSOU Investments, LLC. Netgear, Inc. served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. (Lennon, James)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan K. Waldrop, Darcy L. Jones, Marcus A. Barber, John W. Downing, Heather S. Kim, ThucMinh Nguyen, Jack Shaw, Paul G. Williams, and Shelley Ivan filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/5/2021. (dlw)
August 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01117-MN, 1:21-cv-01119-MN, 1:21-cv-01120-MN (rjb)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan K. Waldrop, Darcy L. Jones, Marcus A. Barber, John W. Downing, Heather S. Kim, ThucMinh Nguyen, Jack Shaw, Paul G. Williams, and Shelley Ivan - filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. (Lennon, James)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Netgear, Inc. on 8/2/2021. (myr)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. (myr)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,338,171 B2. (myr)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Netgear, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3669506.) - filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D (part 1 of 2), #7 Exhibit D (part 2 of 2), #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WSOU Investments, LLC v. Netgear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments, LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development
Represented By: James Michael Lennon
Represented By: John W. Downing
Represented By: Jonathan K. Waldrop
Represented By: Darcy L. Jones
Represented By: Heather S. Kim
Represented By: Jack Shaw
Represented By: Marcus A. Barber
Represented By: Paul G. Williams
Represented By: Shelley Ivan
Represented By: ThucMinh Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Ying
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?