Romero v. Center for Excellence in Higher Education, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tyson Romero
Defendant: Center for Excellence in Higher Education, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01124
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jack A. Raisner - filed by Tyson Romero. (Loizides, Christopher)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jack A. Raisner, filed by Tyson Romero. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/23/2021. (nms)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rene S. Roupinian - filed by Tyson Romero. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(Loizides, Christopher)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Center for Excellence in Higher Education, Inc. answer due 10/29/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/21/2021. (nms)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rene S. Roupinian, filed by Tyson Romero. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/21/2021. (nms)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint, by Tyson Romero. (Loizides, Christopher) Modified on 9/21/2021 (nms).
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER: Defendant's answer was due to be filed on 9/14/2021 (see D.I. #5 ), and to date none has been filed. Plaintiff is to file a status letter no later than 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/17/2021. (nms)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyson Romero. Tyson Romero served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (Loizides, Christopher)
August 24, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: The executed summons filed at D.I. 5 has been removed from the docket as it was filed using an incorrect code. Plaintiff is to refile the document using the "Summons Returned Executed" code thereby allowing an answer due date to be set. (nms)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 Alias Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Center for Excellence in Higher Education, Inc. on 8/23/2021. (smg)
August 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Center for Excellence in Higher Education, Inc. on 8/3/2021. (kmd)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Center for Excellence in Higher Education, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3670634.) - filed by Tyson Romero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Center for Excellence in Higher Education, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson Romero
Represented By: Christopher D. Loizides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Excellence in Higher Education, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?