Astellas Pharma Inc. et al v. Apotex Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd. and Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.
Defendant: Apotex Inc. and Apotex Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01141
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Christopher J Burke
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Case associated with lead case 20-1589. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/26/2021. (dlb)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. (10 in 1:21-cv-01141-JFB-CJB, 165 in 1:20-cv-01589-JFB-CJB) Stipulation To Forgo Answer of Appotex Inc. and Apotex Corp.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/26/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01141-JFB-CJB, 1:20-cv-01589-JFB-CJB(dlb)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 166 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Case Consolidation by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc. The LEAD Case shall be 20-1589-JFB-CJB and all future docket entries for these cases shall be made in the lead case only. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 8/25/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01589-JFB-CJB, 1:21-cv-01141-JFB-CJB(nmg)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Case Consolidation by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION To Forgo Answer of Appotex Inc. and Apotex Corp. by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Related Papers served on Apotex Corp. on August 23, 2021, filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Related Papers served on Apotex, Inc. on August 23, 2021, filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
August 11, 2021 REMARK: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:#http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf (dlb)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER Pursuant to the filing of this case, the Court issues the following order: Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke shall issue a scheduling order when appropriate. Magistrate Judge Burke shall handle all nondispositive matters on all issues, except for Daubert motions, Markman hearings, and pretrial motions in limine. The parties have the right to file an appeal of the magistrate judge's order, and the same shall be decided by the undersigned. The magistrate judge shall likewise handle all discovery matters, scheduling, and pretrial conferences. If the parties believe the magistrate judge has a conflict of interest with this case, the parties shall so notify the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 08/09/2021. (AEV)
August 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bataillon of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska, due to prior related cases. Please include the initials of the Judge (JFB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (srs)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas B.V. for Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.; Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma Global Development, Corporate Parent Astellas Pharma Inc. for Astellas B.V. and Astellas US Holdings, Inc., Inc. filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., and Astellas Pharma Inc.. (srs)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,842,780. (srs)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 06/23/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: 9/28/2029.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 12/23/2023. (srs)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3673356.) - filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., and Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Astellas Pharma Inc. et al v. Apotex Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astellas Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?