United Association of Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 322 of Southern New Jersey v. Mallinckrodt ARD LLC et al
Plaintiff: United Association of Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 322 of Southern New Jersey
Defendant: Mallinckrodt ARD LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Cigna Holding Company, CIGNA Corporation, Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., CuraScript Inc., Curascript SD, PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., Accredo Health Group, Inc., United Biosource Corporation and LISA PRATTA
Case Number: 1:2021cv01201
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Stephanos Bibas
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and submit a joint status update by October 29, 2021. Ordered by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 10/19/2021. (smg)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: DESIGNATION OF CIRCUIT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Stephanos Bibas of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Signed by Judge D. Brooks Smith, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 10/1/2021. (rjb)
October 1, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanos Bibas of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Please include the initials of the Judge (SB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 22, 2021 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Maddox on behalf of Mallinckrodt plc (Maddox, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Kevin Astin on behalf of United Association of Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 322 of Southern New Jersey (Astin, Daniel)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following motions are DENIED AS MOOT: D.I. 7, 9. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/10/21. (ntl)
August 25, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 23, 2021 Filing 114 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/22/2021. (nmg)
August 23, 2021 Filing 113 Record of case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number in Other District: 1:20-cv-00188. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #90 Motion to Transfer Case to District Court of Delaware. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/18/2021. (dmr) Modified on 8/23/2021 (dd). [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 TEXT ORDER Pursuant to L. CIV. R. 7.1.1 (eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/25/21. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying #80 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/22/2021. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Filing 109 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/22/2021. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 108 Letter from (signed) Matthew J. Behr, Esq. re Notice of Order re #90 MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court of Delaware, Bankruptcy Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certification of Exhibit)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 107 Letter from Matthew J. Behr, Esq. re Notice of Order re #90 MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court of Delaware, Bankruptcy Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certification of Exhibit)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER from the MDL Panel denying transfer/centralization regarding: IN RE: ACTHAR GEL ANTITRUST LITIGATION MDL 2999. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 105 Letter from Matthew J. Behr, Esq. re Second Supplemental Authority Letter re #90 MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court of Delaware, Bankruptcy Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 104 NOTICE by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #101 Notice (Other), #100 MOTION to Stay re #99 Notice (Other) , #102 Notice (Other), #103 Response in Opposition to Motion Third Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by MALLINCKRODT PLC re #100 MOTION to Stay re #99 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Certification of Exhibits, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 102 NOTICE by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #101 Notice (Other), #100 MOTION to Stay re #99 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 24, 2021 Filing 101 NOTICE by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 16, 2021 Filing 100 MOTION to Stay re #99 Notice (Other) by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 16, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard the Clerk's Quality Control message of 3/15/2021. The Notice #99 was filed as notification of a motion filed in another matter. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 15, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion #99 filed by Donald E. Haviland, Jr. on 3/12/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice #99 . PLEASE RESUBMIT using the Motion event. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 99 NOTICE by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY of Motion to Transfer filed with the JPML (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Support filed by MALLINCKRODT PLC re #90 MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court of Delaware, Bankruptcy Court Supplement to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Certification of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #93 Motion to Seal;The redacted Exhibits attached to Plaintiff's Motion will replace the Exhibits attached to Plaintiff's brief in opposition (Doc. No. #92 ) to Defendant's Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/23/2021. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 96 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MALLINCKRODT PLC re #90 MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court of Delaware, Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 95 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MALLINCKRODT PLC re #90 MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court of Delaware, Bankruptcy Court Request for adjournment for additional time to file reply (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 94 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MALLINCKRODT PLC re #93 MOTION to Seal Document #92 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, Letter Not Opposing Motion, Seeking Immediate Entry of Order (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Filing 93 MOTION to Seal Document #92 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L, #2 Exhibit U, #3 Exhibit V, #4 Exhibit W)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 92 BRIEF in Opposition filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #90 MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court of Delaware, Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald E. Haviland, Jr., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Text of Proposed Order)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Filing 91 BRIEF in Opposition filed by LISA PRATTA re #90 MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court of Delaware, Bankruptcy Court (BEGELMAN, ROSS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Filing 90 MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court of Delaware, Bankruptcy Court by MALLINCKRODT PLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification of Exhibit, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Brief)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 89 CLERK'S ORDER Denying re #81 MOTION for Taxation of Costs filed by Defendant LISA PRATTA. (William T. Walsh, Clerk) (jo, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 88 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by LISA PRATTA re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert of Service)(IRWIN, JORDAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Directing Clerk to administratively terminate this matter with respect to Defendants Mallinckrodt plc, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/13/2020. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE TERMINATION. ORDERED that all proceedings with Mallinckrodt plc and its affiliated debtors, shall be, and hereby are, STAYED, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/13/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 85 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Mallinckrodt ARD LLC and Mallinckrodt plc and Automatic Stay of Proceedings by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC. (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 84 BRIEF in Opposition filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
October 2, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Amended Brief #83 filed by Jordan Irwin on 10/1/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. In the future please file Amended Briefs using ether the "Amended Document", found under Other Documents, or the "Brief in Support" event found under Responses and Replies. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 83 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees Amended brief by LISA PRATTA. (IRWIN, JORDAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 82 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION for Taxation of Costs by LISA PRATTA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Attorney, #2 Exhibit Bill of Costs, #3 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service Certif of Service)(IRWIN, JORDAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION for Attorney Fees by LISA PRATTA. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief, #2 Certification Certif of Ross Begelman, #3 Certification Certif of Marc Orlow, #4 Exhibit Exhibits A & B, #5 Certification Certif of Service, #6 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(IRWIN, JORDAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT; Answer due by 9/30/2020. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/27/2020. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 78 Letter from Matthew J. Behr, Esq. enclosing Consent Order Extending Time for Mallinckrodt Defendants to file Answer Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Transfer Case; denying Mallinckrodt's Motion to Stay #16 ; denying as moot Express Scripts' Motion to Dismiss #18 , Mallinckrodt's Motion to Dismiss #19 , and Pratta's Motion to Dismiss #25 ; denying Mallinckrodt and Express Scripts' Joint Motion to Strike the Amended Complaint #41 and Pratta's Motion to Strike #43 ; granting in part and denying in part Mallinckrodt's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint #49 ; granting Express Scripts' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint #50 and Pratta's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint #55 , etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/18/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 76 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/18/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
May 6, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MICHAEL B. BERNSTEIN, ADAM PERGAMENT, SONIA K. PFAFFENROTH, ERIC SHAPLAND, LAURA SHORES, RYAN Z. WATTS and MATTHEW WOLF, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 75 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Matthew Wolf to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10774799.) (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 74 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ryan Z. Watts to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10774721.) (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 73 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Laura Shores to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10774649.) (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 72 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric Shapland to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10774600.) (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 71 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sonia K. Pfaffenroth to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10774237.) (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 70 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Adam Pergament to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10774194.) (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 69 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael B. Bernstein to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10774078.) (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
May 1, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MICHAEL BONANNO, JONATHAN COOPER, ETHAN GLASS, MICHAEL LYLE, ERIC LYTTLE and MEGHAN MCCAFFREY, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 68 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Meghan McCaffrey to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10755855.) (ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 67 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric Lyttle to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10755827.) (ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 66 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael Lyle to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10755804.) (ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 65 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ethan Glass to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10755782.) (ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 64 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan Cooper to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10755766.) (ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 63 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael Bonanno to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10755736.) (ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Bonanno, Esquire, Jonathan Cooper, Esquire, Ethan Glass, Esquire, Michael Lyle, Esquire, Eric Lyttle, Esquire, and Megan McCaffrey, Esquire, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/17/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael B. Bernstein, Esquire, Adam Pergament, Esquire, Sonia K. Pfaffenroth, Esquire, Eric Shapland, Esquire, Laura Shores, Esquire, Ryan Z. Watts, Esquire, and Matthew M. Wolf, Esquire, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/17/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC re #16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Motion to Strike (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Against Lisa Pratta (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Motion to Strike Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Acument Order, #2 Exhibit B: Humana Order)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Against Lisa Pratta by LISA PRATTA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(ORLOW, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 54 Letter from Brian M. English re #53 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,. (ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 53 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION re #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Motion to Strike (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by LISA PRATTA re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ORLOW, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Amended Complaint by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION re #41 Joint MOTION to Strike #40 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #41 Joint MOTION to Strike #40 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 46 BRIEF in Opposition filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #25 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of D. Haviland, #3 Certificate of Service)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 45 BRIEF in Opposition filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 44 BRIEF in Opposition filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Motion to Strike (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Strike by LISA PRATTA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOW, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SCHEDULING ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an Opposition brief to Mallinckrodt and the ESI Defendants' Motion to Strike on or before 3/3/2020; Mallinckrodt and the ESI Defendants may file a Reply brief to Plaintiff's Opposition on or before 3/5/2020, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/26/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Strike #40 Amended Complaint, by ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION. Responses due by 3/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, LISA PRATTA, PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION, filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY.(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER ORDER Granting Plaintiff's extension request. Response due by 3/2/2020. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/20/2020. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re #16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert of Exs, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, #3 Exhibit Ex 2, #4 Certificate of Service Cert of Filing/Serv)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY of Motion for Extension of Time (HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY in Support of Motion filed by ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION re #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 33 BRIEF in Opposition filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY re #16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 32 Letter from Matthew Behr, Esq. with Amended Certifications of pro hac vice counsel (7) re #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Attachments: #1 Certification Amended Certification of pro hac vice counsel Pfaffenroth, #2 Certification Amended Certification of pro hac vice counsel Bernstein, #3 Certification Amended Certification of pro hac vice counsel Shores, #4 Certification Amended Certification of pro hac vice counsel Watts, #5 Certification Amended Certification of pro hac vice counsel Pergament, #6 Certification Amended Certification of pro hac vice counsel Shapland, #7 Certification Amended Certification of pro hac vice counsel Wolf)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 9, 2020 Filing 31 Certification of Brian M. English on behalf of ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION Re 28 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ethan C. Glass, #2 Certification of Michael J. Lyle, #3 Certification of Eric C. Lyttle, #4 Certification of Meghan A. McCaffrey, #5 Certification of Michael D. Bonanno, #6 Certification of Jonathan G. Cooper)(ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 30 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meghan A. McCaffrey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 Part 1, #6 Exhibit 4 Part 2, #7 Exhibit 4 Part 3, #8 Certificate of Service)(ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/30/2020. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER - On even date, the Court conducted a telephone status conference with counsel for all parties to address all of the pending motions. To this end, the Court further notes that as of January 29, 2020, the Motion to Stay [Dkt. No. 16] is no longer referred. Consequently, all pending motions(except the Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice) will be addressed by The Honorable Robert B. Kugler. Any and all correspondence relating to said motions should be directed accordingly. Order entered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on January 30, 2020. (Williams, Karen) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER deferring ruling on #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and deferring ruling on #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, the party filing its pro hac vice motion shall file an amended certified statement of each applicant "disclosing each bar in which the applicant is a member in good standing including the year of admission and the name and address of the official or office maintaining the roll of such members of its bar" as set forth in the amendment to L. Civ. R. 101.1(c) (1) (eff. March 1, 2010); or in lieu thereof, may attach a certificate of good standing. See www.njd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 01/30/2020. (Riecken, Richard) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY of Conference Call Information for Telephonic Status Conference (HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 26 Letter from Matthew J. Behr, Esq. in resopnse to Plaintiff's 26(f) Report. (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by LISA PRATTA. Responses due by 2/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ORLOW, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re Watts to appear pro hac vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order re Shapland to appar pro hac vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Shores to appear pro hac vice, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Pergament to appear pro hac vice, #5 Text of Proposed Order for Pfaffenroth to appear pro hac vice, #6 Text of Proposed Order for Wolf to appear pro hac vice, #7 Text of Proposed Order for Bernstein to appear pro hac vice, #8 Certification of Matthew J. Behr, Esq. in support of Motion for pro hac vice admission, #9 Certification executed by Watts re pro hac vice admission, #10 Certification executed by Shapland re pro hac vice admission, #11 Certification executed by Shores re pro hac vice admission, #12 Certification executed by Pergament re pro hac vice admission, #13 Certification executed by Pfaffenroth re pro hac vice admission, #14 Certification executed by Wolf re pro hac vice admission, #15 Certification executed by Bernstein re pro hac vice admission, #16 Certificate of Service)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 23 Letter from James J. O'Hara. (ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting letter request to permit Sonia Kuester Pfaffenroth to participate in the telephone call on behalf of the Mallinckrod Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/28/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION re #16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Notice of Joinder in Motion to Stay (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 20 Joint Discovery Plan by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY.(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Motion to Strike by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Certificate of Service)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION. Responses due by 2/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Brian M. English, #2 Certification of Michael Lyle, #3 Certification of Eric Lyttle, #4 Certification of Ethan Glass, #5 Certification of Meghan McCaffrey, #6 Certification of Jonathan Cooper, #7 Certification of Michael Bonanno, #8 Certificate of Service, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Exhibits, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Brief in Support of Motion to Stay, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8)(BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSS BEGELMAN on behalf of LISA PRATTA (BEGELMAN, ROSS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC M. ORLOW on behalf of LISA PRATTA (ORLOW, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Matthew J. Behr, Esq. requesting permission for Sonia Kuester Pfaffenroth, Esq. to participate in Jan. 30, 2020 telephonic conference. (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 322 OF SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(HAVILAND, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated January 10, 2020 from Mathew J. Behr, Esquire, counsel for defendants Mallinckrodt ARD LLC and Mallinckrodt plc, the Court hereby GRANTS the request to adjourn the in-person Initial Conference previously set for January 30, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. but will conduct a telephone status conference instead. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/13/20. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Mathew J. Behr, Esq. requesting adjournment of January 30, 2020 Scheduling Conference and parties' initial disclosure obligations. (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants, Mallinckrodt ARD, LLC and Mallinckrodt plc.. (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES J. O'HARA on behalf of ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION (O'HARA, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION.. (ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN M. ENGLISH on behalf of ACCREDO HEALTH GROUP, INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY, CURASCRIPT SD, CURASCRIPT, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC., UNITED BIOSOURCE CORPORATION (ENGLISH, BRIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW J. BEHR on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC (BEHR, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Initial Conference set for 1/30/2020 03:30 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/6/2020. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC f/k/a MALLINCKRODT ARD, INC., f/k/a QUESTCOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (WEISS, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALLINCKRODT PLC .. (WEISS, JONATHAN) Modified on 1/6/2020 (dmr, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MALLINCKRODT PLC, MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC f/k/a MALLINCKRODT ARD, INC., f/k/a QUESTCOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. from Superior Court of NJ, Law Division, Camden County, case number CAM-L-4696-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10224624), filed by MALLINCKRODT PLC, MALLINCKRODT ARD, LLC f/k/a MALLINCKRODT ARD, INC., f/k/a QUESTCOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(WEISS, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 6, 2020 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 6, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]
January 6, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/23/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Association of Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 322 of Southern New Jersey v. Mallinckrodt ARD LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Association of Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 322 of Southern New Jersey
Represented By: Daniel Kevin Astin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt ARD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Represented By: Robert Charles Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CuraScript Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curascript SD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIORITY HEALTHCARE CORP. AND PRIORITY HEALTHCARE DISTRIBUTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accredo Health Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Biosource Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA PRATTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?