Rockwell Automation, Inc. v. Parcorp s.r.l.
Plaintiff: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Defendant: Parcorp s.r.l. doing business as WI Automation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01238
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed Parcorp s.r.l. served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (srs)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to November 8, 2021 filed by Parcorp s.r.l., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Parcorp s.r.l. answer due 11/8/2021. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/12/2021. (kmd)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to November 8, 2021 - filed by Parcorp s.r.l.. (Kraman, Pilar)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 Postal Receipt(s) for the mailing of process to Parcorp s.r.l. (srs)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 PRAECIPE filed by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. requesting Clerk to issue (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neal McLaughlin)(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul Tanck and Neal J. McLaughlin of Alston & Bird LLP - filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
September 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 1, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Neal J. McLaughlin and Paul J. Tanck for Rockwell Automation, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul Tanck and Neal J. McLaughlin of Alston & Bird LLP filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/1/2021. (nmf)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Parcorp s.r.l. on 8/27/2021. (twk)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (twk)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 1172995; 696401; 693780; 1172994; 712800; 712836 ; 2510226; 2671196; 2701786; 2412742. (Attachments: #1 Patent/Trademark Report)(twk)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Parcorp s.r.l. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3687861.) - filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockwell Automation, Inc. v. Parcorp s.r.l.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Represented By: Neal J. McLaughlin
Represented By: Paul J. Tanck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parcorp s.r.l. doing business as WI Automation
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?