Nails v. Buddha Power Store
Plaintiff: Angela D. Nails
Defendant: Buddha Power Store
Case Number: 1:2021cv01267
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 OBJECTION by Angela D. Nails to #4 Order Denying IFP. (srs)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, denying request to proceed informa pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30-days or the case shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 09/20/2021. (smg)
September 15, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 15, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: deleted entry assigning case to incorrect Judge (rjb)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Buddha Power Store - filed by Angela D. Nails.(apk)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Angela D. Nails. (apk)
September 3, 2021 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nails v. Buddha Power Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela D. Nails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buddha Power Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?