Cook et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael Cook and Lisa Cook
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, CBS Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Grinnell LLC, Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Viacom Inc., Successor by merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp., Westinghouse Electric Corp., Cleaver-Brooks, a Division of Aqua-Chem, Inc., FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Grinnell Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., ITT Corporation, John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Velan Valve Corp., Warren Pumps, LLC and Crane Co.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01307
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant, Armstrong International, Inc.'s Initial Disclosure under Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Armstrong International, Inc..(Adams, William)
October 19, 2021 Filing 30 Letter to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon from Katherine Barksdale, Esq regarding Status of Service of Complaint and Defendants' Answers. (Barksdale, Katherine)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 11/30/2021 at 10:00 a.m. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 11/23/2021. (3) Counsel are instructed to use Judge Fallon's form asbestos scheduling order posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms) for all events up to and including Status Conference and Judge Noreika's form non-patent scheduling order posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms) for all events including and following Case Dispositive Motions and shall include a chart of the deadlines as an exhibit to the proposed Scheduling Order. Regardless of the number of Daubert motions and case dispositive issues raised by a moving party, the moving party shall file only one opening brief with briefing subject to the page limitations set forth in Local Rule 7.1.3(4), 20 pages for the opening and answering briefs and 10 pages for the reply. These requirements shall be included in the proposed Scheduling Order. (4) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/19/2021. (lih)
October 7, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re All Plaintiffs : Entry of appearance of attorney Katherine Barksdale. Attorney R. Joseph Hrubiec terminated. (Barksdale, Katherine)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/5/2021. (Polito, Rebecca)
October 1, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Costello, Kelly)
October 1, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Johnson Controls Inc. (Costello, Kelly)
October 1, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of ITT Corporation (Costello, Kelly)
October 1, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Costello, Kelly)
September 30, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #22 has been modified to accurately reflect the nature of the document. Counsel is advised to use the ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) event code when filing a document of this nature in the future. (lih)
September 29, 2021 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO Industries, Inc. for Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
September 29, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 9/30/2021 (lih).
September 29, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Tyler, Jessica)
September 28, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against Armstrong International, Inc. by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Adams, William) Modified on 9/28/2021 (lih).
September 28, 2021 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Adams, William)
September 28, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 9/28/2021 (lih).
September 28, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Adams on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Adams, William)
September 27, 2021 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries, Inc. filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sullivan, Timothy)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Sullivan, III on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Sullivan, Timothy)
September 23, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
September 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 21, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by John Crane, Inc..(Bell, Tye)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 JOINDER by CBS Corporation, joining in #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Valocchi, Beth)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 JOINDER by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, joining in #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Texter, Allison)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler Corporation, Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler LLC, Other Affiliate John Wood Group plc (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Texter, Allison)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison L. Texter on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Texter, Allison)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate ViacomCBS Inc. for CBS Corporation filed by CBS Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Valocchi on behalf of CBS Corporation (Valocchi, Beth)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Crane Co.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas E. Skiles on behalf of Crane Co. (Skiles, Nicholas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Bell, Tye)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
September 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N21C-08-012 ASB (Filing fee $402, receipt number BDEDC-3698930)- filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc., Successor by merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp.
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, a Division of Aqua-Chem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: Tye C. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cook
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Represented By: Katherine Barksdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Cook
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Represented By: Katherine Barksdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?