Wilmer-Williamson v. Centurion Managed Care et al
Plaintiff: Lamere Wilmer-Williamson
Defendant: Centurion Managed Care, Anthony Jacobs, William Ngwe and Matthew Wofford
Case Number: 1:2021cv01327
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: An initial partial filing fee of $89.38 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf.) (*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/29/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Authorization form) (nms)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Letter to Clerk of the Court, from Lamere Wilmer-Williamson, enclosing Trust Fund Account Statement. (Attachments: #1 Trust Fund Account Statement)(twk) Modified on 10/12/2021 (nms).
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 Trust Fund Account Statement by Lamere Wilmer-Williamson (Attachments: #1 Letter) (apk) Modified on 9/27/2021 (nms).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Motion to Proceed IFP (D.I. #1 ). Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf.)(Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/22/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/22/2021. (nms)
September 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Centurion Managed Care, Anthony Jacobs, William Ngwe, Matthew Wofford - filed by Lamere Wilmer-Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Lamere Wilmer-Williamson. (twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmer-Williamson v. Centurion Managed Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamere Wilmer-Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Managed Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ngwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?