Nexstar Media Inc. v. Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Nexstar Media Inc. and Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.
Defendant: Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01358
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. Reply Brief due date per #10 Stipulation and Order is 12/8/2021. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 11/24/2021 (dlw).
November 23, 2021 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Lindsey Barnhart re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition by Nexstar Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 11/23/2021 (dlw).
November 23, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Dana Zimmer re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition by Nexstar Media Inc. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 11/23/2021 (dlw).
November 23, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer the Action to the Southern District of New York, or in the Alternative, to Stay or Dismiss without Prejudice filed by Nexstar Media Inc. Reply Brief due date per #10 Stipulation and Order is 12/8/2021. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 11/23/2021 (dlw).
October 27, 2021 Filing 18 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of the State of Delaware filed by Nexstar Media Inc. Answering Brief/Response due date per #10 Stipulation and Order is 11/23/2021. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 10/28/2021 (dlw).
October 27, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of the State of Delaware - filed by Nexstar Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 10/28/2021 (dlw).
October 18, 2021 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Nexstar Media Group, Inc. for Nexstar Media Inc. filed by Nexstar Media Inc.. (McBride, Daniel)
October 15, 2021 Filing 15 Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/15/2021 (mdb).
October 13, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard J. Symons, Megan B. Poetzel for Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 13, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lina R. Powell for Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Kelly E. Farnan re #12 Opening Brief in Support by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 5)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/13/2021 (dlw).
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Laurence Christopher re #12 Opening Brief in Support by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/13/2021 (dlw).
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Transfer the Action to the Southern District of New York, or in the Alternative, to Stay or Dismiss without Prejudice filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/26/2021. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer the Action to the Southern District of New York, or in the Alternative, to Stay or Dismiss without Prejudice - filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 7.1.1 Certificate)(Farnan, Kelly)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SO ORDERED re #9 Stipulation and Order Governing Briefing on Forthcoming Motions (Set Briefing Schedule: Defendant's motions and Opening Brief due 10/12/2021. Plaintiff's motion to remand and Opening Brief due 10/27/2021. Answering Briefs due 11/23/2021. Reply Briefs due 12/8/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/12/2021. (dlw)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard J. Symons, Megan B. Poetzel and Lina R. Powell filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/12/2021. (dlw)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing on Forthcoming Motions by Nexstar Media Inc.. (McBride, Daniel)
October 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard J. Symons, Megan B. Poetzel and Lina R. Powell - filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 REDACTED VERSION of #3 Exhibit to a Document by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Charter Communications, Inc., Other Affiliate Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Liberty Broadband Corporation, Other Affiliate CCH II, LLC, Other Affiliate CCH Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Insight Blocker, Other Affiliate Advance Newhouse Partnership for Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendant's Motion is GRANTED (D.I. #1 ). Defendant's Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A of its Notice of Removal may be filed Under Seal. Defendant SHALL file a redacted public version of the Exhibit in no more than five (5) days.. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/27/2021. (twk)
September 27, 2021 Remark: Exit electronic copies to Duty Judge (CFC). (twk)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 [SEALED] EXHIBIT 1 to Exhibit A to the Notice of Removal re #2 Notice of Removal, by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (twk)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N21C-08-086 AML (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3708011)- filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to the Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to the Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit A-B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 Defendant's MOTION to file Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A of the Notice of Removal under seal - filed by Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(twk)
September 27, 2021 No Summons Issued. (twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nexstar Media Inc. v. Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nexstar Media Inc.
Represented By: A. Thompson Bayliss
Represented By: Daniel John McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.
Represented By: A. Thompson Bayliss
Represented By: Daniel John McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Howard J. Symons
Represented By: Lina R. Powell
Represented By: Megan B. Poetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?