Palinode, LLC v. Plaza Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Palinode, LLC
Defendant: Plaza Services LLC and Provana, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01378
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 REDACTED VERSION of #127 Declaration, of David Vick by Provana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Albert, Alan)
November 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 REDACTED VERSION of #126 Declaration of Karen Powell by Provana, LLC. (Albert, Alan)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 REDACTED VERSION of #130 Declaration by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/23/2021 (lih).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 REDACTED VERSION of #128 Reply Brief by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/23/2021 (lih).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 REDACTED VERSION of #125 Answering Brief in Opposition by Provana, LLC. (Albert, Alan) Modified on 11/23/2021 (lih).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Having reviewed Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (D.I. #108 ), and it appearing that the motion is fully briefed, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for December 2, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. to hear the parties' positions on the form and timing of the hearing on the pending motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before December 1, 2021, the parties shall either (1) file an executed Form AO 85A Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Dispositive Motion to a Magistrate Judge that sets forth the parties' consent to consideration of the pending motion by a Magistrate Judge, or (2) file a joint letter indicating that both parties do not so consent. The letter should not indicate which party or parties did not consent. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/23/2021. (lih)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #125 , #126 and #127 . (lih)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The redacted version of D.I. 108 has been deleted due to document being filed using the incorrect event code. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the appropriate event code. (lih)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Updated 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #108 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/23/2021 (lih).
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Thor Y. Urness re #128 Reply Brief by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/23/2021 (lih).
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DECLARATION of Joseph Drake re #128 Reply Brief by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/23/2021 (lih).
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #108 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dana J. Finberg for Provana, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Karen Powell re #125 Answering Brief in Opposition by Provana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A , #2 Exhibit B , #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Certificate of Service) (Albert, Alan) Modified on 11/16/2021 (lih).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Karen Powell re #125 Answering Brief in Opposition by Provana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Albert, Alan) Modified on 11/16/2021 (lih).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #108 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Provana, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/22/2021. (Albert, Alan)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #108 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaza Services LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/22/2021. (Cole, Andrew)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #123 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dana J. Finberg and Shane M. Bradwell. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/9/2021. (lih)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dana J. Finberg and Shane M. Bradwell - filed by Provana, LLC. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Albert, Alan)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Palinode, LLC.(lih)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION regarding filing of Amended Complaint and briefing on Preliminary Injunction Motion by Palinode, LLC. (Hitch, Cortlan)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #121 Stipulation. Set Briefing Schedule: re #108 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Answering Brief due 11/15/2021., Reply Brief due 11/22/2021.) Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Defendants Dispositive Motions or other responsive pleadings due by 11/30/2021.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/4/2021. (lih)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Sean M. O'Brien and Brendan H. Little for Plaza Services LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Long Ridge Equity Partners LLC on November 1, 2021 (Hitch, Cortlan)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Subpoena to Long Ridge Equity Partners LLC by Palinode, LLC (Hitch, Cortlan)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan D. Albert on behalf of Provana, LLC (Albert, Alan)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REDACTED VERSION of #111 Declaration by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 10/27/2021 (lih).
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 REDACTED VERSION of #109 Opening Brief in Support by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 10/27/2021 (lih).
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean M. O'Brien - filed by Plaza Services LLC. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Cole, Andrew)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brendan H. Little - filed by Plaza Services LLC. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Cole, Andrew)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Lynch Cole on behalf of Plaza Services LLC (Cole, Andrew)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case (including the pending #88 Motion for Protective Order and #108 Motion for Preliminary Injunction) is referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not including summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, pre-trial motions in limine or the pre-trial conference), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 21-1378-MN-SRF. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/26/2021. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon. (dlw)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #115 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean M. O'Brien, #114 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brendan H. Little. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/26/2021. (lih)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. numbers #88 , #89 , #90 , #108 , #109 , #110 and #111 . (lih)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark: D.I. #88 reopened per D.I. #106 . (lih)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Thor Y. Urness re #109 Opening Brief in Support by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 10/26/2021 (dlw).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 DECLARATION of Joseph Drake re #109 Opening Brief in Support by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 10/26/2021 (dlw).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #108 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Palinode, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/8/2021. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and objections to second set of requests for production filed by Palinode, LLC.(Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STATEMENT pursuant to D. Del. L.R. 81.2 by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 10/25/2021 (dlw).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #105 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Brandon Bundren, Attorney Caroline Dare Spore and Attorney Thor Y. Urness filed by Palinode, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/7/2021. (dlw)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Caroline Dare Spore for Palinode, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thor Y. Urness, R. Brandon Bundren for Palinode, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Brandon Bundren, Attorney Caroline Dare Spore and Attorney Thor Y. Urness - filed by Palinode, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Cortlan S. Hitch on behalf of Palinode, LLC (Hitch, Cortlan)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Laurence Dorsney on behalf of Palinode, LLC (Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/29/2021. (twk)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Record of case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number in Other District: 3:20-cv-00807. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: For the reasons discussed in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court GRANTS Defendant Plaza's Motion to Change Venue (Doc. No. #36 , "Motion"), insofar as it grants the primary request made in the motion, i.e., a transfer of this case to the District of Delaware. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Defendant Plaza's motion to dismiss (Id.), brought in the Motion as an alternative to Defendant Plaza's request to change venue, arguably was extinguished based on the Court's granting of the request to change venue. The Court will leave it to the transferee court to determine whether such motion to dismiss remains pending and, if so, how to proceed with respect to such motion to dismiss. Defendant Provana's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #31 ) will remain pending in the transferee court, subject to further order by the transferee court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/28/2021. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/28/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Sealed Document Correction to Collective Exhibit 1, See Notice of Errata at Doc. No. 97 filed by Palinode, LLC. (Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE by Palinode, LLC re #95 Sealed Document, Notice of Errata (Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Filing by Palinode, LLC re #95 Sealed Document, (Attachments: #1 Attachment Palinode's proposed Sur-Reply [REDACTED] to Provana's Reply in Support of its "Motion for Protective Order to Limit Electronic Discovery")(Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Sealed Document Palinode's proposed Sur-Reply to Provana's Reply in Support of its "Motion for Protective Order to Limit Electronic Discovery" filed by Palinode, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collective Exhibit 1 to Sur-Reply (emails produced by Provana))(Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal Palinode's proposed Sur-Reply to Provana's Reply in Support of its "Motion for Protective Order to Limit Electronic Discovery" and Collective Exhibit 1 by Palinode, LLC. (Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to to File a Sur-Reply to Provana's Reply in Support of its "Motion for Protective Order to Limit Electronic Discovery" (Doc. No. 90) re #90 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Palinode, LLC. (Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RESETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial is reset for 12/6/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Pretrial Conference is reset for 11/28/2022 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/21/2022. Exhibit List due by 11/21/2022. Witness List due by 11/21/2022. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/4/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the parties' joint motion to amend the Case Management Order. The Court finds that good cause exists to amend the Case Management Order and grants the parties' motion #87 . Accordingly, the Case Management Order shall be amended as follows: The deadline for completion of fact discovery is extended to January 10, 2022. The deadline for dispositive motions is extended from October 25, 2021 until May 26, 2022. In consultation with Judge Richardson's chambers, the amended target trial date is December 6, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/3/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Defendant Provana, LLC's Reply To Plaintiff's Response In Opposition To Defendant Provana's Motion For Protective Order To Limit Electronic Mail Discovery re #88 MOTION for Protective Order to Limit Electronic Mail Discovery filed by Provana, LLC. (Durrett, Jamie) Modified text on 8/4/2021 (ln). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION for Protective Order to Limit Electronic Mail Discovery filed by Palinode, LLC. (Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION for Protective Order to Limit Electronic Mail Discovery by Provana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Electronic Discovery Order)(Durrett, Jamie) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date, Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Order by Palinode, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Case Management Order)(Spore, Caroline) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge held a hearing by videoconference on July 14, 2021, regarding the parties most recent discovery dispute statement (Doc. No. #69 ). The parties reached the following agreements in the course of the hearing: (SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/15/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE by Provana, LLC re #83 Discovery Dispute Statement Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email from Jamie Durrett to all counsel)(Durrett, Jamie) Modified on 7/19/2021 (ln). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Status Conference held on 7/14/2021. (Hearing lasted 00:56)(sd) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE by Provana, LLC Notice of Filing-Supplemental (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email from Jamie Durrett to all counsel regarding Meet and Confer dated July 9, 2021.)(Durrett, Jamie) Modified on 7/14/2021 (ln). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DISCOVERY DISPUTE STATEMENT by Palinode, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart of Discovery Requests, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration Jeff Parmet)(Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge held a conference by video on July 7, 2021. A discovery conference is set by video on July 14, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. Before that date, counsel shall meet and confer regarding all outstanding issues related to the discovery requests identified by Palinode in the discovery dispute statement (Doc. No. #81 , PageID# 1220). By no later than noon on July 13, 2021, counsel shall file a joint statement of any issues they are unable to resolve independently. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/8/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Status Conference held on 7/7/2021. (Hearing lasted 00:42)(sd) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 JOINT Statement per Court's Emailed Directive of June 21, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of David Vick)(Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge held a discovery dispute hearing with counsel for the parties on June 16, 2021. A videoconference with the Magistrate Judge is set on July 7, 2021, at 9:30 a.m., to discuss any remaining discovery issues and to make necessary amendments to the case management calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/17/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Status Conference held on 6/15/2021. (Hearing lasted 02:30)(sd) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Sean M. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/14/2021. (lh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for attorney Sean M. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3389672) by Plaza Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mueller, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Exhibits in Connection with Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Disputes by Palinode, LLC re #76 Sealed Document, #73 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - Plaza's Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit 4 - Defendant Plaza Services, LLC's Exhibit Summarizing Plaintiff Palinode, LLC's Discovery Responses in Dispute)(Bundren, R.) Modified on 6/9/2021 (ln). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Sealed Document Plaintiff Palinode, LLC's Notice of Filing Supplemental Exhibits Under Seal in Connection with Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Disputes filed by Palinode, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff Palinode, LLC's Supplemental Exhibit 1 to the Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Disputes, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant Provana, LLC's Responses to Plaintiff's Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things and Second Set of Interrogatories)(Bundren, R.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal Supplemental Exhibits 1 and 2 in Response to Court's Order [Doc. 73] by Palinode, LLC. (Bundren, R.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia L. Pearson on behalf of Provana, LLC (Pearson, Marcia) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: The parties have filed a joint discovery dispute statement that includes 36 pages of briefing and 327 pages of exhibits (Doc. Nos. #71 , #72 ). Requiring the Court to mine hundreds of pages for information relevant to the parties' disagreement removes the efficiency that holding a discovery dispute conference is intended to create. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED file a second set of exhibits to their statement that includes only the specific discovery requests and responses that are at issue. The parties shall file the second set of exhibits by June 8, 2021. A conference by video is set on June 15, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/4/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DISCOVERY DISPUTE STATEMENT by Palinode, LLC. Related document: #71 Sealed Document,, filed by Palinode, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Plazas Responses to Palinodes First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 5 - March 6, 2021 letter from counsel for Palinode to counsel for Plaza, #3 Exhibit 6 - May 5, 2021 letter from counsel for Plaza to counsel for Palinode, #4 Exhibit 7 - Collective emails between counsel, #5 Exhibit 8 - Palinodes Third Set of Requests for Production and Second Set of Interrogatories to Provana, #6 Exhibit 10 - Palinodes Second Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories to Provana, #7 Exhibit 11 - Plazas Response to Palinodes First and Second Request for Production, #8 Exhibit 12 - Plazas Supplemental Response to Palinodes First and Second Requests for Production, #9 Exhibit 13 - Palinodes Second Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories to Plaza, #10 Exhibit 14 - Plaza's Privilege Log, #11 Exhibit 15 - Plazas Responses to Palinodes Third Set of Requests for Production, #12 Exhibit 16 - Plazas Response to Plaintiffs Second Set of Interrogatories, #13 Exhibit 17 - Plazas First Set of Interrogatories to Palinode, #14 Exhibit 18 - Palinodes Answers and Objections to Plazas First Set of Interrogatories, #15 Exhibit 19 - February 23, 2021 letter from counsel for Plaza to counsel for Palinode, #16 Exhibit 20 - March 5, 2021 letter from counsel for Palinode to counsel for Plaza, #17 Exhibit 21 - March 12, 2021 letter from counsel for Plaza to counsel for Palinode, #18 Exhibit 22 - May 12, 2021 letter from counsel for Plaza to counsel for Palinode, #19 Exhibit 23 - May 17, 2021 letter from counsel for Palinode to counsel for Plaza)(Bundren, R.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Sealed Document Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Disputes filed by Palinode, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 Defendant Provana, LLCs Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things and First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 3 March 5, 2021 letter from counsel for Palinode to counsel for Provana, #3 Exhibit 4 Defendant Provana, LLCs First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things and First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 9 Defendant Provana, LLCs Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things)(Bundren, R.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal for Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Disputes and Exhibits 2, 3, 4, and 9 thereto by Palinode, LLC. (Bundren, R.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: The motion #68 to modify case management order is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/13/2021. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Joint MOTION Modify Case Management Order re #39 Case Management Order, by Palinode, LLC. (Spore, Caroline) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: The parties have filed a joint motion #66 requesting extensions of the deadline to file discovery motions, all expert discovery deadlines, and the dispositive motion deadline. Accordingly, the parties' motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling with a proposed dispositive motion deadline that meets the requirements of the Court's Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/5/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Joint MOTION Modify Case Management Order re #39 Case Management Order, by Palinode, LLC. (Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge held a telephonic case management conference with counsel for the parties on March 23, 2021. Counsel report that discovery is in progress and request a ninety-day extension of the deadline to conclude fact discovery. Accordingly, the fact discovery deadline is EXTENDED to July 27, 2021. All other deadlines remain as set in the initial case management order. (Doc. No. #39 .) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/23/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 3/23/2021. (Hearing lasted 00:11)(sd) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Filing by Palinode, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Subpoenas, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit/Proof of Service to Adam Parks, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit/Proof of Service to Adam Parks, Inc.)(Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jamie K. Durrett on behalf of Provana, LLC. (Durrett, Jamie) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie K. Durrett and Lynsie Gaddis Rust on behalf of Provana, LLC (Durrett, Jamie) Modified on 1/26/2021 (ln). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY to Response to re #57 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re #55 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Provana, LLC. (Durrett, Jamie) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: The Joint Motion to Move Pre-Trial Conference (Doc. No. #44 ) is GRANTED. The pretrial conference in this case is rescheduled to March 7, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. All lawyers who will participate in the trial must attend the pretrial conference. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 01/06/2021. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Plaintiff's SUR-REPLY to Plaza Services, LLC's Reply in Support of its #36 Motion to Transfer Venue and/or Dismiss. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur- Reply to Plaza Services, LLC's Reply in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue and/or Dismiss (Doc. No. #57 ). Plaintiff asks to file a sur-reply to address an issue raised for the first time in Defendant Plaza's Reply. (Id.) The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk is directed to separately file the Sur- Reply (Doc. No. #57 -1) attached to the Motion. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/17/2020. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re #55 Reply to Response to Motion by Palinode, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Sur-Reply)(Spore, Caroline) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie K. Durrett on behalf of Provana, LLC (Durrett, Jamie) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPLY to Response to re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaza Services LLC. (Mueller, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to Response to re #31 Second MOTION to Dismiss , #42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 Second MOTION to Dismiss , #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Change Venue and In Opposition To Plaza Services, LLC's Motion To Transfer and Defendants' Rule 12(B) (6) Motion To Dismiss filed by Provana, LLC. (Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: The Motion #52 is GRANTED. Reply due by 12/9/2020. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/03/2020. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Provana, LLC. (Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/02/2020.(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaza Services LLC. (Mueller, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline D. Spore on behalf of Palinode, LLC (Spore, Caroline) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 Second MOTION to Dismiss , #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Change Venue filed by Palinode, LLC. (Spore, Caroline) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/17/2020. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Palinode, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Protective Order)(Bundren, R.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Joint MOTION To Move Pre-Trial Conference by Provana, LLC. (Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/12/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 Second MOTION to Dismiss , #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Change Venue by Palinode, LLC. (Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 3/15/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2022 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/25/2022; Exhibit List due by 2/25/2022; and Witness List due by 2/25/2022. All lawyers who will participate in the trial must attend the pretrial conference. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/03/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Counsel for Palinode represented that it has proposed limitations to the expedited discovery requested in the motion, but has not received a response from Defendants' counsel. This potential for agreement and other efficiencies that can be reached by agreement among the parties regarding the phasing of discovery in light of the pending motions to dismiss or transfer venue require further discussion among counsel. Counsel for the parties are therefore ORDERED to meet and confer on these topics by November 10, 2020. Palinode's motion for expedited discovery (Doc. No. #12 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling if necessary after the parties' conference and a further conference with the Magistrate Judge. To the extent Defendants' statements in the proposed initial case management order (Doc. No. #30 ) can be construed as a motion to stay discovery pending resolution of their motions to dismiss, that motion is DENIED. Defendant Provana, LLC, filed a motion (Doc. No. #22 ) to deem timely its answer filed on October 7, 2020 (Doc. No. #23 ). That motion (Doc. No. #22 ) is unopposed and is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/03/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2021; Discovery due by 4/28/2021; and Dispositive Motions due by 8/25/2021. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/23/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/03/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 11/3/2020. (Hearing lasted 00:31)(sd) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE by Provana, LLC re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Change Venue Adoption and Joinder of Defendant Plaza Services, LLC (Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: On October 28, 2020, Defendant Plaza Services, LLC filed a motion to transfer venue and/or dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Doc. No. #36 .) Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Richardson unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/28/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Change Venue by Plaza Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A)(Mueller, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on November 3, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. (Doc. No. #4 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/27/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: On October 27, 2020, Defendant Provana, LLC, filed a motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Doc. No. #31 .) Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Richardson unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/27/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE by Provana, LLC Of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint by Provana, LLC.(Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Second MOTION to Dismiss by Provana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law In Support Of Its Second Motion To Dismiss)(Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Palinode, LLC. (Bundren, R.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brendan H. Little is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 10/24/20. vk [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for attorney Brendan H. Little to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3237521) by Plaza Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Mueller, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. #25 ), the pending Motion to Transfer Venue and/or Dismiss (Doc. No. #17 ) and Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #20 ) are DENIED as moot, without prejudice to refiling, if appropriate, as to the currently operative Amended Complaint (Doc. No. #25 ). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/15/2020. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Change Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Palinode, LLC. (Bundren, R.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Palinode, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cease and Desist Letter of September 1, 2020)(Bundren, R.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: On October 7, 2020, Defendant Provana, LLC filed a motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Doc. No. #20 .) Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Richardson unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/7/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Provana, LLC.(Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Provana, LLC. (Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Provana, LLC . (Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Provana, LLC. (Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to re #12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Palinode, LLC. (Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: On September 30, 2020, Defendant Plaza Services, LLC, filed a motion to transfer venue and/or dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Doc. No. #17 .) Any filings made related to the motion to transfer venue and/or dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Richardson unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/1/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Change Venue , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaza Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit MTD A - Agreement)(Mueller, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Expedite filed by Plaza Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - agreement)(Mueller, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing by Palinode, LLC re #11 Order,,, Complete State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Agreed Complete State Court Record)(Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaza Services LLC. (Mueller, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Provana, LLC. (Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Palinode, LLC. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff Palinode, LLC, has alerted the Court to a motion for expedited discovery that it filed when this now-removed action was pending in state court. (Doc. No. #8 .) Defendants Plaza Services, LLC, and Provana, LLC, did not respond to the motion before the action was removed, apparently because they had not been served when the motion was filed. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS as follows: The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to file Palinode's motion for expedited discovery and its exhibits (Doc. No. 8-1) as a separate docket entry. Defendants shall file any response to Palinode's motion by September 30, 2020. Palinode may file any optional reply by October 7, 2020. The parties shall agree upon and shall jointly file a complete state court record by September 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/23/2020. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaza Services LLC. (Mueller, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Provana, LLC. (Melcher, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Palinode, LLC of Pending Motion for Expedited Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Plaintiff's Motion for expedited discovery with Exs A and B, #2 Exhibit 2-State Court Pleadings)(Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Palinode, LLC. (Urness, Thor) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)[Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Mueller on behalf of Plaza Services LLC (Mueller, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaza Services LLC, Provana, LLC from Chancery Court of Williamson County, case number 20CV-49741. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3218188) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Motion for Transfer to Complex Commercial Dispute, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/29/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palinode, LLC v. Plaza Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palinode, LLC
Represented By: Cortlan S. Hitch
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Caroline Dare Spore
Represented By: R. Brandon Bundren
Represented By: Thor Y. Urness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Services LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lynch Cole
Represented By: Brendan H. Little
Represented By: Sean M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provana, LLC
Represented By: Alan D. Albert
Represented By: Dana J. Finberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?