Elite Golf Technology, LLC v. Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC
Plaintiff: Elite Golf Technology, LLC doing business as StrackaLine
Defendant: Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01394
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Christopher J Burke
Referring Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 22 DECLARATION re #21 Reply Brief -- Declaration of Jim Stracka -- by Elite Golf Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 23, 2021 Filing 21 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Elite Golf Technology, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 17, 2021 REMARK: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:#http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf (dlb)
November 17, 2021 Remark The parties should follow the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, a copy of which is found on Judge Burke's portion of the District Court's webpage: https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-christopher-j-burke (dlb)
November 16, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/23/2021. (Brauerman, Stephen)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not including summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, pre-trial motions in limine or the pre-trial conference), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/15/21. (ntl)
November 12, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , #17 Opening Brief in Support Declaration of Dave Macpherson by Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC. (Golden, Ronald)
November 12, 2021 Filing 17 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/29/2021. (Golden, Ronald)
November 12, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue - filed by Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Golden, Ronald)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen B. Brauerman on behalf of Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC (Brauerman, Stephen)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Answer re #1 Complaint and file Response re #8 Preliminary Injunction Motion to November 22, 2021 and November 15, 2021 respectively. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/22/2021. (dlb)
October 21, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Answer re #1 Complaint and file Response re #8 Preliminary Injunction Motion to November 22, 2021 and November 15, 2021 respectively - filed by Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC. (Golden, Ronald)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 REDACTED VERSION of #10 Declaration by Elite Golf Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13)(Simonetti, Sarah)
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 REDACTED VERSION of #9 Opening Brief in Support by Elite Golf Technology, LLC. (Simonetti, Sarah)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (D.I. #8 ). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/12/21.(ntl)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #7 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Elite Golf Technology, LLC Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/12/2021. (mlc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction -- Declaration of Jim Stracka -- by Elite Golf Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-13)(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Elite Golf Technology, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/22/2021. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Elite Golf Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by Elite Golf Technology, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 6, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elite Golf Technology, LLC. Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC on 9/30/2021. (twk)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Elite Golf Technology, LLC. (twk)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,393,180. (twk)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3710787.) - filed by Elite Golf Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Golf Technology, LLC v. Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Golf Technology, LLC doing business as StrackaLine
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Simonetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Competitive Golf Advantage, LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Ronald P. Golden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?