Allergan, Inc. et al v. Revance Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Allergan, Inc., Allergan Pharmaceuticals Ireland and Allergan USA, Inc.
Defendant: Revance Therapeutics, Inc. and Ajinomoto Althea, Inc. doing business as Ajinomoto Bio-Pharma Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv01411
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ryan E. Conkin, Adam C. LaRock, and Dennies Varughese for Ajinomoto Althea, Inc., and Revance Therapeutics, Inc added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (smg) Modified on 11/29/2021 (smg).
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan USA, Inc. filed by Allergan Pharmaceuticals Ireland, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,332,567 ;7,354,740 ;8,409,828 ;11,033,625 ;11,124,786 ;11,147,878 . (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Ajinomoto Althea, Inc., Revance Therapeutics, Inc. - filed by Allergan, Inc., Allergan Pharmaceuticals Ireland, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-36)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 11/29/2021 (nms).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Allergan Pharmaceuticals Ireland, Allergan, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 11/15/2021 (nms).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time(*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief due 12/1/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/15/2021. (nms)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Revance Therapeutics, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ajinomoto Co., Inc. for Ajinomoto Althea, Inc. filed by Ajinomoto Althea, Inc., Revance Therapeutics, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dennies Varughese, Pharm. D., Eldora L. Ellison, Ph.D., Adam C. LaRock, Olga A. Partington, Ph.D., and Ryan E. Conkin, filed by Revance Therapeutics, Inc., Ajinomoto Althea, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/4/2021. (nms)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dennies Varughese, Pharm. D., Eldora L. Ellison, Ph.D., Adam C. LaRock, Olga A. Partington, Ph.D., and Ryan E. Conkin - filed by Ajinomoto Althea, Inc., Revance Therapeutics, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Ajinomoto Althea, Inc., Revance Therapeutics, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/17/2021. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 11/4/2021 (nms).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Ajinomoto Althea, Inc., Revance Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 11/4/2021 (nms).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Ajinomoto Althea, Inc. answer due 11/24/2021; Revance Therapeutics, Inc. answer due 11/24/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/19/2021. (nms)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement to November 24, 2021 - filed by Ajinomoto Althea, Inc., Revance Therapeutics, Inc.. (Gaza, Anne)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allergan, Inc., Allergan Pharmaceuticals Ireland. Ajinomoto Althea, Inc. served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Dellinger, Megan)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allergan, Inc., Allergan Pharmaceuticals Ireland. Revance Therapeutics, Inc. served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Dellinger, Megan)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Revance Therapeutics, Inc. on 10/4/2021. (twk)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Ajinomoto Althea, Inc. on 10/4/2021. (twk)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan Pharmaceuticals Ireland, Allergan, Inc. filed by Allergan Pharmaceuticals Ireland, Allergan, Inc.. (twk)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,332,567 B2; 7,354,740 B2; 8,409,828 B2; 11,033,625 B2; 11,124,786 B2. (twk)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Ajinomoto Althea, Inc., Revance Therapeutics, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3712877.) - filed by Allergan, Inc., Allergan Pharmaceuticals Ireland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-26, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allergan, Inc. et al v. Revance Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan Pharmaceuticals Ireland
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revance Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Adam C. LaRock
Represented By: Dennies Varughese
Represented By: Ryan E. Conkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajinomoto Althea, Inc. doing business as Ajinomoto Bio-Pharma Services
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Adam C. LaRock
Represented By: Dennies Varughese
Represented By: Ryan E. Conkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?