Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al v. Netlist, Inc.
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Defendant: Netlist, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01453
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Netlist, Inc. answer due 1/19/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/9/2021. (nms)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 19, 2022 - filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian Nester for Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas Garten for Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Alice J. Ahn and Peter A. Swanson for Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Nester, Alice J. Ahn, Peter A. Swanson and Thomas Garten - filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Nester, Alice J. Ahn, Peter A. Swanson and Thomas Garten, filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/16/2021. (nms)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time - filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 11/10/2021 (nms).
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Netlist, Inc. answer due 12/20/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/10/2021. (nms)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Netlist, Inc. served on 10/28/2021, answer due 11/18/2021. (Smith, Rodger)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Netlist, Inc. on 10/15/2021. (mal)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics America, Inc., for Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (mal)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,217,523 ;10,474,595 ;9,858,218 ;7,619,912. (mal)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Netlist, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3721308.) - filed by Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G-T, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al v. Netlist, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Alice J. Ahn
Represented By: Brian Nester
Represented By: Peter A. Swanson
Represented By: Thomas Garten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Alice J. Ahn
Represented By: Brian Nester
Represented By: Peter A. Swanson
Represented By: Thomas Garten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netlist, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?