San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC v. Bluebird Bio, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC and San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC
Defendant: Bluebird Bio, Inc. and Third Rock Ventures, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01478
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 1 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joe G. Chen, Natalie I. Uhlemann, and Lukas Toft for San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
November 18, 2022 Filing 81 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joe G. Chen, Natalie I. Uhlemann, and Lukas Toft - filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #81 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joe G. Chen, Natalie I. Uhlemann, and Lukas Toft, filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/18/2022. (nms)
November 2, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Mary Jean Kim, David Forrest, and the law firm of Leob & Loeb LLP as co-counsel.. (Wilson, Samantha)
November 2, 2022 Filing 79 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation of Certain Co-Counsel by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC (Wilson, Samantha)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: The above-captioned case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. The parties shall promptly notify the Court when the arbitration has been resolved so that this case may be reopened and other appropriate action may be taken. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/28/2022. (nms)
July 26, 2022 Filing 77 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Anne Shea Gaza, regarding response to Defendants' July 25, 2022 letter (D.I. #74 ). (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 7/27/2022 (nms).
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings (D.I. #44 ) is GRANTED IN PART. The parties SHALL ARBITRATE the threshold issues raised by Defendants' Motion and Plaintiff's responses thereto. The case is STAYED pending the results of the arbitration. Defendants' request to dismiss the case is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's Cross Motion to Join the Patent Owner Under Fed. R. Civ. P. and Amend the Complaint (D.I. #55 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/26/2022. (nms)
July 26, 2022 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/26/2022. (nms)
July 25, 2022 Filing 74 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Jeremy A. Tigan, regarding Defendants' request for judicial notice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 7/26/2022 (nms).
July 18, 2022 Filing 73 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Anne Shea Gaza, regarding response to the Defendants' July 15, 2022 letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 7/19/2022 (nms).
July 15, 2022 Filing 72 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Anne Shea Gaza, regarding response to the Court's July 12, 2022 Order (D.I. 70 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 7/18/2022 (nms).
July 15, 2022 Filing 71 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Jeremy A. Tigan, regarding response to Court's request (D.I. 70 ). (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 7/18/2022 (nms).
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORAL ORDER: The Court takes notice that a motion to compel arbitration based on the same agreement as in this case is also pending in San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC v. Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center, Case No. 21-cv-08206 (S.D.N.Y. filed Oct. 5, 2021) (D.I. 36). The parties in that case briefed the issue of who is to decide arbitrability under the 2020 Settlement Agreement the Court or the arbitrator. Id. (D.I. 37, 43, 51). I request that Defendants submit a letter by July 15, 2022, indicating its position on the issue, with argument in support of whatever that position is. If Plaintiffs position differs from its position in New York, it too should submit a letter by July 15th with appropriate argument. The letters are limited to three single-spaced pages. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/12/2022. (nms)
June 3, 2022 Filing 69 REDACTED VERSION of #66 Reply Brief by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting #65 UNOPPOSED Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/31/2022. (nms)
May 27, 2022 Filing 67 REQUEST for Oral Argument by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha) Modified on 5/27/2022 (nms).
May 27, 2022 Filing 66 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #55 Cross Motion to Join the Patent Owner Under Fed. R. Civ. P. and Amend the Complaint, filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 5/27/2022 (nms).
May 27, 2022 Filing 65 UNOPPOSED Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Samantha) Modified on 5/27/2022 (nms).
May 27, 2022 Filing 64 REDACTED VERSION of #63 Combined Answering and Reply Brief, by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 5/31/2022 (nms).
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER Granting #62 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/23/2022. (nms)
May 20, 2022 Filing 63 [SEALED] Combined Answering and Reply Brief re #55 Cross Motion to Join the Patent Owner Under Fed. R. Civ. P. and Amend the Complaint, and #44 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings, filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 5/23/2022 (nms).
May 20, 2022 Filing 62 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 5/23/2022 (nms).
May 13, 2022 Filing 61 REDACTED VERSION of #57 Declaration by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Gaza, Anne)
May 13, 2022 Filing 60 REDACTED VERSION of #56 Combined Opening and Answering Brief, by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 5/16/2022 (nms).
May 13, 2022 Filing 59 REDACTED VERSION of #55 Cross Motion to Join the Patent Owner Under Fed. R. Civ. P. and Amend the Complaint by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Gaza, Anne)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting #54 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/9/2022. (nms)
May 6, 2022 Filing 57 [SEALED] DECLARATION Of Wanda D. French-Brown re #56 Combined Opening and Answering Brief, by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 5/9/2022 (nms).
May 6, 2022 Filing 56 [SEALED] Combined Opening and Answering Brief re #55 Cross Motion to Join the Patent Owner Under Fed. R. Civ. P. and Amend the Complaint, and #44 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings, filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/20/2022. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/13/2022. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 5/9/2022 (nms).
May 6, 2022 Filing 55 [SEALED] Cross Motion to Join the Patent Owner Under Fed. R. Civ. P. and Amend the Complaint - filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-M, #3 Exhibit B, #4 7.1.1 Certification, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 5/9/2022 (nms).
May 6, 2022 Filing 54 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Samantha) Modified on 5/9/2022 (nms).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SO ORDERED Granting #52 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Consolidated Briefing on Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings and Anticipated Rule 19 Motion. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/29/2022. (nms)
April 29, 2022 Filing 52 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Consolidated Briefing on Defendants' Motion (D.I. 44) and Plaintiff's Anticipated Rule 19 Motion by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha)
April 26, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Change of Address for Horton Legal Strategies PLLC by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC (Wilson, Samantha)
April 26, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Alexandra Cavazos as co-counsel.. (Wilson, Samantha)
April 19, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Forrest - filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha)
April 19, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Crystal Law as co-counsel.. (Wilson, Samantha)
April 19, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David Forrest for San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #49 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Forrest, filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/19/2022. (nms)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting #43 UNOPPOSED Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/7/2022. (nms)
April 6, 2022 Filing 46 REDACTED VERSION of #45 Opening Brief in Support, by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 6, 2022 Filing 45 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #44 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings, filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/7/2022 (nms).
April 6, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings - filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/7/2022 (nms).
April 6, 2022 Filing 43 UNOPPOSED Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/7/2022 (nms).
March 11, 2022 Filing 42 REDACTED VERSION of #39 Amended Complaint, by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-M)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 3/11/2022 (nms).
March 11, 2022 Filing 41 REDACTED VERSION of #36 Exhibit to a Document by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Gaza, Anne)
March 9, 2022 Filing 40 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 3/9/2022 (nms).
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #40 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Bluebird Bio, Inc. answer due 4/6/2022; Third Rock Ventures, LLC answer due 4/6/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/9/2022. (nms)
March 7, 2022 Filing 39 [SEALED] Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint for Patent Infringement against all Defendants - filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-M, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 3/7/2022 (nms).
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting #35 UNOPPOSED Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/7/2022. (nms)
March 7, 2022 Remark: The motion referral flag has been removed from the case as the Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #15 has been deactivated as moot. Plaintiff has been granted leave to amend (see D.I. #38 ). (nms)
March 4, 2022 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Sealed Exhibits (D.I. #36 ), by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 3/4/2022 (nms).
March 4, 2022 Filing 36 [SEALED] EXHIBIT to #35 UNOPPOSED Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Complaint, by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 3/4/2022 (nms).
March 4, 2022 Filing 35 UNOPPOSED Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Complaint - filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 3/4/2022 (nms).
March 4, 2022 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC re #36 Sealed Exhibits. Upon review of the filing it was determined it did not comply with Local Rule 5.2(b)(1). Plaintiff is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate certificate of service. (nms)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #32 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings to March 14, 2022. (*Reset Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 3/14/2022). ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 3/2/2022. (ceg)
February 28, 2022 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 28, 2022 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Bluebird Bio, Inc. filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 28, 2022 Filing 32 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings to March 14, 2022 - filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha)
February 23, 2022 Filing 31 Supplemental Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SO ORDERED Granting #29 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Party Name and Case Caption. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/22/2022. (nms)
February 21, 2022 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Amend Party Name and Case Caption by Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORAL ORDER: On or before February 23, 2022, counsel should submit to the Clerk's Office (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.) regarding the pending motion(s) referred to Judge Hall. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/17/2022. (ceg)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (D.I. #15 ) is now REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/14/2022. Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(nms)
February 11, 2022 Filing 26 REDACTED VERSION of #23 Letter by Sloan Kettering Institute for Cancer Research, Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Ewing, Alexandra)
February 11, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: The letter filed at D.I. 26 on 2/10/2022, has been removed from the docket. Upon review of the filing it was determined this was a redacted version of an earlier sealed filing. Counsel is to refile the redacted document using the correct filing code ("Redacted Document") and link it back to the sealed filing it relates with. (nms)
February 7, 2022 Filing 25 REDACTED VERSION of #16 Opening Brief in Support, by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORAL ORDER: The proposed redactions at D.I. #23 are APPROVED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/4/2022. (nms)
February 3, 2022 Filing 23 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Submission of Proposed Redactions Per D.I. 22 - re #22 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Cottrell, Frederick)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: I am unconvinced that there is any need to redact the agreement in its entirety, I request that a proposed redacted version be submitted, with the redactions highlighted in yellow or in some similar fashion so that I can with a minimum of effort determine what it is that is proposed to be redacted. As always, redact only what is truly necessary (see Letter at D.I. #21 ) (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2022. (nms)
February 2, 2022 Filing 21 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Frederick L. Cottrell III, regarding the Court's January 26, 2022 Oral Order (D.I. 20 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 2/3/2022 (nms).
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORAL ORDER: The Agreement in question was signed in 2005. The Declaration (D.I. #19 ) is not sufficient to seal the entire document. The Court will consider proposed redactions to the confidential agreement, which should be filed within a reasonable time. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/26/2022. (nms)
January 21, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Yashodhara Dash re #18 Renewed Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/24/2022 (nms).
January 21, 2022 Filing 18 Renewed Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/24/2022 (nms).
January 20, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Max H. Yusem, Naveen Modi, Joshua M. Bennett, Eric W. Dittmann, and Krystina L. Ho for Bluebird Bio, Inc., and Third Rock Ventures, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORAL ORDER: The motion (D.I. #14 ) does not state a sufficient reason for sealed filings and is therefore denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/18/2022. (nms)
January 14, 2022 Filing 16 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/18/2022 (nms).
January 14, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings - filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/18/2022 (nms).
January 14, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/18/2022 (nms).
January 12, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Dittmann, Max H. Yusem, Joshua M. Bennett, Krystina L. Ho and Naveen Modi - filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Dittmann, Max H. Yusem, Joshua M. Bennett, Krystina L. Ho and Naveen Modi, filed by Third Rock Ventures, LLC, Bluebird Bio, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2022. (nms)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Bluebird Bio, Inc. answer due 1/14/2022; Third Rock Ventures, LLC answer due 1/14/2022) (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/9/2021. (nms)
December 8, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for (1) the deadline for defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint (D.I. 9), (2) in the event that defendants file a motion or motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint (or any other pre-Answer motion), the deadline for plaintiff to respond to any such motion(s), and (3) the deadline for defendants to file a reply to any such motion(s) to January 14, 2022, February 28, 2022 and March 15, 2022, respectively - filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Crystal Law, filed by Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/22/2021. (nms)
November 22, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Crystal Law for Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Crystal Law - filed by Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC. Third Rock Ventures, LLC served on 11/18/2021, answer due 12/9/2021. (Wilson, Samantha)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement, against Bluebird Bio, Inc., Third Rock Ventures, LLC- filed by Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-J)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 11/18/2021 (nms).
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to respond to the Complaint to December 23, 2021 - filed by Bluebird Bio, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Bluebird Bio, Inc. answer due 12/23/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/3/2021. (nms)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wanda D. French-Brown, Mary Jean Kim and Alexandra Cavazos, filed by Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC, and #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lenore Horton, filed by Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/27/2021. (nms)
October 27, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 27, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Mary Jean Kim, Lenore Horton, Wanda D. French-Brown, Alexandra Cavazos for Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC. Bluebird Bio, Inc. served on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Wilson, Samantha)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lenore Horton - filed by Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wanda D. French-Brown, Mary Jean Kim and Alexandra Cavazos - filed by Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC. (Wilson, Samantha)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC. (apk)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,541,179 B2 ;8,058,061 B2. (apk)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Bluebird Bio, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3726353.) - filed by Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)
October 21, 2021 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC v. Bluebird Bio, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Errant Gene Therapeutics, LLC
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Alexandra Cavazos
Represented By: Lenore Horton
Represented By: Mary Jean Kim
Represented By: Wanda D. French-Brown
Represented By: Crystal Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Rocco Therapeutics, LLC
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Alexandra Cavazos
Represented By: Crystal Law
Represented By: Lenore Horton
Represented By: Mary Jean Kim
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Wanda D. French-Brown
Represented By: David Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluebird Bio, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Eric W. Dittmann
Represented By: Joshua M. Bennett
Represented By: Krystina L. Ho
Represented By: Max H. Yusem
Represented By: Naveen Modi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Rock Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Eric W. Dittmann
Represented By: Joshua M. Bennett
Represented By: Krystina L. Ho
Represented By: Max H. Yusem
Represented By: Naveen Modi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?