Teamsters Local Union No. 355 v. Ensinger Penn Fibre, Inc.
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local Union No. 355
Defendant: Ensinger Penn Fibre, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01563
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Teamsters Local Union No. 355: For Ensinger Penn Fibre, Inc. waiver sent on 11/15/2021, answer due 1/14/2022. (Geren, Lance)
November 22, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ashley E. Macaysa for Teamsters Local Union No. 355 added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley E. Macaysa filed by Teamsters Local Union No. 355. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/15/2021. (nmf)
November 12, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul D. Starr for Teamsters Local Union No. 355 added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul D. Starr filed by Teamsters Local Union No. 355. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/10/2021. (nmf)
November 10, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley E. Macaysa - filed by Teamsters Local Union No. 355. (Geren, Lance)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul D. Starr - filed by Teamsters Local Union No. 355. (Geren, Lance)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Ensinger Penn Fibre, Inc. on 11/3/2021. (twk)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Vacate Arbitration Award filed against Ensinger Penn Fibre, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3735294.) - filed by Teamsters Local Union No. 355. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local Union No. 355 v. Ensinger Penn Fibre, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local Union No. 355
Represented By: Lance M. Geren
Represented By: Ashley E. Macaysa
Represented By: Paul D. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensinger Penn Fibre, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?