Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. v. Smitreski et al
Plaintiff: Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.
Defendant: Timothy Smitreski, Diversified NJ, Inc. and I2C Synergy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01586
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.: For Timothy Smitreski waiver sent on 12/21/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. (Cole, Andrew)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Phillip Primack (Primack, David)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Plaintiff Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc's Motion to Remand to the Delaware Court of Chancery filed by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. (Cole, Andrew)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Briefing Deadlines for the Corporate Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Unopposed) filed by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/14/21. (ntl)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Timothy Smitreski on 12/14/2021. See D.I. #17 (smg)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Briefing Deadlines for the Corporate Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Unopposed) - filed by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Andrew)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Letter to Clerk of Court from Andrew L. Cole regarding Summons Directed to Defendant Timothy Smitreski. (Attachments: #1 Summons Forms - Unsigned)(Cole, Andrew)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ivan R. Novich for Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tyler A. Sims for Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Plaintiff Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc's Motion to Remand to the Delaware Court of Chancery filed by Diversified NJ, Inc., I2C Synergy, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Primack, David)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim CORRECTED Motion to Dismiss filed by Diversified NJ, Inc., I2C Synergy, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Primack, David)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim CORRECTED Motion to Dismiss - filed by Diversified NJ, Inc., I2C Synergy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Primack, David)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Diversified NJ, Inc., I2C Synergy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Opening Brief In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Primack, David)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Plaintiff Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc's Motion to Remand to the Delaware Court of Chancery, #11 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Andrew L. Cole by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cole, Andrew)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Plaintiff Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc's Motion to Remand to the Delaware Court of Chancery filed by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/7/2021. (Cole, Andrew)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Plaintiff Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc's Motion to Remand to the Delaware Court of Chancery - filed by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Andrew)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. DiBianca on behalf of Timothy Smitreski (DiBianca, Margaret)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Schreiner filed by I2C Synergy, Inc., Diversified NJ, Inc., #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ivan R. Novich filed by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc., #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lorena E. Ahumada filed by I2C Synergy, Inc., Diversified NJ, Inc., #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tyler A. Sims filed by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/18/21. (ntl)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tyler A. Sims - filed by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Cole, Andrew)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ivan R. Novich - filed by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Cole, Andrew)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal by Diversified NJ, Inc., I2C Synergy, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Primack, David)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Schreiner - filed by Diversified NJ, Inc., I2C Synergy, Inc.. (Primack, David)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lorena E. Ahumada - filed by Diversified NJ, Inc., I2C Synergy, Inc.. (Primack, David)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Lynch Cole on behalf of Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. (Cole, Andrew)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Chancery Court, Case Number 2021-0956-MTZ (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3739772)- filed by Diversified NJ, Inc., Diversified Lighting Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. v. Smitreski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lynch Cole
Represented By: Ivan R. Novich
Represented By: Tyler A. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Smitreski
Represented By: Margaret M. DiBianca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified NJ, Inc.
Represented By: David Phillip Primack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I2C Synergy, Inc.
Represented By: David Phillip Primack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?