Azuma et al v. LeMond Companies, LLC
Plaintiff: Tomo Azuma, Darren Coote, Mark Greenberg, William Morachnick and Ali Azhar
Defendant: LeMond Companies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01627
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST for Oral Argument by LeMond Companies, LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter . (Gilbert, Miranda)
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 Second DECLARATION re #10 Reply Brief of Dean Hendrickson by LeMond Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gilbert, Miranda)
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by LeMond Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Gilbert, Miranda)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Ali Azhar, Tomo Azuma, Darren Coote, Mark Greenberg, William Morachnick.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas Uebler, Esq., #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Murphy, Kathleen)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Andrew Hutchinson, filed by LeMond Companies, LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/20/2021. (kmd)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Andrew Hutchinson - filed by LeMond Companies, LLC. (Gilbert, Miranda)
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by LeMond Companies, LLC. (Gilbert, Miranda)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter of Dean Hendrickson by LeMond Companies, LLC. (Gilbert, Miranda)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by LeMond Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Compliance)(Gilbert, Miranda)
November 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Coote, Tomo Azuma, Mark Greenberg, William Morachnick, Ali Azhar. LeMond Companies, LLC served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Uebler, Thomas)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to LeMond Companies, LLC on 11/18/2021. (twk)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against LeMond Companies, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3746175.) - filed by Darren Coote, Tomo Azuma, Mark Greenberg, William Morachnick, Ali Azhar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azuma et al v. LeMond Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomo Azuma
Represented By: Thomas A. Uebler
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Coote
Represented By: Thomas A. Uebler
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Greenberg
Represented By: Thomas A. Uebler
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Morachnick
Represented By: Thomas A. Uebler
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Azhar
Represented By: Thomas A. Uebler
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeMond Companies, LLC
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Represented By: Miranda N. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?