Witzke v. Seitz et al
Plaintiff: Brooks M. Witzke
Defendant: Collins J. Seitz, Jr., James T. Vaughn, Jr., Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Gary F. Traynor, Karen L. Valihura, Jennifer C. Wasson and Randolph K. Herndon
Case Number: 1:2021cv01637
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to March 7, 2022 - filed by Randolph K. Herndon. (Jameson, Bruce)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to March 7, 2022, filed by Randolph K. Herndon. Reset Answer Deadlines: Randolph K. Herndon answer due 3/7/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/6/2022. (kmd)
January 4, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Karen L. Valihura, James T. Vaughn, Jr, Jennifer C. Wasson, Collins J. Seitz, Jr, Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Gary F. Traynor: For Karen L. Valihura waiver sent on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/7/2022; James T. Vaughn, Jr waiver sent on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/7/2022; Jennifer C. Wasson waiver sent on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/7/2022; Collins J. Seitz, Jr waiver sent on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/7/2022; Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves waiver sent on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/7/2022; Gary F. Traynor waiver sent on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Shen, Zi-Xiang)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Zi-Xiang Shen on behalf of Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Collins J. Seitz, Jr, Gary F. Traynor, Karen L. Valihura, James T. Vaughn, Jr, Jennifer C. Wasson (Shen, Zi-Xiang)
December 29, 2021 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Brooks M. Witzke. Randolph K. Herndon served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter)(apk)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Gregory Day on behalf of Randolph K. Herndon (Day, John)
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce E. Jameson on behalf of Randolph K. Herndon (Jameson, Bruce)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Designation of a District Judge from Another District Court and Request for Appointment of Dean Rodney A. Smolla as a Special Master - filed by Brooks M. Witzke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(smg)
November 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 Letter to Clerk of Court from Brooks M. Witzke regarding his Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. (mal)
November 23, 2021 Remark: Received Civil Cover Sheet and Letter to the Clerk of Court at Intake (via carrier). Civil Cover Sheet were added at D.I. #1 . Hard copies of summonses received through Intake at the Clerk's Office and placed in case jacket. Plaintiff advised the Clerk's Office that he would use the Court's electronic sealed summons for use of service instead. (mal)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for CM/ECF Privileges for Purposes of the Cause of Action - filed by Brooks M. Witzke. (smg)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support re #3 MOTION for an Immediate Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Hearing as soon as Practicable. - filed by Brooks M. Witzke.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/6/2021. (smg)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for an Immediate Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Hearing as soon as Practicable. - filed by Brooks M. Witzke. (smg)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Randolph K. Herndon, Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves, Collins J. Seitz, Jr, Gary F. Traynor, Karen L. Valihura, James T. Vaughn, Jr, Jennifer C. Wasson ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number DEX036433.) - filed by Brooks M. Witzke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J, #2 Letter to Clerk of Court)(smg)
November 22, 2021 Remark: Rule 4 mailed to pro-se plaintiff. (smg)
November 22, 2021 Remark: Electronic copies sent to Duty Judge CFC. (smg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witzke v. Seitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooks M. Witzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collins J. Seitz, Jr.
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Vaughn, Jr.
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamika R. Montgomery-Reeves
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary F. Traynor
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L. Valihura
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer C. Wasson
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph K. Herndon
Represented By: Bruce E. Jameson
Represented By: John Gregory Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?