United States of America v. United States Sugar Corporation et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: United States Sugar Corporation, United Sugars Corportation, Imperial Sugar Company, Louis Dreyfus Company LLC and United Sugars Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01644
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 25
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Third-Party Subpoenas to Indiana Sugars, Inc. filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff United States' Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories filed by United States of America.(Hanna, Brian)
January 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Strong on behalf of United States of America (Strong, Curtis)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Third-Party Subpoenas to Archer-Daniels-Midland Company, Evergreen Sweeteners, Inc., Industrial Commodities, Inc., International Food Products, Inc., and Pullman Sugar, LLC filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Preliminary Fact Witness List filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re #73 Memorandum Opinion DENYING #13 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/11/2022. (dlw)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/11/2022. (dlw)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ANSWER by all defendants to #1 Complaint by United States Sugar Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 1/11/2022 (dlw).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Molly M. Barron, Lindsey S. Champlin, Jennifer L. Giordano, and David L. Johnson for United States Sugar Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: This matter has been referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for ADR. Should any party (or all parties) desire to discuss mediation and its timing, the party(ies) shall contact Judge Thynge and her Law Clerk, Daniel Taylor (#daniel_taylor@ded.uscourts.gov), to request that a teleconference be scheduled. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/10/2022. (Taylor, Daniel)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff United States' Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents, Plaintiff United States' Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories, and Plaintiff United States' Responses and Objections to Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by United States of America.(Hanna, Brian)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Fact Discovery completed by 2/25/2022. Opening Expert Reports due by 2/28/2022. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 3/14/2022. Reply Expert Reports due by 3/25/2022. Expert Discovery due by 3/31/2022. A Pretrial Conference is set for 4/4/2022 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. A 5-day Bench Trial is set for 4/11/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/7/2022. (dlw)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Third-Party Subpoenas to National Confectioners Association and Sweeteners Users Association filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer L. Giordano, Lindsey S. Champlin, Molly M. Barron, David L. Johnson and Christopher S. Yates - filed by United States Sugar Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Joint Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from AUSA Shamoor Anis regarding CONCISE JOINT LETTER - re 61 Oral Order,,. (Anis, Shamoor)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer L. Giordano, Lindsey S. Champlin, Molly M. Barron, David L. Johnson and Christopher S. Yates filed by United States Sugar Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/7/2022. (dlw)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel K. Zach for Imperial Sugar Company and Louis Dreyfus Company LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf (Taylor, Daniel)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Third-Party Subpoenas to Florida Sugar & Molasses Exchange, Inc, L&S Sweeteners, Pullman Sugar, LLC, Sugar Services, LLC, and Sweeteners Plus, LLC filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections of Defendants Louis Dreyfus Company LLC and Imperial Sugar Company to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production filed by Imperial Sugar Company, Louis Dreyfus Company LLC.(Farnan, Kelly)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents filed by United Sugars Corporation.(Hogan, Daniel)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel K. Zach - filed by Imperial Sugar Company, Louis Dreyfus Company LLC. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORAL ORDER re #58 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before January 7, 2022, the parties shall file a CONCISE JOINT LETTER indicating which provisions of the proposed scheduling order deviate from the Court's form scheduling order. For any provision that differs from the Court's usual practice, the parties shall explain the reason for the difference. To be clear, the Court is only seeking a concise statement of the rationale for modifying the form provision; the Court is not inviting argument from any party on the proposed differences. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/6/2022. (dlw)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding proposed scheduling order - re #58 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order . (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 58 has been replaced on the docket. The motion now contains signatures for all parties. (dlw)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #62 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel K. Zach filed by Louis Dreyfus Company LLC, Imperial Sugar Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/6/2022. (dlw)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Brian Hanna (representing the United States) regarding D.I. 58 Proposed Scheduling Order - re #58 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order . (Hanna, Brian)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order - filed by United States of America. (Hanna, Brian) (Main Document 58 replaced on 1/6/2022) (dlw).
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Taticchi, Jessica)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit subpoenas)(Ptacek, Jill)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas filed by United States of America.(Taticchi, Jessica)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Notice of Third-Party Subpoenas to Mars, Inc. and The Coca-Cola Company and (2) Notice of Third-Party Subpoena to Nestle USA, Inc. filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas filed by United States of America.(Taticchi, Jessica)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas filed by United States of America.(Ptacek, Jill)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Third-Party Subpoenas to Chattanooga Bakery, Inc, General Mills, Inc., Kens Foods, Inc., Kings Hawaiian Holding Co, Inc., Krispy Kreme, Inc., PepsiCo, Inc., Piedmont Candy Company, Inc., The Hershey Company, The J.M. Smucker Company, and The Kraft Heinz Company filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/3/2022. (dlw)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff United States of America: Directed to United States Department of Agriculture filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Third-Party Subpoena to Rio Grande Valley, Sugar Growers, Inc. filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas filed by United States of America.(Taticchi, Jessica)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas filed by United States of America.(Ptacek, Jill)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff United States of America and (2) Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff United States of America filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Third-Party Subpoenas to Brill Bakery Solutions LLC (f/k/a CSM Bakery Solutions LLC), Danone North America Public Benefit Corporation, and McKee Foods Corporation filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Request of Production of Documents on Defendants Imperial Sugar Company, United States Sugar Corporation, and United Sugars Corporation filed by United States of America.(Hanna, Brian)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Third-Party Subpoenas filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROPOSED ORDER -- Protective Order -- by United States Sugar Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Third-Party Subpoenas to Atlantic Ingredients, Batory Foods Inc., CSC Sugar LLC, Michigan Sugar Company, National Sugar Marketing Cooperative, Inc., Southern Minnesota Beet Sugar Cooperative, Sucden Americas Corporation, Sucro Can Sourcing LLC, Sweetener Supply Corporation, The Amalgamated Sugar Company LLC, Western Sugar Cooperative, and Zucrum Foods LLC filed by United States Sugar Corporation.(Egan, Brian)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Timothy J. Pabst and Sharon R. Markowitz by United Sugars Corporation (Hogan, Daniel)
December 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 12/15/21 before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Court Reporter Dale C. Hawkins,Email: Dale_Hawkins@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2022. (Triozzi, Heather)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia filed by United States Sugar Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REDACTED VERSION of #33 Exhibit to a Document by United States of America. (Ptacek, Jill)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 36 and 37 have been deleted from the docket at the request of counsel. (dlw)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter J. Schwingler for United Sugars Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Telephone Conference held on 12/15/2021. The parties shall follow the Court's directives as discussed. The transcript shall serve as the Court's ruling. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) (asw)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Schwingler - filed by United Sugars Corporation. (Hogan, Daniel)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Telephone Conference is set for 12/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Counsel shall provide a teleconference dial-in number and code for the teleconference by emailing this Court's judicial administrator. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/14/2021. (dlw)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 33 through 40 have been deleted from the docket and re-filed as one document containing all SEALED exhibits. (dlw)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter Barbur, Timothy Cameron, David Marriott, and Christine Varney filed by Louis Dreyfus Company LLC, Imperial Sugar Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/14/2021. (dlw)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Timothy G. Cameron, Peter T. Barbur, Christine A. Varney, and David R. Marriott for Imperial Sugar Company and Louis Dreyfus Company LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Schwingler filed by United Sugars Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/14/2021. (dlw)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Marriott for Imperial Sugar Company and Louis Dreyfus Company LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 [SEALED] EXHIBITS 1-6, 18-19 re #32 Declaration by United States of America. (dlw)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DECLARATION of Jill Ptacek re #30 Answering Brief in Opposition by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 20, #13 Exhibit 21, #14 Exhibit 22)(Ptacek, Jill) Modified on 12/14/2021 (dlw).
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter Barbur, Timothy Cameron, David Marriott, and Christine Varney - filed by Imperial Sugar Company, Louis Dreyfus Company LLC. (Farnan, Kelly)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia filed by United States of America.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/20/2021. (Mincer, Jonathan)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Ptacek on behalf of United States of America (Ptacek, Jill)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Chinita M. Sinkler on behalf of United States of America (Sinkler, Chinita)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenigh Garrett on behalf of United States of America (Garrett, Jenigh)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Taticchi on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Taticchi, Jessica)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Yakov Mincer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mincer, Jonathan)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Thornburgh, II on behalf of United States of America (Thornburgh, John)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to DOJ's letter - re #22 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Sharon R. Markowitz and Timothy J. Pabst for United Sugars Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Brian Hanna (representing the United States) regarding response to Defendants' letter (D.I. 20) and the Court's Oral Order (D.I. 21). (Hanna, Brian)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORAL ORDER re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, #20 Letter - Having reviewed Defendants' letter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the answering brief in opposition to the Motion to Transfer shall be filed on or before 12/13/2021 and the reply brief shall be filed on or before 12/17/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event the motion to transfer is denied, this Court will hold a bench trial the week of 4/11/2022. (Set Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 12/13/2021. Reply Brief due 12/17/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/6/2021. (dlw)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request for conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Darryl Wade Anderson for Imperial Sugar Company and Louis Dreyfus Company LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by United States Sugar Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Robert H. Buker, Jr. re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia by United States Sugar Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/6/2021 (dlw).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of Michael Gorrell re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia by United States Sugar Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/6/2021 (dlw).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of Matthew Wineinger re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia by United States Sugar Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/6/2021 (dlw).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION of Lindsey Champlin re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia by United States Sugar Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/6/2021 (dlw).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia filed by United States Sugar Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/17/2021. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia - filed by United States Sugar Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy J. Pabst - filed by United Sugars Corporation. (Hogan, Daniel)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sharon R. Markowitz - filed by United Sugars Corporation. (Hogan, Daniel)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Darryl Wade Anderson, Vic Domen, and Amanda Wait filed by Louis Dreyfus Company LLC, Imperial Sugar Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/3/2021. (dlw)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Vic J. Domen, Jr. for Imperial Sugar Company and Louis Dreyfus Company LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amanda Wait for Imperial Sugar Company and Louis Dreyfus Company LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sharon R. Markowitz, #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy J. Pabst filed by United Sugars Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/3/2021. (dlw)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Darryl Wade Anderson, Vic Domen, and Amanda Wait - filed by Imperial Sugar Company, Louis Dreyfus Company LLC. (Farnan, Kelly)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America: For Louis Dreyfus Company LLC waiver sent on 11/26/2021, answer due 1/25/2022. (Hanna, Brian)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America: For Imperial Sugar Company waiver sent on 11/26/2021, answer due 1/25/2022. (Hanna, Brian)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America: For United Sugars Corportation waiver sent on 11/26/2021, answer due 1/25/2022. (Hanna, Brian)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America: For United States Sugar Corporation waiver sent on 11/26/2021, answer due 1/25/2022. (Hanna, Brian)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amanda P. Reeves, Lawrence E. Buterman and Elyse M. Greenwald - filed by United States Sugar Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amanda P. Reeves, Lawrence E. Buterman and Elyse M. Greenwald filed by United States Sugar Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/30/2021. (dlw)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lawrence E. Buterman, Amanda P. Reeves, and Elyse M. Greenwald for United States Sugar Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (smg)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Hanna on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hanna, Brian)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Imperial Sugar Company, Louis Dreyfus Company LLC, United States Sugar Corporation, United Sugars Corportation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. United States Sugar Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Laura D. Hatcher
Represented By: Brian E. Hanna
Represented By: Shamoor Anis
Represented By: Chinita M. Sinkler
Represented By: Curtis Strong
Represented By: Jenigh J. Garrett
Represented By: Jessica Taticchi
Represented By: Jill Ptacek
Represented By: John R Thornburgh, II
Represented By: Jonathan Yakov Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Sugar Corporation
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Amanda P. Reeves
Represented By: Lindsey S. Champlin
Represented By: Molly M. Barron
Represented By: David L. Johnson
Represented By: Elyse M. Greenwald
Represented By: Jennifer L. Giordano
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Sugars Corportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Sugar Company
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Amanda Wait
Represented By: Christine A. Varney
Represented By: Daniel K. Zach
Represented By: Darryl Wade Anderson
Represented By: David R. Marriott
Represented By: Peter T. Barbur
Represented By: Timothy G. Cameron
Represented By: Vic J. Domen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Dreyfus Company LLC
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Amanda Wait
Represented By: Christine A. Varney
Represented By: Daniel K. Zach
Represented By: Darryl Wade Anderson
Represented By: David R. Marriott
Represented By: Peter T. Barbur
Represented By: Timothy G. Cameron
Represented By: Vic J. Domen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Sugars Corporation
Represented By: Daniel K. Hogan
Represented By: Peter J. Schwingler
Represented By: Sharon R. Markowitz
Represented By: Timothy J. Pabst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?