TOURE v. AUTO EQUITY LOANS OF DE, LLC, ET AL.
Plaintiff: IBRAHIMA TOURE
Cross Defendant: AUTO EQUITY LOANS OF DE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01722
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 EXHIBIT re #5 Answering Brief in Opposition, NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by IBRAHIMA TOURE. (Billion, Mark)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STATEMENT of Pending Matters Requiring Judicial Action Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by IBRAHIMA TOURE. (Billion, Mark)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Evan L. Frank, Esq. - filed by AUTO EQUITY LOANS OF DE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spence, Stephen)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Anthony Spence on behalf of AUTO EQUITY LOANS OF DE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spence, Stephen)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Evan L. Frank, Esq. filed by AUTO EQUITY LOANS OF DE, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/21/21. (ntl)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert P. Cocco filed by IBRAHIMA TOURE. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/20/21. (ntl)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert P. Cocco - filed by IBRAHIMA TOURE. (Billion, Mark)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark M. Billion on behalf of IBRAHIMA TOURE (Billion, Mark)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 1/6/2022. (srs)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Record of case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:21-cv-03716. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. IS DISMISSED BY VERBAL AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES. THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE DEEMED AMENDED TO REFLECT THIS COURT'S SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED. THE CLERK SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS AND RESOLUTION OF THE PENDING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STRIKE JURY DEMAND AS MAY BE DEEMED APPROPIATE BY THAT COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 12/7/21. 12/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY. Rule 16 Conference held on 12/6/21. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by IBRAHIMA TOURE re #1 Complaint (Attorney), of dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Intl Rec Systems Inc. ONLY (COCCO, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Discovery Plan by IBRAHIMA TOURE.(COCCO, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 12/6/2021 AT 1:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DEFENDANT, INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against AUTO EQUITY LOANS OF DE, LLC by INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(VIOLAGO, ERICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE: A PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 12/10/2021 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ERICK V. VIOLAGO on behalf of INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. with Certificate of Service(VIOLAGO, ERICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC..(VOKOLOS, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE W. VOKOLOS on behalf of INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. with Jury Demand(VOKOLOS, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Transfer Venue, Compel Arbitration, and Strike Jury Demand filed by IBRAHIMA TOURE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COCCO, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Venue, Compel Arbitration, and Strike Jury Demand filed by AUTO EQUITY LOANS OF DE, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(FRANK, EVAN)[Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IBRAHIMA TOURE re: sharlene brooks served Summons and Complaint upon AUTO EQUITY LOANS OF DE, LLC by personal service. AUTO EQUITY LOANS OF DE, LLC served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (COCCO, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IBRAHIMA TOURE re: ERIC KRAMER served Summons and Complaint upon INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. by PERSONAL SERVICE. INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (COCCO, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to AUTO EQUITY LOANS OF DE, LLC, INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/23/21 (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC., auto equity loans of DE llc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15350278.), filed by IBRAHIMA SORY TOURE. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(COCCO, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOURE v. AUTO EQUITY LOANS OF DE, LLC, ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBRAHIMA TOURE
Represented By: Mark M. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: AUTO EQUITY LOANS OF DE, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Anthony Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?