TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY, et al. v. EIS, INC.
Petitioner: INDIANA UNIVERSITY CENTER FOR SEXUAL HEALTH PROMOTION and TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY
Respondent: EIS Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021mc00389
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/25/2021. (srs)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 Record of case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:21-mc-00066. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Delaware. Case transferred electronically to Delaware on 9/23/2021. (SWM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 *** PLEASE DISREGARD - SEE DKT. NUMBER #9 *** Transfer Letter to the Clerk of the District of Delaware. Case transferred electronically to the District of Delaware on 9/24/2021. (SWM) Modified on 9/24/2021 (SWM). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 *** Please Disregard - See Dkt. #9 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the District Court of Delaware. Case transferred electronically to the District of Delaware on 9/24/2021. (SWM) Modified on 9/24/2021 (SWM). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Transferring Subpoena-Related Motion Under Rule 45(f) -The Trustees of Indiana University ("IU") have filed a motion to quash a documents subpoena and a deposition subpoena issued to the Indiana University Center for Sexual Health Promotion in underlying litigation pending in the District of Delaware. The motion contains IU's consent to the transfer of its motion to the issuing court as provided by Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f). Related subpoenas also have been issued to an IU professor, Dr. Debra Herbenick, and she has filed a motion to quash under a separate miscellaneous case pending in this court. Being duly advised, the court hereby TRANSFERS the motion filed by IU to the District of Delaware for adjudication in the case styled EIS, Inc. v. IntiHealth Ger GmbH, et al., Cause No. 19-1227-LPS. By separate order, the court is also transferring the motion filed by Dr. Debra Herbenick. The court directs the Clerk to close this miscellaneous case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/23/2021.(SWM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-mc-00066-JPH-DML, on all future filings in this matter. (LMK) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/21/2021. (DMB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding Judge Assignment in Miscellaneous Case. Judge James Patrick Hanlon and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker assigned. Please include the complete case number, 1:21-mc-00066-JPH-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (TEXT-ENTRY: There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (LMK) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Motion to Quash Subpoena, filed by INDIANA UNIVERSITY CENTER FOR SEXUAL HEALTH PROMOTION. (Filing fee $49, receipt number 0756-6753811)(Gannon, Thomas) Modified on 9/20/2021 (LMK). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Gannon on behalf of Movant INDIANA UNIVERSITY CENTER FOR SEXUAL HEALTH PROMOTION. (Gannon, Thomas) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY, et al. v. EIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INDIANA UNIVERSITY CENTER FOR SEXUAL HEALTH PROMOTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: EIS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?