CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd. v. MerchSource, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd.
Defendant: MerchSource, LLC and Discovery Communications, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00041
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Referring Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 30 Report to the Register of Copyrights. (ntl)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 1/5/23. (ntl)
January 4, 2023 Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #28 Stipulation and Order to Stay and Joint Status Report filed by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd. -- Case Stayed. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/14/22. (ntl)
September 13, 2022 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Stay and Joint Status Report - filed by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Hall. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/13/22. (ntl)
September 8, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (smg)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SO ORDERED, #26 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 7/13/2022. (ceg)
July 6, 2022 Filing 26 Joint PROPOSED Protective Order by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 7/6/2022 (ceg).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 6/15/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2024. Answering Brief due 6/20/2024. Reply Brief due 7/18/2024. All discovery deadlines are stayed pending completion of private mediation proceedings, aside from the deadline to submit a Protective Order per D.I. #24 . Dates for hearings, pretrial conference, and trial will be determined when an Article III judge is assigned. (*See Order for complete details). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 6/10/2022. (ceg)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #24 Joint Stipulation and Order to Stay Discovery Deadlines. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 6/9/2022. (ceg)
June 7, 2022 Filing 24 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay Discovery Deadlines - filed by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 6/8/2022 (ceg).
June 7, 2022 Filing 23 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 6/9/2022 (ceg).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' proposed scheduling order (D.I. #21 ) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' proposal shall be adopted. The parties' request for referral of this case to a magistrate judge of this Court for mediation (D.I. #20 ) is DENIED. The parties are not precluded from engaging the services of a private mediator. Should the parties still wish to stay discovery pending mediation, they may file a stipulation. The parties shall submit a revised version of the scheduling order within 7 days. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/31/2022. (ceg)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #19 Stipulation to Extend Time for the parties to submit a proposed Scheduling Order to May 25, 2022. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/31/2022. (ceg)
May 25, 2022 Filing 21 Letter to The Honorable Jennifer L. Hall from Nitika Gupta Fiorella regarding Attaching Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 5/26/2022 (ceg).
May 25, 2022 Filing 20 Letter to The Honorable Jennifer L. Hall from Nitika Gupta Fiorella regarding Request for Magistrate Judge for Mediation. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
May 20, 2022 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed Scheduling Order to May 25, 2022 - filed by Discovery Communications, LLC, MerchSource, LLC. (Flynn, Michael)
May 4, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) and First Set of Requests For Production (Nos. 1-18) filed by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
May 4, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) MerchSource's First Set of Requests for Production and (2) Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories - filed by Discovery Communications, LLC, MerchSource, LLC.(Flynn, Michael)
April 13, 2022 Filing 16 ORAL ORDER: The parties having filed the appropriate form advising the Court that they do not unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, until further order of the Court, this case will remain assigned to the VAC (2022) docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall solely for the following purposes: (1) to adjudicate discovery (including fact and expert discovery) and protective order disputes; (2) to issue or modify a scheduling order; (3) to review stipulated orders and pro hac vice motions; and (4) to review requests for mediation in cases other than patent and securities cases. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 4/13/22. (etg)
April 13, 2022 Filing 15 VAC Magistrate Non-Consent completed by the parties filed by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
March 30, 2022 Filing 14 VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl)
March 30, 2022 Filing 13 ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-3 (March 16, 2022), which are available on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before A United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant Order, no later than fourteen (14) days after the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any order referring any part of this case to a Magistrate Judge is VACATED. Unless the parties consent to having a Magistrate Judge handle this case, a referral order will be entered to permit a Magistrate Judge (to be selected by the Court) to do only the following: (a) adjudicate discovery (including fact and expert discovery) and protective order disputes; (b) issue or modify a scheduling order; (c) review stipulated orders and pro hac vice motions; and (d) review requests for mediation in cases other than patent and securities cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any scheduling order that has been entered in this case is AMENDED such as follows: (a) the dates for any motions hearings are VACATED; and (b) the dates for any claim construction hearings are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 3/30/22. (ntl)
March 30, 2022 Case Reassigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (ntl)
March 29, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark C Johnson for Discovery Communications, LLC and MerchSource, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
March 28, 2022 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Discovery, Inc. for Discovery Communications, LLC filed by Discovery Communications, LLC. (Flynn, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent 360 Holdings III Corp., Other Affiliate 360 Holdings II Corp., Other Affiliate 360 Holdings I Corp. for MerchSource, LLC filed by MerchSource, LLC. (Flynn, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Discovery Communications, LLC, MerchSource, LLC.(Flynn, Michael)
February 18, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Johnson - filed by Discovery Communications, LLC, MerchSource, LLC. (Flynn, Michael)
February 18, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 28, 2022 - filed by Discovery Communications, LLC, MerchSource, LLC. (Flynn, Michael)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Johnson filed by Discovery Communications, LLC, MerchSource, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/18/22. (ntl)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 28, 2022 filed by Discovery Communications, LLC, MerchSource, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/18/22. (ntl)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lawrence K. Kolodney and Kayleigh E. McGlynn filed by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/16/22. (ntl)
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lawrence K. Kolodney and Kayleigh E. McGlynn - filed by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd.. Discovery Communications, LLC served on 2/4/2022, answer due 2/25/2022. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd.. MerchSource, LLC served on 2/4/2022, answer due 2/25/2022. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
January 19, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 12, 2022 No Summons Issued. (mal)
January 11, 2022 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s)TX-9-042-205; Mailed a copy of the report to the Register of Copyrights. (mal)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
January 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Discovery Communications, LLC, MerchSource, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3779369.) - filed by CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd. v. MerchSource, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIC Components Industries Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Nitika Gupta Fiorella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MerchSource, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Mark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery Communications, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Mark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?