Ally Financial Inc. v. U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ally Financial Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company and Markel Bermuda Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00064
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Referring Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Approving Magistrate Consent submitted by parties. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/12/22. (ntl)
April 12, 2022 Filing 19 VAC Magistrate Consent completed by the parties filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company (Phillips, John)
April 7, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ally Financial Inc.. (Rostocki, Brian)
April 1, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ally Financial Inc. as to Illinois National Insurance Company (Rostocki, Brian)
March 30, 2022 Filing 16 VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl)
March 30, 2022 Filing 15 ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-3 (March 16, 2022), which are available on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before A United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant Order, no later than fourteen (14) days after the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any order referring any part of this case to a Magistrate Judge is VACATED. Unless the parties consent to having a Magistrate Judge handle this case, a referral order will be entered to permit a Magistrate Judge (to be selected by the Court) to do only the following: (a) adjudicate discovery (including fact and expert discovery) and protective order disputes; (b) issue or modify a scheduling order; (c) review stipulated orders and pro hac vice motions; and (d) review requests for mediation in cases other than patent and securities cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any scheduling order that has been entered in this case is AMENDED such as follows: (a) the dates for any motions hearings are VACATED; and (b) the dates for any claim construction hearings are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 3/30/22. (ntl)
March 30, 2022 Case Reassigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (ntl)
March 17, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/24/2022. (Phillips, John)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for U.S. Specialty to submit its answering brief in opposition to Ally's Motion to Remand (D.I. 11) and the deadline for Ally to submit its reply brief in support of its Motion to Remand to March 17, 2022 and April 7, 2022 - filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/24/2022. (etg)
February 21, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for U.S. Specialty to submit its answering brief in opposition to Ally's Motion to Remand (D.I. 11) and the deadline for Ally to submit its reply brief in support of its Motion to Remand to March 17, 2022 and April 7, 2022 - filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Bilson, David)
February 17, 2022 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ally Financial Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2022. (Rostocki, Brian)
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Ally Financial Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification Pursuant to D. Del. Local Rule 7.1.1)(Rostocki, Brian)
February 9, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys David M. Halbreich, Courtney Horrigan, Miranda A. Jannuzzi, and Robert J. Tritschler for Ally Financial Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
February 8, 2022 Filing 10 Joint STATEMENT Concerning Removed Case Pursuant to D. Del. L.R. 81.2 by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Bilson, David)
February 8, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.(Bilson, David)
February 8, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David M. Halbreich, Courtney C.T. Horrigan, Miranda A. Jannuzzi, and Robert J. Tritschler - filed by Ally Financial Inc.. (Rostocki, Brian)
February 8, 2022 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ally Financial Inc.. (Rostocki, Brian)
February 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ally Financial Inc. as to Defendant Markel Bermuda Ltd. (Rostocki, Brian)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David M. Halbreich, Courtney C.T. Horrigan, Miranda A. Jannuzzi, and Robert J. Tritschler filed by Ally Financial Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/8/22. (ntl)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph A. Bailey, III and Raymond D. Pinkham filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/24/22. (ntl)
January 24, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Raymond D. Pinkham for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant U.S. Specialty to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 8, 2022 filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/24/22. (ntl)
January 24, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph A. Bailey, III for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant U.S. Specialty to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 8, 2022 - filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Bilson, David)
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph A. Bailey, III and Raymond D. Pinkham - filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph A. Bailey III, #2 Certification of Raymond D. Pinkham)(Bilson, David)
January 19, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Houston Casualty Company, Other Affiliates Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Illium, Inc., HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Tokio Marine HCC, and Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd. for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (twk)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N21C-11-00222-MMJ-CCLD (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3782931)- filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ally Financial Inc. v. U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ally Financial Inc.
Represented By: Alexandria Phyllis Murphy
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Represented By: Courtney Horrigan
Represented By: David M. Halbreich
Represented By: Miranda A. Jannuzzi
Represented By: Robert J. Tritschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Joseph A. Bailey, III
Represented By: Raymond D. Pinkham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel Bermuda Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?