Hoi v. Kuo-Hua et al
Plaintiff: Flora Hoi
Defendant: Chang Kuo-Hua, EVA Airways Corporation Board of Directors, Ko Lee-Ching, Tai Jiin-Chyuan, Sun Chia-Ming, Liao Chi-Wei, Chien You-Hsin, Hsu Shun-Hsiung, Wu Chung-Pao, EVA Airways Corporation Board Officers, Ho Ching-Sheng, Hsu Hui-Sen, Chen Yao-Min, Hsiao Chin-Lung, Tsai Ta-Wei and EVA Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv00112
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2022)
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION re #15 Reply Brief, -- Declaration of Anthony D. Raucci -- by EVA Airways Corporation. (Raucci, Anthony)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Intervene , #14 MOTION Managing Pleadings for Application for Enlargement, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas filed by EVA Airways Corporation. (Raucci, Anthony)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Manage Pleadings for Application Enlargement - filed by Flora Hoi. (twk)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas T. Liu,Andrea R. Milano for EVA Airways Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas T. Liu and Andrea R. Milano filed by EVA Airways Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/3/22. (ntl)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas T. Liu and Andrea R. Milano - filed by EVA Airways Corporation. (Raucci, Anthony)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Evergreen Marine Corp. (Taiwan) Ltd. for EVA Airways Corporation filed by EVA Airways Corporation. (Raucci, Anthony)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas filed by EVA Airways Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/16/2022. (Raucci, Anthony)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative,, MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas - filed by EVA Airways Corporation. (Raucci, Anthony)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION re #7 MOTION to Intervene by EVA Airways Corporation. (Raucci, Anthony)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Intervene filed by EVA Airways Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/16/2022. (Raucci, Anthony)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene - filed by EVA Airways Corporation. (Raucci, Anthony)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Corporate Trust Company - Eva Airways Corporation, Board of Directors - Eva Airways Corporation on 2/7/22, filed by Flora Hoi. (mal)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT for F.R.Civ.P. 4 - filed by Flora Hoi. (twk)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Application for Leave to File by Flora Hoi. (smg)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (smg)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Liao Chi-Wei, Sun Chia-Ming, Hsiao Chin-Lung, Ho Ching-Sheng, Wu Chung-Pao, EVA Airways Corporation Board Officers, EVA Airways Corporation Board of Directors, Hsu Hui-Sen, Tai Jiin-Chyuan, Chang Kuo-Hua, Ko Lee-Ching, Hsu Shun-Hsiung, Tsai Ta-Wei, Chen Yao-Min, Chien You-Hsin ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number DEX036922.) - filed by Flora Hoi. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2 - OSHA Complaint, #3 Appendix 2 - 2021-03-24, #4 Appendix 3 - Notice Reinstatement, #5 Appendix 4 - Corporate Layoff Letter, #6 Appendix 5 - Notice Correction ADEA Violation, #7 Appendix 6 - EEOC Complaint, #8 Appendix 7 - Corporation Statement, #9 Notice of Right to Sue Appendix 8, #10 Appendix 9 - Request Position Statement, #11 Appendix 10 - Notice to sue, #12 Cover Letter, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: Requested copies, Summons, Rule 4 and Acknowledgment, Magistrate Consent and Acknowledgement, and Pro Se Privacy Notice mailed to pro se plaintiff. (smg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoi v. Kuo-Hua et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Hoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chang Kuo-Hua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVA Airways Corporation Board of Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ko Lee-Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tai Jiin-Chyuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Chia-Ming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liao Chi-Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chien You-Hsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hsu Shun-Hsiung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wu Chung-Pao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVA Airways Corporation Board Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ho Ching-Sheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hsu Hui-Sen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chen Yao-Min
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hsiao Chin-Lung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tsai Ta-Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVA Airways Corporation
Represented By: Andrea R. Milano
Represented By: Anthony David Raucci
Represented By: Thomas T. Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?