SmartSky Networks, LLC v. Gogo Business Aviation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SmartSky Networks, LLC
Defendant: Gogo Business Aviation, LLC and Gogo Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00266
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2022)
Referring Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 1 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2023 Filing 132 First AMENDED COMPLAINT - against Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.- filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.(Smith, Rodger)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #130 STIPULATION and Order Regarding First Amended and Supplemental Complaint filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 2/21/23. (ntl)
February 17, 2023 Filing 131 Letter to The Honorable Gregory B. Williams from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Revised Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Revised Proposed Scheduling Order)(Smith, Rodger)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION and Order Regarding First Amended and Supplemental Complaint - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - First Amended Patent Infringement Complaint, #2 Exhibits 1-6 to Amended Complaint, #3 Ex. 2 - Redline)(Smith, Rodger)
February 14, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leif E. Peterson, II for Gogo Business Aviation, LLC and for Gogo Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #129 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leif E. Peterson II filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 2/10/23. (ntl)
February 9, 2023 Filing 129 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leif E. Peterson II - filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Cragg, Tyler)
January 30, 2023 Filing 128 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SmartSky Networks, LLC's Initial Infringement Contentions - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.(Smith, Rodger)
December 30, 2022 Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Core Technical Documents and Sales Figures filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc..(Schoenbaum, Griffin)
December 1, 2022 Filing 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc..(Cragg, Tyler)
December 1, 2022 Filing 125 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SmartSky Networks, LLC's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.(Smith, Rodger)
November 30, 2022 Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SmartSky Networks, LLC's Identification of Accused Products and Asserted Patents - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.(Smith, Rodger)
November 21, 2022 Filing 123 PROPOSED ORDER -- Scheduling Order -- re 120 Order,,, by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 The Honorable Gregory B. Williams)(Smith, Rodger)
November 17, 2022 Filing 122 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by SmartSky Networks, LLC (Smith, Rodger)
October 25, 2022 Filing 121 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate GoGo Intermediate Holdings LLC for Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc. filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Schoenbaum, Griffin)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORAL ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, not later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint proposed Scheduling Order in this action consistent with the applicable form Scheduling Order of Judge Williams, which is posted at http://www/ded/uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Williams, Forms), along with a cover letter requesting the Court to enter the joint proposed Scheduling Order (if there are no disputes or other issues concerning scheduling that the Court needs to address) or to schedule the Scheduling Conference. If there are disputes or other issues the Court needs to address in the joint proposed Scheduling Order, in the cover letter, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in the joint proposed Scheduling Order which those appear. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/21/22. (ntl)
October 14, 2022 Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #114 Order, #113 Memorandum Opinion . Appeal filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
October 14, 2022 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #119 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number ADEDC-3982098.) (Smith, Rodger)
October 14, 2022 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #119 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (nmg)
October 11, 2022 Filing 118 SUR-REPLY BRIEF re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #100 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Gogo's Motion to Dismiss Count IV of SmartSky's Complaint filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/7/2022. (etg)
October 4, 2022 Filing 116 REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION of #113 Memorandum Opinion. (ntl)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #115 Joint MOTION to Seal and Redact Memorandum Opinion filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/3/22. (ntl)
October 3, 2022 Filing 115 [SEALED] Joint MOTION to Seal and Redact Memorandum Opinion - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Rodger)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER re #113 Memorandum Opinion -- #97 MOTION to Strike filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc. is DENIED; #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/26/22. (ntl)
September 26, 2022 Filing 113 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM OPINION re pending motions. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/26/22. This order has been emailed to local counsel. (ntl)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: It is HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is no longer referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. This matter has been reassigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/22/22. (ntl)
September 8, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (smg)
August 19, 2022 Filing 112 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Sarah E. Simonetti) by SmartSky Networks, LLC (Smith, Rodger)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #111 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik R. Puknys filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/17/2022. (Taylor, Daniel)
August 16, 2022 Filing 111 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erik R. Puknys - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
July 21, 2022 Filing 110 REDACTED VERSION of #108 Reply Brief by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Cragg, Tyler)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #105 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to file their reply brief in further support of their Motion to Strike to July 15, 2022 filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/18/2022. (Taylor, Daniel)
July 15, 2022 Filing 109 Supplemental DECLARATION re #108 Reply Brief by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - 3)(Farnan, Kelly)
July 15, 2022 Filing 108 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #97 MOTION to Strike #85 Reply Brief, #86 Declaration Improper Reply Arguments filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
July 8, 2022 Filing 107 REDACTED VERSION of #104 Declaration by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5)(Simonetti, Sarah)
July 8, 2022 Filing 106 REDACTED VERSION of #103 Answering Brief in Opposition, by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Simonetti, Sarah)
July 6, 2022 Filing 105 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to file their reply brief in further support of their Motion to Strike to July 15, 2022 - filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
July 1, 2022 Filing 104 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #103 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Ryan Corbett - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 1-5)(Smith, Rodger)
July 1, 2022 Filing 103 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #97 MOTION to Strike #85 Reply Brief, #86 Declaration Improper Reply Arguments - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/8/2022. (Smith, Rodger)
July 1, 2022 Filing 102 STATEMENT re #100 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Gogo's Motion to Dismiss Count IV of SmartSky's Complaint by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORAL ORDER Re: Courtesy Copies: Since this matter has been referred to me solely for the following purposes: "(1) to adjudicate discovery (including fact and expert discovery) and protective order disputes; (2) to issue or modify a scheduling order; (3) to review stipulated orders and pro hac vice motions; and (4) to review requests for mediation in cases other than patent and securities cases[,]" D.I. 58 , I will not be addressing any of the pending motions in this matter. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that the parties are not to provide the court with courtesy copies of any documents filed via CM/ECF. Should I require courtesy copies--which is highly unlikely in this matter--I will request them. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/21/2022. (dat)
June 17, 2022 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Gogo's Motion to Dismiss Count IV of SmartSky's Complaint - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger)
June 17, 2022 Filing 99 DECLARATION re #97 MOTION to Strike #85 Reply Brief, #86 Declaration Improper Reply Arguments Nathaniel C. Love by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Kelly)
June 17, 2022 Filing 98 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #97 MOTION to Strike #85 Reply Brief, #86 Declaration Improper Reply Arguments filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2022. (Farnan, Kelly)
June 17, 2022 Filing 97 MOTION to Strike #85 Reply Brief, #86 Declaration Improper Reply Arguments - filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly)
June 13, 2022 Filing 96 REDACTED VERSION of #88 Declaration, by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 97-107, #2 Exs. 108-124)(Simonetti, Sarah)
June 13, 2022 Filing 95 REDACTED VERSION of #87 Declaration by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Simonetti, Sarah)
June 13, 2022 Filing 94 REDACTED VERSION of #86 Declaration by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Simonetti, Sarah)
June 13, 2022 Filing 93 REDACTED VERSION of #85 Reply Brief by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Simonetti, Sarah)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 SO ORDERED, re #91 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff SmartSky Networks, LLC to file redacted versions of its Preliminary Injunction Reply Brief (D.I. 85) and supporting Declarations (D.I. 86, 87, 88) to June 13, 2022 filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/13/2022. (dat)
June 10, 2022 Filing 91 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff SmartSky Networks, LLC to file redacted versions of its Preliminary Injunction Reply Brief (D.I. 85) and supporting Declarations (D.I. 86, 87, 88) to June 13, 2022 - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Simonetti, Sarah)
June 9, 2022 Filing 90 Letter to The Honorable Court from Rodger D. Smith II regarding request that the Court schedule a hearing on SmartSky's Motion for Preliminary Injunction - re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction -. (Smith, Rodger)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORAL ORDER Re: Courtesy Copies. This matter has been assigned to a vacant judgeship, designated VAC on the docket. The parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. Pursuant to 5 of Standing Order 2022-VAC-1 (dated March 9, 2022) or 3 of Standing Order 2022-3 (dated March 16, 2022), this matter is referred to this Judge for limited purposes. For the pleadings and all matters within the scope of the referral to this Judge, the parties shall provide the Court two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits, etc.). This provision also applies to papers filed under seal. All courtesy copies shall be single-sided. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/8/2022. (dat)
June 6, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 85 placed under seal as per filer's request. (etg)
June 3, 2022 Filing 88 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #85 Reply Brief -- Declaration of Ryan Corbett -- by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 97-107, #2 Exs. 108-109, #3 Exs. 110-112, #4 Exs. 113-114, #5 Ex. 115, #6 Exs. 116-124)(Smith, Rodger)
June 3, 2022 Filing 87 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #85 Reply Brief -- Declaration of Bryce Cook -- by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
June 3, 2022 Filing 86 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #85 Reply Brief -- Declaration of Dr. Steven Goldberg -- by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
June 3, 2022 Filing 85 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger) Modified on 6/6/2022 to place document under seal as per filer's request (etg).
June 3, 2022 Filing 84 REPLY BRIEF re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SO ORDERED, re #82 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the deadline for Defendants to file their reply brief in further support of their Motion to Dismiss Count IV (D.I. 53) to June 3, 2022 filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc. (Set Briefing Schedule: re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Reply Brief due 6/3/2022). Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/24/2022. (dat)
May 24, 2022 Filing 82 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the deadline for Defendants to file their reply brief in further support of their Motion to Dismiss Count IV (D.I. 53) to through and including June 3, 2022 - filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
May 19, 2022 Filing 81 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/26/2022. (Smith, Rodger)
May 17, 2022 Filing 80 REDACTED VERSION of #65 Declaration, by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14, #2 Exhibit 15-21, #3 Exhibit 22-34, #4 Exhibit 35-45)(Cragg, Tyler)
May 17, 2022 Filing 79 REDACTED VERSION of #64 Declaration, by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I)(Cragg, Tyler)
May 17, 2022 Filing 78 REDACTED VERSION of #63 Declaration by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Cragg, Tyler)
May 17, 2022 Filing 77 REDACTED VERSION of #62 Declaration by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cragg, Tyler)
May 17, 2022 Filing 76 REDACTED VERSION of #61 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Certification)(Cragg, Tyler)
May 17, 2022 Filing 75 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Mohan Rao on May 20, 2022 filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.(Simonetti, Sarah)
May 17, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. William R. Michalson on May 19, 2022 filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.(Simonetti, Sarah)
May 17, 2022 Filing 73 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mr. Yong Liu on May 18, 2022 filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.(Simonetti, Sarah)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #72 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file redacted versions to May 17, 2022 filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.; Redactions to the documents in question were due on 5/12/2022. The parties did not file those redactions on time and instead, after the Clerk's Office had closed and the CM/ECF filing deadline had passed, filed a stipulation to extend time to file redactions at 7:37PM Eastern Time on 5/12/2022. D.I. 69. The parties agreed to file the redactions by 5/16/2022. However, the parties have requested an additional extension. D.I. 72. Redactions shall be due no later than the CM/ECF filing deadline on 5/17/2022. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/17/2022. (dat)
May 16, 2022 Filing 72 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file redacted versions to May 17, 2022 - filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Cragg, Tyler)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORAL ORDER, #66 Letter Motion to Compel: The transcript at D.I. 70 shall serve as the Order of the court -- Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that based upon the parties' stated positions as to entering a Rule 16 Scheduling Order, the court will take no further action until requested by the parties. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/16/2022. (dat)
May 16, 2022 Filing 70 Official Transcript of Discovery Conference held on 5/12/2022 before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carrie Gold. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 6/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2022. (Taylor, Daniel)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #69 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to file Redacted Versions of D.I. 61 through D.I. 65 to through and including May 16, 2022 filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/13/2022. (Taylor, Daniel)
May 12, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Discovery Conference held on 5/12/2022. (Court Reporter Carrie Gold.) (Taylor, Daniel) Modified on 5/16/2022 (Taylor, Daniel).
May 12, 2022 Filing 69 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to file Redacted Versions of D.I. 61 through D.I. 65 to through and including May 16, 2022 - filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Cragg, Tyler)
May 10, 2022 Filing 68 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Kelly E. Farnan regarding Gogo's Opposition to SmartSky's Motion to Compel - re #66 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 3)(Farnan, Kelly)
May 9, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc..(Cragg, Tyler)
May 9, 2022 Filing 66 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Motion to Compel Gogo Opinions on Infringement and Validity of SmartSky Patents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Rodger)
May 5, 2022 Filing 65 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #61 Answering Brief in Opposition, Nathaniel C. Love by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13, #2 Exhibit 14-21, #3 Exhibit 22-34, #4 Exhibit 35-38, #5 Exhibit 39, #6 Exhibit 40-42, #7 Exhibit 43-45)(Farnan, Kelly)
May 5, 2022 Filing 64 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #61 Answering Brief in Opposition, Yong Liu by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G_part 1, #2 Exhibit G_part 2, #3 Exhibit H_part 1, #4 Exhibit H_part 2, #5 Exhibit H_part 3 and I)(Farnan, Kelly)
May 5, 2022 Filing 63 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #61 Answering Brief in Opposition, Mohan Rao, PH.D. by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Farnan, Kelly)
May 5, 2022 Filing 62 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #61 Answering Brief in Opposition, Dr. William R. Michalson by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Kelly)
May 5, 2022 Filing 61 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Certification)(Farnan, Kelly)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SO ORDERED, re #59 MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference) to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. NOTICE OF SCHEDULING: A Telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 5/12/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Counsel for plaintiff shall arrange for a court reporter and a conference bridge and shall initiate the call to chambers. Information about court reporters for "VAC" cases can be found on the Court's website at #www.ded.uscourts.gov/page/court-reporting. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/5/2022. (Taylor, Daniel)
May 4, 2022 Filing 59 MOTION for Hearing (Teleconference) to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
April 29, 2022 Filing 58 ORAL ORDER: The parties having filed the appropriate form advising the Court that they do not unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, until further order of the Court, this case will remain assigned to the VAC (2022) docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge solely for the following purposes: (1) to adjudicate discovery (including fact and expert discovery) and protective order disputes; (2) to issue or modify a scheduling order; (3) to review stipulated orders and pro hac vice motions; and (4) to review requests for mediation in cases other than patent and securities cases. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 4/29/22. (etg)
April 29, 2022 Filing 57 VAC Magistrate Non-Consent completed by the parties filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
April 28, 2022 Filing 56 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff SmartSky Networks, LLC to respond to Defendants Gogo Business Aviation, LLC and Gogo Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Count IV to May 19, 2022 - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #56 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff SmartSky Networks, LLC to respond to Defendants Gogo Business Aviation, LLC and Gogo Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Count IV to May 19, 2022 (Set Briefing Schedule: re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Answering Brief due 5/19/2022). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/28/2022. (dlw)
April 25, 2022 Filing 55 REDACTED VERSION of #48 Declaration - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 95-96)(Smith, Rodger)
April 21, 2022 Filing 54 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/5/2022. (Farnan, Kelly)
April 21, 2022 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly)
April 20, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Responses and Objections to SmarkSky's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc..(Schoenbaum, Griffin)
April 19, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ryan Stone on April 26, 2022 filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
April 19, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bryce Cook on April 22, 2022 filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
April 19, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Steven Goldberg on April 20, 2022 filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
April 14, 2022 Filing 48 [SEALED] Supplemental DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Bryce Cook - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 95-96)(Smith, Rodger)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/5/2022. (mdb)
April 4, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Smartsky Networks, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-5); and (2) SmartSky Networks, LLC's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.(Smith, Rodger)
April 4, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Responses and Objections to First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5); and 2) Responses and Objections to First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-5) filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
April 4, 2022 Filing 44 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
March 23, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants': (1) First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) to Plaintiff SmartSky Networks, LLC and (2) First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-5) to Plaintiff SmartSky Networks, LLC filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
March 23, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) SmartSky Networks, LLC's First Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendants GOGO Business Aviation, LLC and GOGO Inc. (Nos. 1-5); and (2) SmartSky Networks, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants GOGO Business Aviation, LLC and GOGO Inc. - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.(Smith, Rodger)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SO ORDERED, re #40 Stipulation filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. Answering Brief due 5/5/2022, Reply Brief due 6/3/2022. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/23/2022. (etg)
March 22, 2022 Filing 40 STIPULATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
March 18, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Julia G Tabat, and Nathaniel C. Love for Gogo Business Aviation, LLC and Gogo Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
March 18, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas D. Rein and Stephanie P. Koh for Gogo Business Aviation, LLC and Gogo Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lance A. Lawson and Ryan M. Corbett filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/17/2022. (dlw)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas D. Rein, Stephanie P. Koh, Nathaniel C. Love and Julia G. Tabat filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/17/2022. (dlw)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the deadline for Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to through and including April 21, 2022 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Gogo Business Aviation, LLC answer due 4/21/2022; Gogo Inc. answer due 4/21/2022). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/17/2022. (dlw)
March 16, 2022 Filing 39 VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl)
March 16, 2022 Filing 38 ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 03/16/2022. (ntl)
March 16, 2022 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 15, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas D. Rein, Stephanie P. Koh, Nathaniel C. Love and Julia G. Tabat - filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Cragg, Tyler)
March 15, 2022 Filing 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the deadline for Defendants to Answer the Complaint to through and including April 21, 2022 - filed by Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
March 3, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #24 , #23 , and #7 replaced per request of counsel. (smg)
March 2, 2022 Filing 35 REDACTED VERSION of #18 Declaration by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 34 REDACTED VERSION of #17 Declaration by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 33 REDACTED VERSION of #16 Declaration by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 32 REDACTED VERSION of #15 Declaration by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 31 REDACTED VERSION of #14 Declaration by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 30 REDACTED VERSION of #13 Declaration by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 29 REDACTED VERSION of #12 Declaration by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 28 REDACTED VERSION of #11 Declaration, by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 1-6)(Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 27 REDACTED VERSION of #10 Declaration of Bryce Cook by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 26 REDACTED VERSION of #9 Declaration Dr. Steven Goldberg by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 25 REDACTED VERSION of #8 Declaration of Ryan Stone by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 24 REDACTED VERSION of #7 Opening Brief in Support by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Main Document 24 replaced on 3/3/2022) (smg).
March 2, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff SmartSky's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (D.I. 6); (2) SmartSky's Opening Brief in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction (D.I. 7); (3) Declaration of Ryan Stone in Support of SmartSky's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (D.I. 8); (4) Declaration of Dr. Steven Goldberg in Support of Plaintiff SmartSky Networks, LLC Motion for Preliminary Injunction (D.I. 9); (5) Declaration of Bryce Cook in Support of SmartSky's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (D.I. 10); and (6) Declaration of Ryan Corbett in Support of Plaintiff SmartSky Networks, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (D.I. 11-18) - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.(Smith, Rodger) (Main Document 23 replaced on 3/3/2022) (smg).
March 2, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. Gogo Inc. served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. Gogo Business Aviation, LLC served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Smith, Rodger)
March 2, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: Document and Exhibit at DI #11 replaced, per request of counsel. (smg)
March 1, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lance A. Lawson and Ryan M. Corbett - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
March 1, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Lodging by SmartSky Networks, LLC re #13 Declaration (Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 18 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Ryan Corbett (Volume 8 of 8, Exhibits 81-94) - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 17 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Ryan Corbett (Volume 7 of 8, Exhibit 80, Part 2) - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 16 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Ryan Corbett (Volume 6 of 8, Exhibit 80, Part 1) - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 15 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - (Volume 5 of 8, Exhibits 65-79) - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 14 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Ryan Corbett (Volume 4 of 8, Exhibit 64) by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 13 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Ryan Corbett (Volume 3 of 8, Exhibits 32-63) by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 12 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Ryan Corbett (Volume 2 of 8, Exhibits 7-31) - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 11 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Ryan Corbett (Volume 1 of 8) - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 1-6)(Smith, Rodger) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/2/2022) (smg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/2/2022) (smg).
February 28, 2022 Filing 10 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Bryce Cook - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 9 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Dr. Steven Goldberg - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Ryan Stone - by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 7 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/14/2022. (Smith, Rodger) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/3/2022) (smg).
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gogo Business Aviation, LLC and Gogo Inc. on 2/28/2022. (nmg)
February 28, 2022 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent SmartSky New HoldCo, LLC for SmartSky Networks, LLC filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (nmg)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,312,947 B2 ;11,223,417 B2 ;10,257,717 B2 ;9,730,077 B2. (nmg)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Gogo Business Aviation, LLC, Gogo Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3813485.) - filed by SmartSky Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SmartSky Networks, LLC v. Gogo Business Aviation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SmartSky Networks, LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Simonetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gogo Business Aviation, LLC
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Thomas D. Rein
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Julia G Tabat
Represented By: Nathaniel C. Love
Represented By: Stephanie P. Koh
Represented By: Griffin Schoenbaum
Represented By: Julia G. Tabat
Represented By: Leif E. Peterson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gogo Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Thomas D. Rein
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Julia G Tabat
Represented By: Nathaniel C. Love
Represented By: Stephanie P. Koh
Represented By: Griffin Schoenbaum
Represented By: Julia G. Tabat
Represented By: Leif E. Peterson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?