Burnett et al v. Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Burnett, Michael Paradise and David Nelson
Defendant: Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC, Miguel Paredes, James K. Neff, Carmit P. Neff, Carmit P. Neff Revocable Trust, James K. Neff Revocable Trust, WGA Trust and John and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2022cv00270
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey S. Russell of Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP - filed by Carmit P. Neff Revocable Trust, James K. Neff Revocable Trust, Carmit P. Neff, James K. Neff, WGA Trust. (Jauffret, Jennifer)
March 30, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey S Russell for Carmit P. Neff Revocable Trust, James K. Neff Revocable Trust, Carmit P. Neff, James K. Neff, and WGA Trust added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey S. Russell of Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP, filed by James K. Neff Revocable Trust, Carmit P. Neff, WGA Trust, Carmit P. Neff Revocable Trust, James K. Neff. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/30/2022. (nms)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean C. Abouchedid, filed by Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC, Miguel Paredes, #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lars C. Golumbic filed by Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC, Miguel Paredes. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/29/2022. (nms)
March 29, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lars C. Golumbic and Sean C Abouchedid for Miguel Paredes and Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
March 28, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Aidan T Hamilton on behalf of Miguel Paredes, Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC (Hamilton, Aidan)
March 28, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lars C. Golumbic - filed by Miguel Paredes, Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
March 28, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean C. Abouchedid - filed by Miguel Paredes, Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
March 28, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. Desgrosseilliers on behalf of Miguel Paredes, Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
March 28, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Benedict Cicero on behalf of Miguel Paredes, Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC (Cicero, Joseph)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to April 29, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/28/2022. (nms)
March 25, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to April 29, 2022 - filed by Carmit P. Neff Revocable Trust, James K. Neff Revocable Trust, Carmit P. Neff, James K. Neff, WGA Trust. (Jauffret, Jennifer)
March 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Dealy Haynes on behalf of Carmit P. Neff Revocable Trust, James K. Neff Revocable Trust, Carmit P. Neff, James K. Neff, WGA Trust (Haynes, Christine)
March 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer C. Bebko Jauffret on behalf of Carmit P. Neff Revocable Trust, James K. Neff Revocable Trust, Carmit P. Neff, James K. Neff, WGA Trust (Jauffret, Jennifer)
March 11, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Victor O'Connell for David Burnett added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
March 11, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter k Stris for David Burnett added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
March 10, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Rachana A Pathak and John Stokes for David Burnett added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
March 7, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle C. Yau - filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michelle C. Yau)(Keener, Carmella)
March 7, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel R. Sutter - filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Daniel R. Sutter)(Keener, Carmella)
March 7, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brandon T. McDonough, Brock J. Specht, Paul J. Lukas, Jacob T. Schutz, and Michelle C. Yau for David Burnett added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (smg)
March 7, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel R. Sutter for David Burnett added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (MPB)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle C. Yau, filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise, and #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel R. Sutter, filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/7/2022. (nms)
March 4, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul J. Lukas - filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul J. Lukas)(Keener, Carmella)
March 4, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brock J. Specht - filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Brock J. Specht)(Keener, Carmella)
March 4, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brandon T. McDonough - filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Brandon T. McDonough)(Keener, Carmella)
March 4, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jacob T. Schutz - filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jacob T. Schutz)(Keener, Carmella)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter K. Sris, filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise, #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Victor O'Connell, filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Stokes, filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rachana A. Pathak, filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/4/2022. (nms)
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Victor O'Connell - filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Victor O'Connell)(Keener, Carmella)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Stokes - filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John Stokes)(Keener, Carmella)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rachana A. Pathak - filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Rachana A. Pathak)(Keener, Carmella)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter K. Sris - filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Peter K. Stris)(Keener, Carmella)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brandon T. McDonough, filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise, #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jacob T. Schutz, filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise, #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul J. Lukas, filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise, #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brock J. Specht, filed by David Burnett, David Nelson, Michael Paradise. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/4/2022. (nms)
March 2, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 1, 2022 No Summons Issued. (twk)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against John and Jane Does 1-10, Carmit P. Neff, James K. Neff, Carmit P. Neff Revocable Trust, James K. Neff Revocable Trust, Miguel Paredes, Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC, WGA Trust dated 8/16/13 - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3813729.) - filed by Michael Paradise, David Burnett, David Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnett et al v. Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Burnett
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Rachana A Pathak
Represented By: Brandon T. McDonough
Represented By: Brock J. Specht
Represented By: Daniel R. Sutter
Represented By: Jacob T. Schutz
Represented By: John Stokes
Represented By: Michelle C. Yau
Represented By: Paul J. Lukas
Represented By: Peter k Stris
Represented By: Victor O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Paradise
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Nelson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudent Fiduciary Services LLC
Represented By: Aidan T Hamilton
Represented By: Joseph Benedict Cicero
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Represented By: Mark L. Desgrosseilliers
Represented By: Sean C Abouchedid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Paredes
Represented By: Aidan T Hamilton
Represented By: Joseph Benedict Cicero
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Represented By: Mark L. Desgrosseilliers
Represented By: Sean C Abouchedid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James K. Neff
Represented By: Christine Dealy Haynes
Represented By: Jeffrey S Russell
Represented By: Jennifer C. Bebko Jauffret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmit P. Neff
Represented By: Christine Dealy Haynes
Represented By: Jeffrey S Russell
Represented By: Jennifer C. Bebko Jauffret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmit P. Neff Revocable Trust
Represented By: Christine Dealy Haynes
Represented By: Jeffrey S Russell
Represented By: Jennifer C. Bebko Jauffret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James K. Neff Revocable Trust
Represented By: Christine Dealy Haynes
Represented By: Jeffrey S Russell
Represented By: Jennifer C. Bebko Jauffret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WGA Trust
Represented By: Christine Dealy Haynes
Represented By: Jeffrey S Russell
Represented By: Jennifer C. Bebko Jauffret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?