Impossible Foods Inc. v. Motif Foodworks, Inc.
Defendant: Motif Foodworks, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Impossible Foods Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00311
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: William C Bryson
Referring Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 1 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Integrity One Solutions and Sarah Q. Nasir by Motif Foodworks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Motif FoodWorks, Inc.'s Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Motif FoodWorks, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Impossible Foods Inc. (No. 14) filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Third-Party Subpoena to Ginkgo Bioworks, Inc. by Motif Foodworks, Inc. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's Reponses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) and (2) Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-78) filed by Impossible Foods Inc..(Liston, Ian)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 Deposition Subpoena to Fish & Richardson P.C. and (2) Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 Document Subpoena to Fish & Richardson P.C. filed by Impossible Foods Inc..(Liston, Ian)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REDACTED VERSION of #59 Letter to Hon. William Bryson re Case Narrowing Dispute by Impossible Foods Inc.. (Liston, Ian)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Impossible Foods Inc.'s CORRECTED Initial Infringement Contentions filed by Impossible Foods Inc..(Liston, Ian)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORAL ORDER: The parties have filed letter briefs outlining their views on the appropriate process for narrowing the number of patents, patent claims, and invalidity references asserted in this case. Dkt. Nos. 58-60. The following procedures will apply in this case: (1) By May 19, 2023, Impossible must reduce the number of asserted claims to no more than 50; (2) by June 20, 2023, Motif must reduce the number of asserted invalidity references to no more than 65; (3) by July 24, 2023, Impossible must reduce the number of asserted claims to no more than 36; (4) by August 21, 2023, Motif must reduce the number of asserted invalidity references to no more than 45; (5) by October 1, 2023, Impossible must reduce the number of asserted claims to no more than 15; and (6) by November 1, 2023, Motif must reduce the number of asserted invalidity references to no more than 25. Either party may move to deviate from the above procedures upon a showing of good cause, including but not limited to subsequent events such as IPR institution decisions or the court's claim construction order. At this time, there will be no limitation on the number of asserted patents. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 4/12/2023. (dds)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REDACTED VERSION of #58 Letter by Motif Foodworks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exs. A-J)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C. Bryson: Telephonic hearing held on 4/12/2023. Counsel for both parties appeared. Court reporter present. The Court discussed the procedures for narrowing the number of patents, patent claims, and invalidity references that will be asserted in this case. (Total Time in Court: 45 minutes) (Court Reporter Heidi Schoentube). (dds)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Infringement Contentions filed by Impossible Foods Inc..(Liston, Ian)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable William C. Bryson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Case Narrowing Dispute - re #59 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibit M)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable William C. Bryson from Ian R. Liston regarding Case Narrowing Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(Liston, Ian)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable William C. Bryson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Case Narrowing Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exs. A-J)(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Motif FoodWorks, Inc.'s Responses to Impossible Foods Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories and (2) Motif FoodWorks, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-75) filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Motif FoodWorks, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Impossible Foods Inc. (Nos. 1-13) and (2) Motif FoodWorks, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-78) filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 2/10/2023. (nmg)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Filing of Petitions for Inter Partes Review by Motif Foodworks, Inc. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Protective Order re 52 Oral Order, by Impossible Foods Inc.. (Liston, Ian)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORAL ORDER: The court has reviewed the parties' #51 Proposed Protective Order and will approve the order subject to the following change: In paragraph 20, the phrase "without further order of the Court" should be amended to read "subject to the approval of the Court." The parties should file a revised proposed order reflecting that change. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 2/6/2023. (dds)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Protective Order by Impossible Foods Inc.. (Liston, Ian)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) First Set of Requests for Production to Motif Foodworks, Inc. (Nos. 1-75) and (ii) First Set of Interrogatories to Motif Foodworks, Inc. (Nos. 1-12) filed by Impossible Foods Inc..(Liston, Ian)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C. Bryson: Telephonic hearing held on 1/12/2023. Counsel for both parties appeared. Court reporter present. The Court heard argument regarding the parties' disputes relating to the protective order to be entered in this case. (Total Time in Court: 1 hour) (Court Reporter Pam Beck). (dds)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORAL ORDER: The court will hold a teleconference regarding the disputes relating to the parties' proposed protective order on Thursday, January 12, 2023, at 1:00pm Eastern Time. The dial-in information will be distributed to the parties via email. The parties are directed to jointly arrange for court reporting services for the conference. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 1/6/2023. (dds)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Letter to The Honorable William C. Bryson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Motif's Reply Regarding Protective Order Disputes - re #47 Letter. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Letter to The Honorable William C. Bryson from Ian R. Liston regarding Protective Order Disputes - re #46 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Liston, Ian)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Letter to The Honorable William C. Bryson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Protective Order Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exs. A-G)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Impossible Foods Inc.'s Identification of Asserted Patents and Accused Products filed by Impossible Foods Inc..(Liston, Ian)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ANSWER to #34 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Impossible Foods Inc..(Liston, Ian)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Motif FoodWorks, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Impossible Foods Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.26(a) filed by Impossible Foods Inc..(Liston, Ian)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding D.I. #40 . Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 12/12/2022. (apk)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Joint STIPULATION Extend Time to File a Protective Order by Impossible Foods Inc.. (Ward, Jennifer)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 12/5/2022. (apk)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Susannah M. L. Gagnon - filed by Impossible Foods Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Susannah M. L. Gagnon)(Liston, Ian)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 6/30/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2023. Discovery due by 12/1/2023. Opening Expert Reports due by 2/1/2024. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 4/3/2024. Expert Discovery due by 5/1/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 6/12/2024. Answering Brief due 7/17/2024. Reply Brief due 7/31/2024. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 6/14/2023. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 6/28/2023. Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 7/7/2023. Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 7/14/2023. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 7/21/2023. A 5-day Jury Trial is set for 1/13/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge William C. Bryson. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 12/1/2022. (smg)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Letter to The Honorable William C. Bryson from Ian R. Liston regarding Parties Joint Proposed Scheduling Order - re 35 Oral Order,. (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Liston, Ian)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORAL ORDER: In light of Motif's #33 Letter, the #8 Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot. The court will hold a telephonic Rule 16 scheduling conference on December 1, 2022, at 2:00pm Eastern Time. The dial-in information and a form scheduling order will be distributed to the parties via email. The parties should jointly arrange for a court reporter to be present on the call. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 11/29/2022. (dds)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #22 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Impossible Foods Inc. by Motif Foodworks, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Letter to The Honorable William C. Bryson from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Supplement to Motif FoodWorks, Inc.'s November 8, 2022 Letter - re #30 Letter. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christina Garret and G. Edward Powell III as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer associated with Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.. (Liston, Ian)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying D.I. #24 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 11/14/2022. (apk)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge William C. Bryson of the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Please include the initials of the Judge (WCB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Response to Impossible Foods Inc.'s November 7, 2022 Letter - re #29 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Ian R. Liston regarding Request to Schedule Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liston, Ian)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY BRIEF re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Defendant Motif Foodworks, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph M. Paunovich for Motif Foodworks, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mkr)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECLARATION re #26 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Jennifer A. Ward in Support of Plaintiff Impossible Foods, Inc. Opposition to Defendant Motif Foodworks, Inc. Partial Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Impossible Foods Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 through 11)(Liston, Ian)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Defendant Motif Foodworks, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Impossible Foods Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/3/2022. (Liston, Ian)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Defendant Motif Foodworks, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/27/2022. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Defendant Motif Foodworks, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint - filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,273,492 ;10,689,656 . (Attachments: #1 Patent/Trademark Report Exh A)(Liston, Ian)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against Motif Foodworks, Inc.- filed by Impossible Foods Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redlined Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits 1 through 9)(Liston, Ian)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to plaintiff's proposed second amended complaint to October 24, 2022 - filed by Impossible Foods Inc.. (Ward, Jennifer)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to plaintiff's proposed second amended complaint to October 24, 2022, filed by Impossible Foods Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Motif Foodworks, Inc. answer due 10/24/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/6/2022. (kmd)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,863,761 ;9,943,096 ;10,039,306 ;11,013,250 ;11,224,241 . (Liston, Ian)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Motif Foodworks, Inc.- filed by Impossible Foods Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(kmd)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SO ORDERED, re #17 Stipulation To File First Amended Complaint, filed by Impossible Foods Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/25/2022. (kmd)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order PATENT REPORT NOTICE: Please note that if patents are being added to this case, the filing party should complete the Report to Commissioner of Patents & Trademarks, and enter it on the docket using the PATENT/TRADEMARK REPORT event in the OTHER DOCUMENT list. The patent report form can be found at www.ded.uscourts.gov under the Clerk's Office FORMS button. (nmf)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION To File First Amended Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Impossible Foods Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint with Exhibits 1-6, #2 Exhibit B - Redline of First Amended Complaint)(Liston, Ian)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Impossible Foods Inc..(Liston, Ian)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Wendy L. Devine, Christiana Garrett, G. Edward Powell, III, Matthew R. Reed for Impossible Foods Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lorelei P Westin for Impossible Foods Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Impossible Foods Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liston, Ian)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wendy L. Devine, Christiana Garrett, G. Edward Powell III, Matthew R. Reed, and Lorelei P. Westin, filed by Impossible Foods Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/6/2022. (kmd)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wendy L. Devine, Christiana Garrett, G. Edward Powell III, Matthew R. Reed, and Lorelei P. Westin - filed by Impossible Foods Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Wendy L. Devine, #2 Certification of Christiana Garrett, #3 Certification of G. Edward Powell III, #4 Certification of Matthew R. Reed, #5 Certification of Lorelei P. Westin)(Liston, Ian)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ryan Landes, Sandra L. Haberny, Stephen Q Wood, and Sarah Cork for Motif Foodworks, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph M. Paunovich, Stephen Q. Wood, Ryan Landes, Sandra L. Haberny, and Sarah M. Cork - filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph M. Paunovich, Stephen Q. Wood, Ryan Landes, Sandra L. Haberny, and Sarah M. Cork, filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/4/2022. (kmd)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Impossible Foods Inc. by Motif Foodworks, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review - filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Motif FoodWorks, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Impossible Foods Inc.'s complaint (D.I. 1) to April 29, 2022 filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Motif Foodworks, Inc. answer due 4/29/2022. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/18/2022. (nmf)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Motif FoodWorks, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Impossible Foods Inc.'s complaint (D.I. 1) to April 29, 2022 - filed by Motif Foodworks, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Impossible Foods Inc.. Motif Foodworks, Inc. served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (Liston, Ian)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Motif Foodworks, Inc. on 3/9/2022. (mpb)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Impossible Foods Inc.. (mpb)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,863,761. (mpb)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Motif Foodworks, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3820547.) - filed by Impossible Foods Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impossible Foods Inc. v. Motif Foodworks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Impossible Foods Inc.
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Represented By: Jennifer A. Ward
Represented By: Lorelei P Westin
Represented By: Matthew R. Reed
Represented By: Wendy L. Devine
Represented By: Christiana Garrett
Represented By: G. Edward Powell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motif Foodworks, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Ryan Landes
Represented By: Sandra L. Haberny
Represented By: Sarah Cork
Represented By: Stephen Q Wood
Represented By: Joseph M. Paunovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?