Salas v. Acuity-CHS, LLC
Plaintiff: Ashley Salas
Defendant: Acuity-CHS, LLC doing business as Comprehensive Health Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00317
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #12 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/30/2023. (nms)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/30/2023. (nms)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Official Transcript of Motion to Dismiss held on 12/19/22 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter Deanna Warner,Email: warnerdeanna@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2023. (Triozzi, Heather)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from P. Bradford deLeeuw, regarding Defendant's December 22, 2022 letter (D.I. #29 ). (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 12/23/2022 (nms).
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Aimee M. Czachorowski, Esq., regarding Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #12 ). (Pileggi, Francis) Modified on 12/22/2022 (nms).
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Hearing regarding the Motion to Dismiss held on 12/19/2022. Counsel for Plaintiff: B. deLeeuw. Counsel for Defendant: A. Czachorowski (Court Reporter Deanna Warner.) (lah)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tyler J. Bean, filed by Ashley Salas. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/16/2022. (nms)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tyler J. Bean - filed by Ashley Salas. (deLeeuw, Peter)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Acuity-CHS, LLC. Entry of appearance of attorney Aimee M. Czachorowski. Attorney Cheneise V. Wright terminated. (Pileggi, Francis) Modified on 12/14/2022 (nms).
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #27 has been recoded and the docket text corrected as an incorrect filing code was used. The entry now reflects the filing to be a Notice of Substitution of Counsel. (nms)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Danielle E. Stierna for Acuity-CHS, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE to 23 Oral Order, filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC. (Pileggi, Francis) Modified on 12/12/2022 (nms).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Danielle E. Stierna - filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC. (Pileggi, Francis)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Danielle E. Stierna, filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/21/2022. (nms)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jon P. Kardassakis for Acuity-CHS, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORAL ORDER: A hearing regarding the Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #12 ) is now set for 12/19/2022, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/18/2022. (nms)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORAL ORDER: Defendant makes approximately nineteen distinct arguments in its opening brief (D.I. #13 ). At least one week before oral argument, Defendant is to identify five of those nineteen as the five most important, and the oral argument will be limited to those five arguments. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/17/2022. (nms)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE to Notice of Subsequent Authority (D.I. #17 ). (Wright, Cheneise) Modified on 10/3/2022 (nms).
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Motion for Leave of Court to Respond to Notice of Supplemental Authority (D.I. #18 ) is GRANTED. Defendant may file a response of no more than three double-spaced pages. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/22/2022. (nms)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #18 MOTION for Leave of Court to Respond to Notice of Supplemental Authority, by Acuity-CHS, LLC. (Wright, Cheneise) Modified on 9/21/2022 (nms).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order LOCAL RULE 7.1.1 NOTICE: In accordance with Local Rule 7.1.1, except for civil cases involving pro se parties or motions brought by nonparties, every nondispositive motion shall be accompanied by an averment of counsel for the moving party that a reasonable effort has been made to reach agreement with the opposing party on the matters set forth in the motion. Unless otherwise ordered, failure to so aver may result in dismissal of the motion. The records of this case do not reflect such an averment by counsel for DI #18 . Please file the averment using the event code STATEMENT, found under OTHER DOCUMENTS. (nms)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The 7.1.1 Statement filed at D.I. 19 has been removed from the docket as a corrected statement has been filed at D.I. #20 . (nms)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave of Court to Respond to Notice of Supplemental Authority - filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Cheneise) Modified on 9/20/2022 (nms).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority, by Ashley Salas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 9/12/2022 (nms).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC. (Wright, Cheneise)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ashley Salas.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(deLeeuw, Peter)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief due 7/15/2022, Reply Brief due 8/5/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/23/2022. (nms)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule, by Ashley Salas. (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 6/23/2022 (nms).
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wright, Cheneise) Modified on 6/16/2022 (nms).
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC. (Wright, Cheneise) Modified on 6/16/2022 (nms).
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The brief and its exhibit filed as attachments to the motion at D.I. 12 have been removed. Motions and briefs are to be filed independent of each other. Defendant is to refile the brief accordingly. (nms)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jon Kardassakis - filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC. (Wright, Cheneise)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jon Kardassakis, filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/8/2022. (nms)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST Amended Class Action Complaint against Acuity-CHS, LLC - filed by Ashley Salas.(deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 6/2/2022 (nms).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss, by Ashley Salas. (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 5/12/2022 (nms).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss (*Set Briefing Schedule: re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief due 6/2/2022, Reply Brief due 6/16/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/12/2022. (nms)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent DC Capital Partners, LLC, Corporate Parent Acuity International, LLC for Acuity-CHS, LLC filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC. (Pileggi, Francis)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/19/2022. (Pileggi, Francis) Modified on 5/5/2022 (nms).
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pileggi, Francis) Modified on 5/5/2022 (nms).
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Motion to Dismiss to May 5, 2022 - filed by Acuity-CHS, LLC. (Pileggi, Francis)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to File Motion to Dismiss to May 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/5/2022. (nms)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Salas. Acuity-CHS, LLC served on 3/15/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. (deLeeuw, Peter)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The executed summons filed at D.I. 4 has been removed from the docket as an incorrect filing code was used. Counsel will refile the executed summons using the "Summons Returned Executed" code. (nms)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acuity-CHS, LLC on 3/11/2022. (twk)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Acuity-CHS, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3822424.) - filed by Ashley Salas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salas v. Acuity-CHS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Salas
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acuity-CHS, LLC doing business as Comprehensive Health Services, LLC
Represented By: Francis G.X. Pileggi
Represented By: Aimee M. Czachorowski
Represented By: Cheneise Wright
Represented By: Danielle E. Stierna
Represented By: Jon P. Kardassakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?