Gordian Medical, Inc. et al v. Vaughn et al
Plaintiff: Gordian Medical, Inc. doing business as American Medical Technologies and AMT Ultimate Holdings, L.P.
Defendant: Misty Vaughn and Curitec, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00319
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 5/20/2022. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/6/2022. (lih)
April 28, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin G. Reynolds - filed by Curitec, LLC. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Thomas, Lawrence)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin G. Reynolds. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/28/2022. (lih)
April 28, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin G Reynolds for Curitec, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
April 27, 2022 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Docketed Filings served on Misty Vaughn on April 21, 2022, filed by AMT Ultimate Holdings, L.P., Gordian Medical, Inc.. (Cole, Andrew)
April 26, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Docketed Filings served on Janet D. on behalf of Curitec, LLC on April 21, 2022, filed by AMT Ultimate Holdings, L.P., Gordian Medical, Inc.. (Cole, Andrew)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re D.I. #17 Joint Status Report: Whereas service of process remains unperfected as to defendants Misty Vaughn and Curitec, LLC (D.I. 1 at ¶ 2; D.I. 17 at 2; 4/13/2022 issuance of summons; 4/19/2022 issuance of summons); whereas defendant Curitec, LLC has filed a Rule 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (D.I. 9); and whereas the motion to dismiss is now fully briefed; the Court finds it is premature to enter a scheduling order. Therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties are directed to meet and confer on a proposed form of scheduling order that addresses the unripe pending motions and further case management upon completion of service of process on the defendants. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/26/2022. (lih)
April 22, 2022 Filing 18 Joint Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika and The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Andrew L. Cole regarding Reporting Regarding Lack of Unanimous Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction - re #14 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,,. (Cole, Andrew)
April 20, 2022 Filing 17 Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to April 13, 2022 Oral Order by AMT Ultimate Holdings, L.P., Gordian Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cole, Andrew) Modified on 4/21/2022 (lih).
April 19, 2022 Summons Issued as to Curitec, LLC on 4/19/2022. (srs)
April 14, 2022 REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #13 . (lih)
April 13, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by Curitec, LLC. (Thomas, Lawrence) Modified on 4/14/2022 (lih).
April 13, 2022 Filing 15 Letter to Clerk of Court from Andrew L. Cole regarding Summons Directed to Defendant Misty Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Summons Forms - Unsigned)(Cole, Andrew)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case and the pending motions are referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not including summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, pre-trial motions in limine or the pre-trial conference), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 22-319-MN-SRF. The Court requests that the parties consider consenting to Judge Fallon's jurisdiction over this case (or alternatively, over the pending motions (including those motions filed in Chancery Court)). Thus, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should the parties consent to Judge Fallon's jurisdiction over the case or the pending motions, they should complete the appropriate attached form and submit it to Diana_welham@ded.uscourts.gov. If the parties do not consent to Judge Fallon's jurisdiction in any capacity, they shall file a letter stating such no later than 4/20/2022. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent - Motion) Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(dlw) Modified on 4/13/2022 (dlw).
April 13, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text of D.I. 14 has been updated to reflect that the Order is an ORAL ORDER. (dlw)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Whereas the parties filed a Notice of Pending Matters pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 (D.I. 10) identifying the following motions pending at the time of removal: Plaintiffs' Motions for Expedited Proceedings and Preliminary Injunction; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before April 20, 2022 the parties shall jointly submit to the court a briefing schedule for the pending motions or otherwise advise in a joint submission of no more than two pages whether the foregoing motions are withdrawn, moot or no longer require resolution by the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/13/2022. (lih)
April 13, 2022 Summons Issued as to Misty Vaughn on 4/13/2022. (smg)
April 6, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by AMT Ultimate Holdings, L.P., Gordian Medical, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John W. Hofstetter)(Cole, Andrew)
April 5, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David E Rothstein for Misty Vaughn added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Hofstetter filed by Gordian Medical, Inc., AMT Ultimate Holdings, L.P., #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan J. Morley filed by Gordian Medical, Inc., AMT Ultimate Holdings, L.P.. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/4/2022. (mdb)
April 1, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Hofstetter - filed by AMT Ultimate Holdings, L.P., Gordian Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Cole, Andrew)
April 1, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan J. Morley - filed by AMT Ultimate Holdings, L.P., Gordian Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Cole, Andrew)
March 31, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Pending Matters Requiring Judicial Attention Filed Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by AMT Ultimate Holdings, L.P., Gordian Medical, Inc. (Dougherty, Jack)
March 23, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person - filed by Curitec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Thomas, Lawrence) Modified on 3/23/2022 (dlw).
March 23, 2022 Set Briefing Schedule: re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person - Answering Brief due 4/6/2022. (dlw)
March 21, 2022 Filing 8 STATEMENT re 7 Oral Order // Defendant Curitec, LLC's Statement of Citizenship by Curitec, LLC. (Thomas, Lawrence) Modified on 3/22/2022 (dlw).
March 21, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph M Preis for Curitec, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER - On or before 3/25/2022 Curitec, LLC shall file a statement indicating the citizenship of each member of the LLC entity. If any member is itself an LLC (or LLP), then the statement shall also indicate the citizenship of each sub-member of the member LLC (or LLP). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/18/2022. (dlw)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph M. Preis filed by Curitec, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/18/2022. (dlw)
March 18, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph M Preis for Curitec, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David E. Rothstein filed by Misty Vaughn. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/18/2022. (dlw)
March 16, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 14, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David E. Rothstein - filed by Misty Vaughn. (Herr, Daniel)
March 14, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph M. Preis - filed by Curitec, LLC. (Orlacchio, Adam)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Raymond Thomas, III on behalf of Curitec, LLC (Thomas, Lawrence)
March 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam V. Orlacchio on behalf of Curitec, LLC (Orlacchio, Adam)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Court of Chancery, Case Number 2022-0210-MTZ (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3823199)- filed by Misty Vaughn, Curitec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordian Medical, Inc. et al v. Vaughn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordian Medical, Inc. doing business as American Medical Technologies
Represented By: Andrew Lynch Cole
Represented By: Jack Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMT Ultimate Holdings, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Lynch Cole
Represented By: Jack Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Vaughn
Represented By: Daniel Charles Herr
Represented By: David E Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curitec, LLC
Represented By: Larry R. Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Adam V. Orlacchio
Represented By: Lawrence Raymond Thomas, III
Represented By: Benjamin G Reynolds
Represented By: Joseph M Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?