HID Global Corporation et al v. WaveLynx Technologies Corporation
Plaintiff: HID Global Corporation
Counter Claimant: ASSA ABLOY AB and WaveLynx Technologies Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv00362
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2022)
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Hall
2 Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SO ORDERED, re #46 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/19/23. (ntl)
May 19, 2023 Case electronically transferred to District of Colorado. (ntl)
May 19, 2023 Remark: Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in District of Colorado as case 1:23-cv-01256, filed 05/19/2023. (nmg)
May 18, 2023 Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
April 19, 2023 Filing 45 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Letter to Honorable Gregory Williams from Martina Hufnal)(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #44 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File a Proposed Scheduling Order to April 19, 2023 filed by HID Global Corporation, ASSA ABLOY AB. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 4/14/23. (ntl)
April 12, 2023 Filing 44 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File a Proposed Scheduling Order to April 19, 2023 - filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #43 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 4/5/23. (ntl)
April 4, 2023 Filing 43 Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to File a Proposed Scheduling Order by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
March 24, 2023 Filing 42 REQUEST for Oral Argument by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation re #28 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Colorado. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
March 22, 2023 Filing 41 ANSWER to #35 Answer to Counterclaim, to Defendant's Counterclaim of Noninfringement in Response to Plaintiffs' Counterclaim in Reply by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation.(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
March 17, 2023 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Colorado filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
March 17, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Noah C. Graubart for ASSA ABLOY AB,and HID Global Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Noah Graubart filed by HID Global Corporation, ASSA ABLOY AB. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 3/17/23. (ntl)
March 14, 2023 Filing 39 Letter to Honorable Gregory B. Williams from Martina Tyreus Hufnal regarding answering brief in Opposition to Motion to Transfer - re #36 Answering Brief in Opposition. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
March 10, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Noah Graubart - filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File its REPLY in Support of its Motion to Transfer #28 to March 17, 2023 filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 3/7/23. (ntl)
March 6, 2023 Filing 37 Unopposed STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File its REPLY in Support of its Motion to Transfer #28 to March 17, 2023 - filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
March 3, 2023 Filing 36 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Colorado filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/10/2023. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
March 1, 2023 Filing 35 ANSWER to #22 Answer to Counterclaim,,,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against WaveLynx Technologies Corporation by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA, #2 Exhibit BB)(Rahmeier, Thatcher)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #34 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Response to Counterclaims in Reply and opposition to Motion to Transfer to March 1, 2023 and March 3, 2023 filed by HID Global Corporation. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 2/10/23. (ntl)
February 9, 2023 Filing 34 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Response to Counterclaims in Reply and opposition to Motion to Transfer to March 1, 2023 and March 3, 2023 - filed by HID Global Corporation. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #33 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Motion to Transfer to February 17, 2023 filed by HID Global Corporation, ASSA ABLOY AB. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 2/2/23. (ntl)
February 1, 2023 Filing 33 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Response to Motion to Transfer to February 17, 2023 - filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
January 27, 2023 Filing 32 REDACTED VERSION of #29 Opening Brief in Support by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #27 Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 1/23/23. (ntl)
January 20, 2023 Filing 31 DECLARATION re #28 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Colorado Declaration of Thatcher A. Rahmeier in Support of Wavelynx Technologies Corporation's Motion to Transfer by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Rahmeier, Thatcher)
January 20, 2023 Filing 30 DECLARATION re #28 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Colorado Declaration of Michael T. Conlin in Support of Wavelynx Technologies Corporation's Motion to Transfer by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
January 20, 2023 Filing 29 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #28 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Colorado filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/3/2023. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
January 20, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Colorado - filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rahmeier, Thatcher)
January 20, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Seal Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal - filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Counterclaims in Reply to February 15, 2023 filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 1/17/23. (ntl)
January 13, 2023 Filing 26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Counterclaims in Reply to February 15, 2023 - filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
December 22, 2022 Filing 25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs' Counterclaims in Reply to January 16, 2023 - filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs' Counterclaims in Reply to January 16, 2023 filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/22/22. (ntl)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Plaintiffs' Reply; and to file Proposed Scheduling Order to December 29, 2022 (Response); and 14 days after pleadings are closed (Prop. Scheduling Order) filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/25/22. (ntl)
October 24, 2022 Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Plaintiffs' Reply; and to file Proposed Scheduling Order to December 29, 2022 (Response); and 14 days after pleadings are closed (Prop. Scheduling Order) - filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
October 20, 2022 Filing 23 REDACTED VERSION of #22 Answer to Counterclaim,,,,,,, by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 1-A, #3 Ex. 1-B, #4 Ex. 1-C, #5 Ex. 2, #6 Ex. 3, #7 Ex. 4, #8 Ex. 5, #9 Ex. 6, #10 Ex. 7, #11 Ex. 8, #12 Ex. 9, #13 Ex. 10, #14 Ex. 11, #15 Ex. 12, #16 Ex. 13, #17 Ex. 14, #18 Ex. 15, #19 Ex. 16, #20 Ex. 17, #21 Ex. 18, #22 Ex. 19, #23 Ex. 20, #24 Ex. 21, #25 Ex. 22, #26 Ex. 23, #27 Ex. 24, #28 Ex. 25, #29 Ex. 26, #30 Ex. 27, #31 Ex. 28, #32 Ex. 29, #33 Ex. 30, #34 Ex. 31, #35 Ex. 32, #36 Ex. 33, #37 Ex. 34, #38 Ex. 35, #39 Ex. 36, #40 Ex. 37, #41 Ex. 38)(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
October 17, 2022 Filing 22 [SEALED] ANSWER to #14 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, , COUNTERCLAIM against WaveLynx Technologies Corporation by HID Global Corporation, ASSA ABLOY AB. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 1-A, #3 Ex. 1-B, #4 Ex. 1-C, #5 Ex. 2, #6 Ex. 3, #7 Ex. 4, #8 Ex. 5, #9 Ex. 6, #10 Ex. 7, #11 Ex. 8, #12 Ex. 9, #13 Ex. 10, #14 Ex. 11, #15 Ex. 12, #16 Ex. 13, #17 Ex. 14, #18 Ex. 15, #19 Ex. 16, #20 Ex. 17, #21 Ex. 18, #22 Ex. 19, #23 Ex. 20, #24 Ex. 21, #25 Ex. 22, #26 Ex. 23, #27 Ex. 24, #28 Ex. 25, #29 Ex. 26, #30 Ex. 27, #31 Ex. 28, #32 Ex. 29, #33 Ex. 30, #34 Ex. 31, #35 Ex. 32, #36 Ex. 33, #37 Ex. 34, #38 Ex. 35, #39 Ex. 36, #40 Ex. 37, #41 Ex. 38)(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Hall. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/13/22. (ntl)
September 8, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (smg)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #21 Stipulation and Order to Extend Deadline to Answer Defendant's counterclaim and file proposed Scheduling Order to October 17, 2022 and October 31, 2022. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 8/30/2022. (ceg)
August 29, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Deadline to Answer Defendant's counterclaim and file proposed Scheduling Order to October 17, 2022 and October 31, 2022 - filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina) Modified on 8/30/2022 (ceg).
August 10, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Taylor Burgener for ASSA ABLOY AB and HID Global Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chris Marchese, Tim Rawson and Taylor Burgener filed by HID Global Corporation, ASSA ABLOY AB. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 8/1/2022. (ceg)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #20 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to File a Proposed Scheduling Order to September 30, 2022. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 8/1/2022. (ceg)
August 1, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Chris Marchese and Tim Rawson for ASSA ABLOY AB and HID Global Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
July 29, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Proposed Scheduling Order to September 30, 2022 - filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
July 27, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chris Marchese, Tim Rawson and Taylor Burgener - filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), the parties were required to file a proposed scheduling order on or before June 29, 2022. No proposed scheduling order has been filed. The parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order on or before August 3, 2022. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 7/20/2022. (ceg)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #17 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to file an Answer to Defendant's Counterclaims until 9/16/2022. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 7/13/2022. (ceg)
July 11, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Defendant's Counterclaims to September 16, 2022 - filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
July 11, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy E. Grimsrud for WaveLynx Technologies Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy E. Grimsrud filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 7/11/2022. (ceg)
July 8, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy E. Grimsrud - filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
June 27, 2022 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
June 27, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against HID Global Corporation, ASSA ABLOY AB by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y)(Rahmeier, Thatcher) Modified on 6/27/2022 (ceg).
June 27, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: Entry made at D.I. 14 has been corrected to reflect the proper counter defendants. (ceg)
June 12, 2022 Filing 13 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,943,562 . (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
June 12, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against WaveLynx Technologies Corporation- filed by HID Global Corporation, ASSA ABLOY AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
May 24, 2022 Filing 11 ORAL ORDER: The parties having filed the appropriate form advising the Court that they do not unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, until further order of the Court, this case will remain assigned to the VAC (2022) docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall solely for the following purposes: (1) to adjudicate discovery (including fact and expert discovery) and protective order disputes; (2) to issue or modify a scheduling order; (3) to review stipulated orders and pro hac vice motions; and (4) to review requests for mediation in cases other than patent and securities cases. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 5/24/22. (ntl)
May 23, 2022 Filing 10 VAC Magistrate Non-Consent completed by the parties filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
April 14, 2022 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 06/13/2022 - filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thatcher A. Rahmeier on behalf of WaveLynx Technologies Corporation (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 06/13/2022 filed by WaveLynx Technologies Corporation -- Reset Answer Deadline: WaveLynx Technologies Corporation answer due 6/13/2022. ORDERED by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/14/22. (ntl)
March 28, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HID Global Corporation, ASSA ABLOY AB. WaveLynx Technologies Corporation served on 3/24/2022, answer due 4/14/2022. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (etg)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 3/24/2022. (etg)
March 23, 2022 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent ASSA ABLOY AB for HID Global Corporation filed by ASSA ABLOY AB, HID Global Corporation. (apk)
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,439,862 B2. (apk)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against WaveLynx Technologies Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3830095.) - filed by HID Global Corporation, ASSA ABLOY AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Attachment 12 replaced on 3/22/2022) (apk).
March 21, 2022 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HID Global Corporation et al v. WaveLynx Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HID Global Corporation
Represented By: AnnaMartina Tyreus Hufnal
Represented By: Tim Rawson
Represented By: Taylor Burgener
Represented By: Chris Marchese
Represented By: Noah C. Graubart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ASSA ABLOY AB
Represented By: AnnaMartina Tyreus Hufnal
Represented By: Taylor Burgener
Represented By: Chris Marchese
Represented By: Tim Rawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: WaveLynx Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Thatcher A. Rahmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?