Markos v. Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven Markos
Defendant: Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00441
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Christopher J Burke
Referring Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 49 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Steven Markos. (Gonen, Michael)
January 17, 2023 CASE CLOSED per #49 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice. (kmd)
January 17, 2023 Remark: AO 121 Copyright Report mailed to Register of Copyrights. (kmd)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record during the oral argument held today, D.I. #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona and D.I. #45 MOTION for Leave to Expand the Record are DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/5/2022. (nmf)
December 5, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Oral Argument held on 12/5/2022. (Court Reporter Bonnie Archer.) (nmf)
December 2, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jiepu (Bobby) Li - filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Harper, Brandon)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #48 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jiepu (Bobby) Li, filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/2/2022. (kmd)
December 1, 2022 Filing 47 Letter to the Honorable Chief Judge Colm F. Connolly from Brandon Harper, Esquire regarding Request for Co-Counsel's Telephonic Hearing Attendance. (Harper, Brandon)
November 16, 2022 Filing 46 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Motion for Leave to Expand the Record re #45 MOTION for Leave to File (Motion for Leave to Expand the Record) by Steven Markos. (Gonen, Michael)
November 16, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File (Motion for Leave to Expand the Record) - filed by Steven Markos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gonen, Michael)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Setting Hearings: An Oral Argument is set for 12/5/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/7/2022. (nmf)
October 25, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.'s Second Amended Initial Disclosures filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc..(Harper, Brandon)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORAL ORDER: The Court, having reviewed Plaintiff's motion regarding a discovery dispute (the "Motion"), (D.I. #34 ), and the briefing related thereto, (D.I. 39; D.I. 41; D.I. 42), in which Plaintiff seeks address and phone number information for eight witnesses identified by Defendant pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), hereby ORDERS that the Motion is DENIED as MOOT. Subsequent to the filing of the Motion, Defendant updated its disclosures at issue to provide workplace addresses and phone numbers for the witnesses, (D.I. 41 at 2; D.I. 42, ex. A), and in his reply brief, Plaintiff indicated that this response was acceptable as it was now "responsive" to the requirements of Rule 26(a)(1), (D.I. 42 at 1). To the extent that Plaintiff seeks an order of attorney's fees, that request is DENIED, in light of Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5)(A)(ii) & (iii), and the fact that there is no record in this case of Defendant engaging in obstructionist behavior. The September 19, 2022 teleconference is hereby CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/16/22. (mlc)
September 6, 2022 Filing 42 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Michael B. Gonen regarding Plaintiff's Reply Letter Brief in Support of Its Motion to Compel - re #39 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Steven Markos's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures - Opening Letter Brief (Reference D.I. #36, Oral Order). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gonen, Michael)
September 1, 2022 Filing 41 Letter to The Honorable Judge Christopher J. Burke from Brandon Harper, Esquire regarding Amended Initial Disclosures. (Harper, Brandon)
September 1, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.'s Amended Initial Disclosures filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc..(Harper, Brandon)
August 26, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #40 previously deleted per counsels request. (apk)
August 25, 2022 Filing 39 Opening Letter Brief (Reference D.I. #36, Oral Order) re D.I. #34 Motion for a Teleconference - filed by Steven Markos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonen, Michael) Modified on 8/25/2022 (dlb).
August 25, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: Motion to compel terminated- D.I. #39 was incorrectly docketed as a MOTION to Compel and should have been docketed as an Opening Letter Brief (Reference D.I. #36, Oral Order) filed by Steven Markos. Please refer to D.I. 34 as the appropriate motion related to this document.(dlb) (dlb)
August 19, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PRIOR TO 6PM ON AUGUST 19, 2022 - (i) Plaintiff Steven Markos Responses to Defendant Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.s First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff; (ii) Plaintiff Steven Markos Responses to Defendant Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; and (iii) Plaintiff Steven Markos Responses to Defendant Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by Steven Markos.(Gonen, Michael)
August 19, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Verification of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc..(Harper, Brandon)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: The Court has reviewed the parties' August 18, 2022 letter requesting a discovery teleconference regarding one dispute. (D.I. 33) The Court hereby ORDERS that the procedures for resolving a discovery dispute set out in the Scheduling Order will be modified as follows with regard to the dispute: (1) A discovery dispute teleconference is set for September 19, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Christopher J. Burke.; (2) By no later than August 25, 2022, the party seeking relief shall file with the Court an opening letter brief, not to exceed two (2) single-spaced pages, in no less than 12-point font, outlining the issues it is raising and its position on those issues.; (3) By no later than September 1, 2022, the responding party may file an answering letter brief, not to exceed two (2) single-spaced pages, in no less than 12-point font, outlining its reasons for its opposition to the opening letter brief.; (4) By no later than September 8, 2022, the party seeking relief shall file with the Court a reply letter brief, not to exceed one (1) single-spaced page, in no less than 12-point font.; (5) By no later than September 15, 2022, the parties shall jointly provide the Court's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Benyo, with a dial-in number via e-mail to use for the call.; (6) The parties should also consult and follow Judge Burke's "Guidelines for Discovery Disputes," which is found in the "Guidelines" tab on Judge Burke's portion of the District Court's website.; and (7) The Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the teleconference (however, if any party advises the Court in advance that a newer attorney will argue the dispute(s), see Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/StandingOrder2017.pdf, then the Court will go forward with the conference). Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/18/2022. (dlb)
August 18, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories; and Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc..(Harper, Brandon)
August 18, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Steven Markos. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Gonen, Michael)
August 18, 2022 Filing 33 Joint Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Michael B. Gonen, Esquire regarding request scheduling of a discovery teleconference - re 32 Oral Order,,,,. (Gonen, Michael)
August 17, 2022 Remark: The parties should follow the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, a copy of which is found on Judge Burke's portion of the District Court's webpage: #CJB Standing Order re Copies (dlb)
August 17, 2022 REMARK: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:#http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf (dlb)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORAL ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the case history in light of the August 16, 2022 referral, hereby ORDERS that going forward, the procedures for resolving a dispute relating to discovery shall be as follows: Should counsel find, after good faith efforts including verbal communication among Delaware and Lead Counsel for all parties to the dispute, that they are unable to resolve a discovery matter, the parties involved in the dispute shall submit a joint letter with the text set out in the Court's standard Rule 16 Scheduling Order Non Patent, which can be found in the "Forms" tab of Magistrate Judge Burke's page on the District Court's website. The moving party (i.e., the party seeking relief from the Court) should also file a Motion For Teleconference To Resolve Discovery Dispute. The suggested text for this motion can be found in the same Forms tab. The Court will thereafter set a discovery dispute telephone conference and letter briefing schedule. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/16/2022. (dlb)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for all disputes relating to discovery and the protective order. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/16/2022. (nmf)
July 25, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc..(Harper, Brandon)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/22/2022. (kmd)
July 22, 2022 Filing 29 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Harper, Brandon)
July 19, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Catherine Wasson on behalf of Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. (Wasson, Jennifer)
July 19, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff; Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc..(Harper, Brandon)
July 18, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant; (2) Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant; and (3) Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Steven Markos.(Gonen, Michael)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 9/15/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2022. Discovery due by 2/28/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 7/17/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/24/2023. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/14/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Jury Trial is set for 11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/12/2022. (nmf)
July 12, 2022 The 7/13/2022 Scheduling Conference is canceled per the filing and entry of the Scheduling Order with no areas of dispute. (nmf)
July 11, 2022 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER (Jointly Proposed Scheduling Order) by Steven Markos. (Gonen, Michael)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/13/2022 at 02:00 PM Telephonically before Judge Colm F. Connolly. If the parties have no disputes about the scheduling order, the Court will not require the parties to appear at a conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/29/2022. (nmf)
June 7, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Erin R. Ranahan for Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
June 6, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: The declaration and exhibits previously attached to the Reply Brief at D.I. #21 have been removed per request of filer. They have already been separately re-filed at D.I. #22 . (nmf)
June 3, 2022 Filing 22 DECLARATION re #21 Reply Brief, (Declaration of Erin Ranahan) by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Harper, Brandon)
June 3, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. (Attachments: # Certificate of Compliance)(Harper, Brandon) Modified on 6/6/2022 (nmf).
May 27, 2022 Filing 20 DECLARATION re #18 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona (Declaration of Steven Cowley) by Steven Markos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through L)(Gonen, Michael)
May 27, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #18 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona (Declaration of Steven Markos) by Steven Markos. (Gonen, Michael)
May 27, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona filed by Steven Markos.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Gonen, Michael)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SO ORDERED, re #16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's deadline to file answering brief and Defendant's deadline to file reply brief in connection with Defendant's opening brief in support of its motion to transfer to Plaintiff's Answering Brief,d filed by Steven Markos. Re-setting briefing schedule re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona: Opening Brief due 5/27/2022. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/24/2022. (kmd)
May 23, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's deadline to file answering brief and Defendant's deadline to file reply brief in connection with Defendant's opening brief in support of its motion to transfer to Plaintiff's Answering Brief due May 27, 2022; Defendant's Reply Brief due June 3, 2022 - filed by Steven Markos. (Gonen, Michael)
May 11, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven M. Cowley for Steven Markos added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
May 10, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Cowley - filed by Steven Markos. (Gonen, Michael)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Cowley, filed by Steven Markos. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/10/2022. (kmd)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erin R. Ranahan of Winston & Strawn LLP, filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/10/2022. (kmd)
May 9, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erin R. Ranahan of Winston & Strawn LLP - filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Harper, Brandon)
May 9, 2022 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent MREIS Holdings, LLC for Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Harper, Brandon)
May 9, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc..(Harper, Brandon)
May 9, 2022 Filing 11 DECLARATION re #9 Opening Brief in Support, re 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona [Declaration of Katie Carpenter] by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Harper, Brandon)
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 DECLARATION re #9 Opening Brief in Support, re 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona [Declaration of Lori Valencia] by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Harper, Brandon)
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/23/2022. (Harper, Brandon)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Arizona - filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harper, Brandon)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 9, 2022, filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. answer due 5/9/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/26/2022. (kmd)
April 25, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 9, 2022 - filed by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Harper, Brandon)
April 6, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Markos. Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Gonen, Michael)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Certification of Interested Parties by Steven Markos (Gonen, Michael)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. (twk)
April 1, 2022 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s): VA 2-058-977; VA 2-022-996. (twk)
April 1, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
April 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3841285.) - filed by Steven Markos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)
April 1, 2022 Remark: AO 121 Copyright Report mailed to Register of Copyrights. (twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markos v. Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Markos
Represented By: Michael Barak Gonen
Represented By: Steven M. Cowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Ryan Harper
Represented By: Jennifer Catherine Wasson
Represented By: Erin R. Ranahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?