Donegal Mutual Insurance Company et al v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Donegal Mutual Insurance Company and Atlantic States Insurance Company
Defendant: United States Postal Service and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv00456
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States of America on 5/19/2022. (apk)
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service- filed by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Forms - Unsigned, #2 Case Information Statement, #3 Certificate of Service)(Yeager, Seth)
May 4, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with supporting documents served on K. Stevenson on 4/28/22 return receipt, filed by Atlantic States Insurance Company. (Yeager, Seth)
April 13, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service on 4/6/2022. (srs)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against United States Postal Service - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3844399.) - filed by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Atlantic States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donegal Mutual Insurance Company et al v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donegal Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth H. Yeager
Represented By: Seth Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic States Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth H. Yeager
Represented By: Seth Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?