Arthrex, Inc. v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Plaintiff: Arthrex, Inc.
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00465
Filed: April 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY BRIEF re #18 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Federal Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Certificate of Compliance)(Nelson, Aaron)
June 2, 2022 Filing 23 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Federal Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Nelson, Aaron)
May 26, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #18 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida filed by Arthrex, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Lavella Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. A1, #4 Exhibit Ex. A2, #5 Exhibit Ex. A3, #6 Exhibit Ex. A4)(Orlacchio, Adam)
May 12, 2022 Filing 21 Joint DECLARATION re #19 Exhibit to a Document, #20 Opening Brief in Support, #18 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida of James Robert MacAneney by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Nelson, Aaron)
May 12, 2022 Filing 20 Joint OPENING BRIEF in Support re #18 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida by Defendants Federal Insurance Company and filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Nelson, Aaron)
May 12, 2022 Filing 19 Joint EXHIBIT re #18 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida Rule 7.1.1 Statement by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Nelson, Aaron)
May 12, 2022 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida - filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Aaron)
May 12, 2022 Filing 17 Joint ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Defendants Federal Insurance Company and by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Nelson, Aaron)
May 5, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel G Enriquez, Steven J Brodie, and Aaron S. Weiss for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
May 4, 2022 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Nelson, Aaron)
May 4, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven J. Brodie, Aaron S. Weiss and Daniel G. Enriquez of Carlton Fields, P. A. on behalf of Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa - filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Nelson, Aaron)
May 4, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION Stipulation and [PROPOSED] Order for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint to May 12, 2022 re #1 Complaint, by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Nelson, Aaron)
May 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Nelson on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Nelson, Aaron)
May 4, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt M. Heyman on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Heyman, Kurt)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven J. Brodie, Aaron S. Weiss and Daniel G. Enriquez of Carlton Fields, P. A. on behalf of Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa, filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/4/2022. (kmd)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint to May 12, 2022, filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Reset Answer Deadlines: Federal Insurance Company answer due 5/12/2022; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA answer due 5/12/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/4/2022. (kmd)
May 3, 2022 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Federal Insurance Company filed by Federal Insurance Company. (O'Dell, Julie)
May 3, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Katzenstein on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Katzenstein, Robert)
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Gorman, III on behalf of Arthrex, Inc. (Gorman, James)
April 15, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Defedant Federal Insurance Company on April 13, 2022, filed by Arthrex, Inc.. (Currier, Anna)
April 15, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company on April 14, 2022, filed by Arthrex, Inc.. (Currier, Anna)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Justin F. Lavella - filed by Arthrex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Currier, Anna)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander H. Berman - filed by Arthrex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Currier, Anna)
April 13, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Justin F. Lavella, filed by Arthrex, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/13/2022. (kmd)
April 13, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Justin F Lavella for Arthrex, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander H. Berman, filed by Arthrex, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/13/2022. (kmd)
April 13, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexander H Berman for Arthrex, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Arthrex, Inc.. (Currier, Anna)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company on 4/11/2022; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA on 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(smg)
April 9, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
April 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Federal Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3847472.) - filed by Arthrex, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthrex, Inc. v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthrex, Inc.
Represented By: Larry R. Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Adam V. Orlacchio
Represented By: Anna Elizabeth Currier
Represented By: Alexander H Berman
Represented By: James G. Gorman, III
Represented By: Justin F Lavella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Kurt M. Heyman
Represented By: Aaron M. Nelson
Represented By: Aaron S. Weiss
Represented By: Daniel G Enriquez
Represented By: Steven J Brodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert J. Katzenstein
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?