American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania v. Reese et al
Plaintiff: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania
Defendant: Allen Reese, Aurore Yates, Bruce Mosley and Tara Mosley
Case Number: 1:2022cv00504
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Mark A Kearney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 17 REQUEST for Default as to Tara Mosley - filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Katzenstein, Robert)
June 15, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST for Default as to Aurore Yates - filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Katzenstein, Robert)
June 15, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST for Default as to Tara Mosley - filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Katzenstein, Robert)
June 15, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST for Default as to Bruce Mosley - filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Katzenstein, Robert)
June 2, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Katzenstein, Robert)
June 2, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. Allen Reese served on 4/26/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Katzenstein, Robert)
June 1, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. Tara Mosley served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. (Katzenstein, Robert)
June 1, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. Bruce Mosley served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. (Katzenstein, Robert)
June 1, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. Aurore Yates served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. (Katzenstein, Robert)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Mark A. Kearney of the United States District Court for the District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Michael A Chagares on 5/20/22. (gvw)
May 20, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Mark A. Kearney. Please include the initials of the Judge (MAK) after the case number on all documents filed. (gvw)
May 19, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Copy of D.I.6 - Oral Order regarding extension of time re #5 Letter filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania.(Katzenstein, Robert)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER re #5 Letter - Having considered Defendant Reese's request for an extension and Plaintiff's response thereto, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Reece's time to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until 7/18/2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of this oral order on Defendant Reece. (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Allen Reese answer due 7/18/2022). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/19/2022. (dlw)
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Robert J. Katzenstein regarding Defendant Allen Reese's request for extension of time. (Attachments: #1 Enclosure)(Katzenstein, Robert)
May 5, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Julie K. Linhart for American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
April 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julie K. Linhart - filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel)(Katzenstein, Robert)
April 27, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julie K. Linhart filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/27/2022. (dlw)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent Continental Corporation for American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (mpb)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Bruce Mosley, Tara Mosley, Allen Reese, Aurore Yates - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3855752.) - filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)
April 20, 2022 No Summons Issued. (mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania v. Reese et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Robert J. Katzenstein
Represented By: Jason Z. Miller
Represented By: Julie K. Linhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurore Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?