Williams v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jasmyn Williams
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00510
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Mark A Kearney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER, following today's conference with counsel and review of their Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (D.I. #43 ), and finding good cause, it is ORDERED all the Plaintiff's claims are dismissed in accord with the Joint Stipulation (D.I. #43 ) and the Clerk of Court shall close this case. (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 10/14/2022. (nmg)
October 14, 2022 Filing 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jasmyn Williams. (Felice, David)
October 14, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Jasmyn Williams re #41 Stipulation of Dismissal (Felice, David)
October 14, 2022 Filing 41 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jasmyn Williams. (Felice, David)
October 14, 2022 Filing 40 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Briggs, Thomas)
October 14, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark A. Kearney - Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/14/2022. (nmg)
October 13, 2022 Filing 39 STIPULATION Stipulated Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Briggs, Thomas)
October 11, 2022 Filing 38 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.(Briggs, Thomas)
October 5, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant's First Interrogatories to Plaintiff Jasmyn Williams and, (2) Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Jasmyn Williams filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.(Van Oudenallen, Sebastian)
October 4, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Jasmyn Williams.(Felice, David)
October 4, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.(Van Oudenallen, Sebastian)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER, We will hold an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE via telephone onOctober 14, 2022 at 12:00 P.M.: (Dial-in Number: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 5723096#)(SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 9/27/2022. (apk)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER, Defendant's Motion to dismiss (D.I. #15 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. We DISMISS Plaintiff's claims under the Delaware Consumer Fraud Act and for declaratory judgment and allow her to proceed on her breach of contract and implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing claims. Defendant shall file an answer to the remaining contract claims no later than October 11, 2022. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 9/27/2022. (srs)
September 27, 2022 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 9/27/2022. (srs)
September 27, 2022 Filing 31 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on 08/26/2022 before Judge Kearney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lynn Gligor, Contact: (856) 649-4774. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/18/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/28/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2022. (smg)
August 26, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark A. Kearney - Telephonic Oral Argument held on 8/26/2022. Counsel for Plaintiff: Jacob L. Phillips and David A. Felice. Counsel for Defendant: Thomas W. Briggs, Jr. and Jeff S. Cashdan. (Court Reporter Lynn Gligor.) (smg)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 8/25/2022. (apk)
August 24, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew Shamis - filed by Jasmyn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew Shamis, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Felice, David)
August 24, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Zachary A. McEntyre for Progressive Direct Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
August 24, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan for Progressive Direct Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
August 24, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jacob L. Phillips for Jasmyn Williams added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 8/23/2022. (apk)
August 23, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jacob L. Phillips - filed by Jasmyn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Jacob Phillips, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Felice, David)
August 23, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Allison H. White, Julia C. Barrett, and James M. Brigman for Jasmyn Williams added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
August 22, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of SUBSEQUENT AUTHORITY by Jasmyn Williams re #22 Answering Brief in Opposition PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SUBSEQUENT AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order)(Felice, David)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 8/26/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Mark A. Kearney. (See Order for further details) Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 08/18/2022. (smg)
August 9, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY BRIEF re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Van Oudenallen, Sebastian)
August 9, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Sebastian Van Oudenallen on behalf of Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Van Oudenallen, Sebastian)
August 4, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amy L. Judkins for Jasmyn Williams added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
August 2, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jasmyn Williams.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Felice, David)
July 27, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edwin Lee Lowther, III for Jasmyn Williams added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
July 27, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph H. Bates, III for Jasmyn Williams added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, The unopposed Motions (D.I. #19 , #20 ) are GRANTED and Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III, Esquire, and Edwin Lee Lowther, III, Esquire are admitted to practice in this case in this Court under Local Rule 83.5. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 7/26/2022. (apk)
July 26, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edwin Lee Lowther, III - filed by Jasmyn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Edwin Lee Lowther, III, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Felice, David)
July 26, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph Henry Bates, III - filed by Jasmyn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Felice, David)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 7/20/2022. (apk)
July 20, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney of Jeffrey S. Cashdan, Zachary A. McEntyre, Julia C. Barrett, James Matthew Brigman, and Allison Hill White - filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Jeffrey S. Cashdan, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Zachary A. McEntyre, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Julia C. Barrett, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of James Matthew Brigman, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Allison Hill White, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Briggs, Thomas)
July 19, 2022 Filing 16 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Briggs, Thomas)
July 19, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Briggs, Thomas)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amy L. Judkins. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 7/18/2022.(srs) Modified on 8/4/2022 (srs).
July 18, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amy L. Judkins - filed by Jasmyn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Amy L. Judkins, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Felice, David)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Dismiss as Moot. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 07/05/2022. (smg)
July 5, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Progressive Direct Insurance Company- filed by Jasmyn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Comparison to Original, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(Felice, David)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey S. Cashdan, Esquire, Zachary A. McEntyre, Esquire, James Matthew Brigman, Esquire, Allison Hill White, Esquire, and Julia C. Barrett, Esquire to practice under Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.5 is DENIED without prejudice to move compliant with our Policies and Procedures (May 2022) including Section I. (J.). Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 06/21/2022. (smg)
June 20, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan, Zachary A. McEntyre, James Matthew Brigman, Allison Hill, and Julia C. Barrett - filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Briggs, Thomas)
June 20, 2022 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Direct Insurance Company filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Briggs, Thomas)
June 20, 2022 Filing 7 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Briggs, Thomas)
June 20, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Briggs, Thomas)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Mark A. Kearney of the United States District Court for the District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Michael A Chagares on 5/20/22. (gvw)
May 20, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Mark A. Kearney. Please include the initials of the Judge (MAK) after the case number on all documents filed. (gvw)
May 17, 2022 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to June 20, 2022 - filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Briggs, Thomas)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 20, 2022 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Progressive Direct Insurance Company answer due 6/20/2022). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/17/2022. (dlw)
April 28, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmyn Williams. Progressive Direct Insurance Company served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. (Felice, David)
April 27, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Progressive Direct Insurance Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3856798.) - filed by Jasmyn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)
April 21, 2022 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmyn Williams
Represented By: David A. Felice
Represented By: Allison H. White
Represented By: Amy L. Judkins
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Represented By: Jacob L. Phillips
Represented By: James M. Brigman
Represented By: Joseph H. Bates, III
Represented By: Julia C. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas W. Briggs, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Sebastian Van Oudenallen
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Allison H. White
Represented By: Julia C. Barrett
Represented By: James M. Brigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?