Cilag GmbH International et al v. Hospira Worldwide, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cilag GmbH International and Janssen Biotech, Inc.
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira Worldwide Inc. and Hospira, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00589
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nathaniel Lancaster for Cilag GmbH International and Janssen Biotech, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SO ORDERED, re #11 Stipulation to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/24/2022. (nms)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION regarding Response to Complaint Deadlines by Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc.. (Silverstein, Alan)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Cavanaugh Jr., Jonathan H. Hatch and Nathaniel Lancaster - filed by Cilag GmbH International, Janssen Biotech, Inc.. (Giusini, Brittany)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Cavanaugh Jr., Jonathan H. Hatch and Nathaniel Lancaster, filed by Cilag GmbH International, Janssen Biotech, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/24/2022. (nms)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jonathan H. Hatch for Cilag GmbH International and Janssen Biotech, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Cilag GmbH International, Janssen Biotech, Inc. filed by Cilag GmbH International, Janssen Biotech, Inc.. (Giusini, Brittany)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Hospira Inc. for Hospira Worldwide, LLC filed by Hospira Worldwide, LLC. (Silverstein, Alan)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for Hospira, Inc. filed by Hospira, Inc.. (Silverstein, Alan)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Steven B. Weisburd, Mark A. Neubauer for Cilag GmbH International, Janssen Biotech, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Jackson Herndon, David G. Hille, and Kimberly A. Havlin for Hospira Worldwide, LLC and Hospira, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark A. Neubauer and Steven B. Weisburd, filed by Cilag GmbH International, Janssen Biotech, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/18/2022. (nms)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark A. Neubauer and Steven B. Weisburd - filed by Cilag GmbH International, Janssen Biotech, Inc.. (Giusini, Brittany)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Cilag GmbH International. Hospira Worldwide, LLC served on 5/11/2022, answer due 6/1/2022. (Giusini, Brittany)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Cilag GmbH International. Hospira, Inc. served on 5/11/2022, answer due 6/1/2022. (Giusini, Brittany)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David G. Hille, Kimberly A. Havlin, and Jackson Herndon, filed by Hospira, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/17/2022. (nms)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David G. Hille, Kimberly A. Havlin, and Jackson Herndon - filed by Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc.. (Silverstein, Alan)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of DE, Case Number N22C-04-209 (DJB) (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3864721)- filed by Hospira, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cilag GmbH International et al v. Hospira Worldwide, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: David G. Hille
Represented By: Jackson Herndon
Represented By: Kimberly A. Havlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide Inc.
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: David G. Hille
Represented By: Jackson Herndon
Represented By: Kimberly A. Havlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: David G. Hille
Represented By: Jackson Herndon
Represented By: Kimberly A. Havlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cilag GmbH International
Represented By: Beth Moskow-Schnoll
Represented By: Brittany M. Giusini
Represented By: Jonathan H. Hatch
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Represented By: Nathaniel Lancaster
Represented By: Steven B. Weisburd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janssen Biotech, Inc.
Represented By: Beth Moskow-Schnoll
Represented By: Brittany M. Giusini
Represented By: Jonathan H. Hatch
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Represented By: Nathaniel Lancaster
Represented By: Steven B. Weisburd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?