International Business Machines Corporation v. Zynga Inc. et al
Plaintiff: International Business Machines Corporation
Defendant: Zynga Inc. and Chartboost Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00590
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2022)
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Corporate Parent Chartboost, Inc. for Zynga Inc. filed by Chartboost Inc., Zynga Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 101 35 U.S.C. filed by Chartboost Inc., Zynga Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/7/2022. (Farnan, Kelly)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 101 35 U.S.C. - filed by Chartboost Inc., Zynga Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie A. Caras on behalf of Chartboost Inc., Zynga Inc. (Caras, Valerie)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Farnan on behalf of Chartboost Inc., Zynga Inc. (Farnan, Kelly)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint by Defendants (Unopposed) - filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Moore, David)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint by Defendants (Unopposed) filed by International Business Machines Corporation. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Chartboost Inc. answer due 6/23/2022; Zynga Inc. answer due 6/23/2022. Ordered by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/19/2022. (asw)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney John M. Desmarais, Lindsey E. Miller, and Karim Z. Oussayef for International Business Machines Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Raymond N Habbaz for International Business Machines Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 5/4/2022. (ntl)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Desmarais, Karim Z. Oussayef, Lindsey E. Miller and Raymond N. Habbaz of Desmarais LLP filed by International Business Machines Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/4/22. (ntl)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Business Machines Corporation. Chartboost Inc. served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. (Moore, David)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Business Machines Corporation. Zynga Inc. served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. (Moore, David)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Desmarais, Karim Z. Oussayef, Lindsey E. Miller and Raymond N. Habbaz of Desmarais LLP - filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Moore, David)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (mpb)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,072,849 ;7,631,346 ;7,702,719 ;8,315,904. (mpb)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Chartboost Inc., Zynga Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3864786.) - filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order No Summons Issued. (mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Business Machines Corporation v. Zynga Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: Carson Bartlett
Represented By: John M. Desmarais
Represented By: Karim Z. Oussayef
Represented By: Lindsey E. Miller
Represented By: Raymond N Habbaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zynga Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Valerie A. Caras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chartboost Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Valerie A. Caras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?