Brown et al v. Gibson et al
Plaintiff: Lottoria N. Brown, God Child Entertainment, God Child Ministries and Nicki Brown
Defendant: Tyrese Gibson, Zelie Timothy, Voltron Recordz Company, Voltron, Voltron Travel LLC and Voltron travel.com
Case Number: 1:2022cv00618
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, The entities God Child Entertainment and Ministries, God Child, and Nicki Brown must be represented by counsel and must pay the filing fee. They are given until July 29, 2022 to do so. Failure to comply with this order will result in the dismissal of Plaintiffs God Child Entertainment and Ministries, God Child, and Nicki Brown. (See Order for further details). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 06/21/2022. (smg)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice by Lottoria N. Brown, Nicki Brown, God Child Entertainment, God Child Ministries (Attachments: #1 Complaint Signature Page with Additional Signatures)(srs)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, On or before June 13, 2022, God Child Entertainment, God Child Ministries, and Nicki Brown each shall file a signed copy of the Complaint. (D.I. #2 ). Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(a) requires each pro se plaintiff to sign every pleading, written motion, or other paper submitted to the Court with respect to his or her claims. If each wish to appear as co-plaintiffs in this matter, each shall correct the deficiency by filing a signed complaint. The foregoing Plaintiffs are placed on notice that their failure to timely submit a signed Complaint will result in their respective dismissal from the case without prejudice.( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/13/2022.) Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/12/2022. (apk)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Tyrese Gibson, Zelie Timothy, Voltron, Voltron Recordz Company, Voltron Travel LLC, Voltron travel.com - filed by God Child Ministries, God Child Entertainment, Lottoria Brown, Nicki Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Lottoria Brown. (smg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Gibson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lottoria N. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: God Child Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: God Child Ministries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicki Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrese Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zelie Timothy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voltron Recordz Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voltron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voltron Travel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voltron travel.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?