Yankees Entertainment and Sports Network, LLC v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Yankees Entertainment, Sports Network, LLC and Yankees Entertainment and Sports Network, LLC
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00622
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hartford Fire Insurance Company - filed by Yankees Entertainment and Sports Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 redline version)(Chapple, Benjamin) Modified on 6/30/2022 (nms).
June 30, 2022 Filing 7 Stipulation and Proposed Order Governing the Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, by Sports Network, LLC, Yankees Entertainment. (Chapple, Benjamin) Modified on 6/30/2022 (nms).
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 Stipulation and Proposed Order Governing the Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (*Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/30/2022. (nms)
June 30, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. #8 has been corrected to reflect the Complaint is against Hartford Fire Insurance Company and not the plaintiffs. (nms)
May 25, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Governing Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss or Transfer - filed by Sports Network, LLC, Yankees Entertainment. (Chapple, Benjamin) Modified on 5/25/2022 (nms).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Governing Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or In Alternative To Transfer To U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York. Answering Brief due 6/30/2022., Reply Brief due 7/21/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/25/2022. (nms)
May 18, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
May 17, 2022 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or In Alternative To Transfer To U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burleigh, Tracy) Modified on 5/18/2022 (nms).
May 17, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or In Alternative To Transfer To U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York - filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Burleigh, Tracy) Modified on 5/18/2022 (nms).
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (mpb)
May 10, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N22C-04-109 EMD (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3870623)- filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yankees Entertainment and Sports Network, LLC v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yankees Entertainment
Represented By: Benjamin P. Chapple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sports Network, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin P. Chapple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yankees Entertainment and Sports Network, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin P. Chapple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Tracy A. Burleigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?