Beanland v. Federal Express Corporation
Plaintiff: Darren Beanland
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv00672
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Mark A Kearney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Colleen Hitch Wilson - filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Rushdan, Wali)
July 21, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Wali W. Rushdan, II on behalf of Federal Express Corporation (Rushdan, Wali)
July 21, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael J. Scimone for Darren Beanland added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Nathan Cook & Substitution of Kimberly Evans as Delaware Counsel for Plaintiff by Darren Beanland (Cook, Nathan)
July 19, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Ann Evans on behalf of Darren Beanland (Evans, Kimberly)
June 28, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert D. Friedman and Peter Romert-Friedman for Darren Beanland added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Scimone. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 6/24/2022. (nmg)
June 24, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Darren Beanland: For Federal Express Corporation waiver sent on 5/27/2022, answer due 7/26/2022. (Cook, Nathan)
June 24, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Scimone - filed by Darren Beanland. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit of Michael J. Scimone, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Nathan)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, the Motions for admission pro hac vice (D.I. #12 , #13 ) are GRANTED and Peter Romer-Friedman, Esquire, and Robert D. Friedman, Esquire are admitted to practice in this case in this Court under Local Rule 83.5. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 6/23/2022. (twk)
June 22, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert D. Friedman - filed by Darren Beanland. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit of Robert D. Friedman, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Nathan)
June 22, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter Romer-Friedman - filed by Darren Beanland. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit of Peter Romer-Friedman, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Nathan)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter Romer-Friedman ; and denying #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert D. Friedman. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 06/21/2022. (smg)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert D. Friedman - filed by Darren Beanland. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Robert D. Friedman)(Cook, Nathan)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter Romer-Friedman - filed by Darren Beanland. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Peter Romer-Friedman)(Cook, Nathan)
May 31, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas G. Jarrard for Darren Beanland added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating the Honorable Mark A. Kearney of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Michael A Chagares on 5/26/22. (gvw)
May 26, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert J. Barton for Darren Beanland added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
May 26, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Mark A. Kearney. Please include the initials of the Judge (MAK) after the case number on all documents filed. (gvw)
May 26, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Colin M. Downes for Darren Beanland added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
May 26, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew Z. Crotty for Darren Beanland added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
May 25, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas G. Jarrard - filed by Darren Beanland. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Thomas G. Jarrard)(Cook, Nathan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew Z. Crotty - filed by Darren Beanland. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Matthew Z. Crotty)(Cook, Nathan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Colin M. Downes - filed by Darren Beanland. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Colin M. Downes)(Cook, Nathan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Joseph Barton - filed by Darren Beanland. (Attachments: #1 Certification by R. Joseph Barton)(Cook, Nathan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal Express Corporation on 5/25/2022. (smg)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Joseph Barton, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas G. Jarrard, #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew Z. Crotty, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Colin M. Downes filed by Darren Beanland. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/25/2022. (dlw)
May 25, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
May 24, 2022 Remark: $402 Civil Filing Fee refunded pursuant to 38 U.S.C. 4301. (twk)
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Federal Express Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3879867.) - filed by Darren Beanland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)
May 23, 2022 No Summons Issued. (mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beanland v. Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Beanland
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Cook
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Evans
Represented By: Colin M. Downes
Represented By: Matthew Z. Crotty
Represented By: Michael J. Scimone
Represented By: Peter Romert-Friedman
Represented By: Robert J. Barton
Represented By: Robert D. Friedman
Represented By: Thomas G. Jarrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Wali W. Rushdan, II.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?