Guerrero v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Guerrero
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC and Siculus, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00750
Filed: June 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2022 Remark: Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in California Northern District as case 4:22-cv-05894, filed 10/13/2022. (srs)
October 12, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER signed by The Honorable Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and certified by Jessie Mosley, Deputy Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (dlw)
October 12, 2022 Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (dlw)
August 5, 2022 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Meta Platforms, Inc. for Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Siculus, Inc. filed by Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and Order to Stay All Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer by Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #14 Stipulation and Order to Stay All Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer. Should the transfer be denied, Defendants shall have 30 days from the date of the MDL Panel's decision to file a response to the Complaint. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/5/2022. (dlw)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to August 15, 2022. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Holdings, LLC answer due 8/15/2022; Facebook Operations, LLC answer due 8/15/2022; Facebook Payments, Inc. answer due 8/15/2022; Facebook Technologies, LLC answer due 8/15/2022; Instagram, LLC answer due 8/15/2022; Meta Platforms, Inc. answer due 8/15/2022; Siculus, Inc. answer due 8/15/2022. Ordered by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/24/2022. (asw)
June 23, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to August 15, 2022 - filed by Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 15, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph G. VanZandt - filed by Jessica Guerrero. (Bifferato, Ian)
June 15, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clinton Richardson - filed by Jessica Guerrero. (Bifferato, Ian)
June 15, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Clinton Richardson for Jessica Guerrero added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
June 15, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clinton Richardson, #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph G. VanZandt filed by Jessica Guerrero. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/15/2022. (dlw)
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Guerrero. Siculus, Inc. served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Guerrero. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Guerrero. Instagram, LLC served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Guerrero. Facebook Technologies, LLC served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Guerrero. Facebook Payments, Inc. served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Guerrero. Facebook Operations, LLC served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Guerrero. Facebook Holdings, LLC served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk)
June 7, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
June 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3890619.) - filed by Jessica Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Guerrero
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Clinton Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Operations, LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Payments, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram, LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siculus, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?