Westrock CP, LLC v. Ming's Resource Corporation
Plaintiff: Westrock CP, LLC
Defendant: Ming's Resource Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv00870
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Filing 37 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 7/28/2022. (mpb)
June 28, 2022 Filing 36 Record of case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:22-cv-00176. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STATUS PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 06/01/2022 VACATING the Status Pretrial Scheduling Conference scheduled for 06/06/2022; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 8/29/2022; Discovery due by 10/31/2022; Motions filed by 12/30/2022; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Rodriguez, E) Modified on 6/1/2022 (York, M). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
June 1, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #35 Scheduling Order served on Matthew J. Yium NCAED. (Rodriguez, E) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
May 20, 2022 Filing 34 JOINT RULE 26 (f) REPORT and DISCOVERY PLAN by Westrock CP, LLC. (Emch, Christopher) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
May 3, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Association of Counsel and Change in Designation of Counsel for Service by Westrock CP, LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/20/22 GRANTING #19 WestRock's motion to sever MRC's counterclaims and transfer them to the District of Delaware; and GRANTING #19 WestRock's motion to strike MRC's offset affirmative defense. (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
April 21, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #32 Order served on Matthew J. Yium NCAED. (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Filing 31 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 4/18/2022 re #19 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims; alternative Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Counterclaims; and Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses. Counsel argue. MOTION SUBMITTED. The Court will issue a separate order. Plaintiff's Counsel Kathleen Bricken present. Defendant's Counsel Ryan Meyer present. Court Reporter: Tiphanne Crowe. (Kirksey Smith, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
March 21, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Disassociation of Prior Local Counsel, Peter S. Willcox-Jones, by Ming's Resource Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Meyer, Ryan) Modified on 3/22/2022 (Huang, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Filing 29 OPPOSITION by Ming's Resource Corporation to #28 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Meyer, Ryan) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION to DISMISS by Westrock CP, LLC. Attorney Bricken, Kathleen C. added. Motion Hearing re #19 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims reset for 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Bricken, Kathleen) Modified on 3/24/2022 (Kirksey Smith, K). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorneys Matthew J. Yium, NCAED and Peter S. Willcox-Jones, NCAED : Attorneys are DIRECTED to register for admission to the Eastern District of California. Please visit PACER.gov for admission. (Maldonado, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Filing 26 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Maldonado, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
January 27, 2022 Filing 25 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oregon; Case Number 3:21-cv-00929. [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER of Transfer regarding Opinion and Order #23 . IT IS SO ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Signed on 01/07/2022 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kgc) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Opinion and Order: For the reasons given above, I GRANT Ming's Resource's Motion to Transfer Venue [ECF 13]. I order this case to be transferred to the Eastern District of California. I leave Westrock's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims [ECF 19] to be decided by the receiving court. Signed on 1/7/2022 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 22 Reply to Motion to Dismiss CounterclaimsAlternative Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Counterclaims Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses Counterclaim #10 , Answer to Complaint #9 #19 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Westrock CP, LLC. (Yium, Matthew) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 21 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss CounterclaimsAlternative Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Counterclaims Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses Counterclaim #10 , Answer to Complaint #9 #19 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Ming's Resource Corporation. (Meyer, Ryan) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 20 Reply to Motion to Change or Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of California #13 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Ming's Resource Corporation. (Meyer, Ryan) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 19 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, Alternative Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Counterclaims, Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses Counterclaim #10 , Answer to Complaint #9 . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Westrock CP, LLC. (Yium, Matthew) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 18 Declaration of Matthew J. Yium in Support of WestRock's Opposition to Ming's Motion to Transfer Venue. Filed by Westrock CP, LLC. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #16 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Yium, Matthew) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 17 Declaration of Chris Sewell in Support of WestRock's Opposition to Ming's Motion to Transfer Venue. Filed by Westrock CP, LLC. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #16 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Yium, Matthew) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Change or Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of California #13 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Westrock CP, LLC. (Yium, Matthew) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #14 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendants Motion to Transfer #13 by 10/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Change or Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of California #13 . Filed by Westrock CP, LLC. (Yium, Matthew) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 Motion to Change or Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of California. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Ming's Resource Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration of Kevin Luong, #3 Declaration of Ryan Meyer, #4 Request for Judicial Notice) (Meyer, Ryan) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Ming's Resource Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of Service) (Meyer, Ryan) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 Counterclaim as to Westrock CP, LLC. Filed by Ming's Resource Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of Service). (Meyer, Ryan) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Ming's Resource Corporation. (Meyer, Ryan) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 . Attorney Ryan Meyer added. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
August 26, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ryan Meyer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8194115 #6 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Meyer. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: Local counsel was not a member of our bar. Replaced PDF listing corrected local counsel. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (sss) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ryan Meyer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8194115. Filed by Ming's Resource Corporation. (Meyer, Ryan) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/23/2021) (sss). [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Ming's Resource Corporation waiver sent on 7/12/2021. Filed by Westrock CP, LLC. (Yium, Matthew) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ming's Resource Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/22/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/22/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 11/22/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Westrock CP, LLC. (Yium, Matthew) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8131207 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Westrock CP, LLC against Ming's Resource Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons). (Yium, Matthew) [Transferred from ord on 1/27/2022.] [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/28/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westrock CP, LLC v. Ming's Resource Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westrock CP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming's Resource Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?