Unstoppable Domains Inc. v. Gateway Registry, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Unstoppable Domains Inc.
Defendant: Gateway Registry, Inc., James Stevens and Does 1-100
Intervenor: Scott Florcsk
Case Number: 1:2022cv00948
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Filing 31 DECLARATION re #30 Reply Brief, [Declaration of Scott Florcsk] by Scott Florcsk. (Palapura, Bindu)
September 14, 2022 Filing 30 REPLY BRIEF re #22 MOTION to Intervene [Non-Party Scott Florcsk's Motion to Intervene as Defendant and Request to Stay Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Default Judgment] filed by Scott Florcsk. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Palapura, Bindu)
September 7, 2022 Filing 29 DECLARATION re #27 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Samuel Sazer - by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B)(Flynn, Michael)
September 7, 2022 Filing 28 DECLARATION re #27 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Michael Flynn - by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2)(Flynn, Michael)
September 7, 2022 Filing 27 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Intervene [Non-Party Scott Florcsk's Motion to Intervene as Defendant and Request to Stay Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Default Judgment] - filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/14/2022. (Flynn, Michael)
August 31, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eugene Rome and Sridavi Ganesan for Scott Florcsk added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mkr)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eugene Rome and Sridavi Ganesan of Rome & Associates, A.P.C., filed by Scott Florcsk. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/30/2022. (kmd)
August 29, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eugene Rome and Sridavi Ganesan of Rome & Associates, A.P.C. - filed by Scott Florcsk. (Moore, David)
August 29, 2022 Filing 25 DECLARATION re #22 MOTION to Intervene [Non-Party Scott Florcsk's Motion to Intervene as Defendant and Request to Stay Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Default Judgment] [Declaration of Sridavi Ganesan] by Scott Florcsk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Palapura, Bindu)
August 29, 2022 Filing 24 DECLARATION re #22 MOTION to Intervene [Non-Party Scott Florcsk's Motion to Intervene as Defendant and Request to Stay Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Default Judgment] [Declaration of Scott Florcsk] by Scott Florcsk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Palapura, Bindu)
August 29, 2022 Filing 23 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #22 MOTION to Intervene [Non-Party Scott Florcsk's Motion to Intervene as Defendant and Request to Stay Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Default Judgment] filed by Scott Florcsk.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Palapura, Bindu)
August 29, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Intervene [Non-Party Scott Florcsk's Motion to Intervene as Defendant and Request to Stay Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Default Judgment] - filed by Scott Florcsk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palapura, Bindu)
August 23, 2022 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Service re #17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Gateway Registry, Inc., James Stevens MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #18 Opening Brief in Support, #19 Declaration, #20 Declaration - by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C)(Flynn, Michael)
August 19, 2022 Filing 20 DECLARATION re #17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Gateway Registry, Inc., James Stevens MOTION for Permanent Injunction -- Declaration of Michael Flynn -- by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 1-10)(Flynn, Michael)
August 19, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Gateway Registry, Inc., James Stevens MOTION for Permanent Injunction -- Declaration of Elizabeth Grabowski -- by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 1-3)(Flynn, Michael)
August 19, 2022 Filing 18 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Gateway Registry, Inc., James Stevens MOTION for Permanent Injunction - filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/2/2022. (Flynn, Michael)
August 19, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Gateway Registry, Inc., James Stevens, MOTION for Permanent Injunction - filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
August 18, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of a copy of the Clerk of Court's August 16, 2022 Entry of Default (D.I. 15) - filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc..(Flynn, Michael)
August 16, 2022 Filing 15 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT IN APPEARANCE as to Gateway Registry, Inc., James Stevens - Re: #14 Request for Default filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc. (nmf)
August 16, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Hearing held on 8/16/2022. (Court Reporter Bonnie Archer.) (nmf)
August 12, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST for Default as to Gateway Registry, Inc., James Stevens - filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Entry of Default)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 11, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of a copy of the Court's August 11, 2022 Oral Order setting a hearing for August 16, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc..(Flynn, Michael)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall serve notice of the 8/16/2022 hearing on Defendants. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/11/2022. (nmf)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction :( A Motion Hearing is set for 8/16/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Colm F. Connolly.) Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/11/2022. (nmf)
August 9, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Telephone Conference held on 8/9/2022. (Court Reporter Bonnie Archer.) (nmf)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew D. Skale, filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/8/2022. (kmd)
August 4, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) a copy of the Court's August 4, 2022 Oral Order setting a teleconference for August 9, 2022 at 4:00 p.m.; and (2) dial-in information for the teleconference filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc..(Flynn, Michael)
August 4, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew D. Skale - filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc., ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Plaintiff to coordinate the call and email the dial-in information to chambers. (A Telephone Conference is set for 8/9/2022 at 04:00 PM Telephonically before Judge Colm F. Connolly.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff shall provide notice of this order to Defendant and shall file the proof of service on the docket. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/4/2022. (nmf)
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (D.I. 7); (2) Plaintiff's Opening Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (D.I. 8); and (3) Declaration of Bradley Kam in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (D.I. 9) - filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc..(Flynn, Michael)
July 29, 2022 Filing 9 DECLARATION re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (of Bradley Kam) - by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 1-6)(Flynn, Michael)
July 29, 2022 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/12/2022. (Flynn, Michael)
July 29, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
July 27, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 21, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. James Stevens served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 21, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. Gateway Registry, Inc. served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 19, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gateway Registry, Inc. on 7/19/2022; James Stevens on 7/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued James Stevens)(mpb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. (mpb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Does 1-100, Gateway Registry, Inc., James Stevens ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3918398.) - filed by Unstoppable Domains Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unstoppable Domains Inc. v. Gateway Registry, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unstoppable Domains Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Registry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Scott Florcsk
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Eugene Rome
Represented By: Sridavi Ganesan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?