Salvemini et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michele Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini and Mariangela Salvemini
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Paramount Global, Redco Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, A.W. Chesterton Company, Phillips Petroleum Company, Elliott Company, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Amerada Hess Corporation, ITT LLC, McNally Industries, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, ViacomCBS Inc., Viacom, Inc. and Crane Co.
Cross Claimant: Hess Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv00977
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2023 Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Death Certificate and Identity Cards filed by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini.(Bifferato, Ian)
February 24, 2023 Filing 81 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jake Reber, Esquire - filed by FMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certification)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Glenn, Neal)
February 24, 2023 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pro hac motions previously filed as D.I. numbers 81 and 82 have been deleted. Counsel is advised to contact the clerk's office for instructions on how to file one pro hac motion on behalf of more than one defendant rather than filing two separate motions. (lih)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #81 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jake Reber, Esquire. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/24/2023. (lih)
February 23, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Answers to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini.(Bifferato, Ian)
February 23, 2023 Filing 79 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph P. Fiteni - filed by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Sunshine, Paul) Modified on 2/23/2023 (lih).
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #79 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph P. Fiteni. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/23/2023. (lih)
February 22, 2023 Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Translated Medical Records filed by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini.(Bifferato, Ian)
February 21, 2023 Filing 77 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michele Salvemini on February 27, 2023 filed by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini.(Bifferato, Ian)
February 21, 2023 Filing 76 Cross NOTICE of of Deposition by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini re #75 Notice to Take Deposition, (Bifferato, Ian)
February 21, 2023 Filing 75 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michele Salvemini on February 27, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. ET, 7:00 a.m. PT, and 4:00 p.m. Central European Time, filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(sued individually and as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., a Pennsylvania Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Pennsylvania). (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Agreement Regarding Virtual Deposition of Plaintiff Michele Salvemini)(Sullivan, Timothy)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #73 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carolyn OConnor. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/21/2023. (lih)
February 20, 2023 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie M. O'Dell on behalf of Hess Corporation (O'Dell, Julie)
February 20, 2023 Filing 73 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carolyn OConnor - filed by Hess Corporation. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Beste, Robert)
February 17, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michele Salvemini on February 27, 2023, at 4:00 p.m. Italy time, 10:00 a.m. ET, 7:00 a.m. PT at Plaintiff's residence, Traversa Tommaso De Amicis No. 52, Napoli, Italy filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(sued individually and as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., a Pennsylvania Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Pennsylvania). (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Agreement Regarding Virtual Deposition of Plaintiff Michele Salvemini)(Sullivan, Timothy)
February 14, 2023 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Medical Records re #70 Notice of Service filed by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini.(Bifferato, Ian)
February 14, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Medical Records filed by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini.(Bifferato, Ian)
January 31, 2023 Filing 69 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Armitage - filed by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Bifferato, Ian)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #69 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Armitage. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/31/2023. (lih)
January 31, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael Armitage for Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, and Michele Salvemini added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
January 27, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by ITT LLC (Costello, Kelly)
January 27, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Goulds Pumps LLC (Costello, Kelly)
January 27, 2023 Filing 66 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Elliott Company (Costello, Kelly)
January 23, 2023 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Initial Disclosures previously filed at D.I. 66 have been deleted from the docket for failure to comply with D. Del. LR 5.4(b). (lih)
January 20, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Medical Records and Diagnostic Materials filed by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini.(Bifferato, Ian)
November 2, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INITIAL DISCLOSURE - RULE 26(a)(1) filed by Flowserve US, Inc..(Preston, Willard)
November 2, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini.(Farnan, Michael)
November 1, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Hess Corporation.(Beste, Robert)
November 1, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: : The Initial Disclosures previously filed at D.I. 62 have been deleted from the docket for failure to comply with D. Del. LR 5.4(b). (lih)
October 31, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by General Electric Company.(Texter, Allison)
October 31, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Paramount Global.(Texter, Allison)
October 31, 2022 Filing 59 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Ebara Corporation, Other Affiliate Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliott Company filed by Elliott Company. (Costello, Kelly)
October 31, 2022 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Elliott Company.(Costello, Kelly)
October 31, 2022 Filing 57 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Sapphire Topco Inc. for Goulds Pumps LLC filed by Goulds Pumps LLC. (Costello, Kelly)
October 31, 2022 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Goulds Pumps LLC.(Costello, Kelly)
October 31, 2022 Filing 55 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Sapphire Topco Inc. for ITT LLC filed by ITT LLC. (Costello, Kelly)
October 31, 2022 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by ITT LLC.(Costello, Kelly)
October 31, 2022 Filing 53 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate General Electric Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate GE Capital, Other Affiliate NBC Universal Inc., Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity, Other Affiliate General Electric Capital Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Universal City Development Partners, Ltd., Other Affiliate NBC Universal Media, LLC (a/k/a NBC Universal), Other Affiliate Value Vision Media, Inc. for General Electric Company filed by General Electric Company. (Texter, Allison) Modified on 10/31/2022 (lih).
October 31, 2022 Filing 52 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by General Electric Company.(Texter, Allison) Modified on 10/31/2022 (lih).
October 31, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf's of D.I. numbers #52 and #53 have been replaced with revised versions of the documents to correct the case caption. (lih)
October 27, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Redco Corporation.(Texter, Allison)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 3/27/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 3/27/2023. Discovery due by 3/15/2024. Status Report due by 3/25/2024. A Status Conference is set for 4/2/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Dispositive Motions due by 4/25/2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 scheduling teleconference set for October 25, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. (PLEASE REFER TO SCHEDULING ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/24/2022. (lih)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER - Whereas a summons was returned executed as to each of the following Defendants: Elliott Co. on 7/27/22 and its answer was due on 8/17/22 (D.I. #5 ); General Electric Co. on 8/2/22 and its answer was due on 8/23/22 (D.I. #18 ); Goulds Pumps LLC on 7/27/22 and its answer was due on 8/17/22 (D.I. #8 ); and ITT LLC on 8/1/22 and its answer was due on 8/22/22 (D.I. #10 ); Whereas, according to the docket, none of the aforementioned Defendants have answered, objected or otherwise pleaded to the complaint; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before October 31, 2022, each of the aforementioned Defendants shall file its responsive pleading and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement or, alternatively, if such Defendant is no longer active in the case, a notice of Dismissal shall be filed. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/24/2022. (lih)
October 21, 2022 Filing 49 Joint PROPOSED Scheduling Order by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Chart of Deadlines)(Bifferato, Ian) Modified on 10/21/2022 (lih).
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re D.I. #48 Having reviewed the parties' Joint Proposed Scheduling Order and finding it does not comply with this court's previous oral order on 9/29/2022, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that parties shall submit a revised proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 10/21/2022 by 4pm. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/21/2022. (lih)
October 20, 2022 Filing 48 Joint PROPOSED Scheduling Order by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini. (Bifferato, Ian) Modified on 10/21/2022 (lih).
September 29, 2022 Filing 47 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC for Redco Corporation filed by Redco Corporation. (Texter, Allison)
September 29, 2022 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Redco Corporation.(Skiles, Nicholas) Modified on 9/29/2022 (lih).
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 10/25/2022 at 10:00 a.m. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 10/20/2022. (3) Counsel are instructed to use Judge Fallon's form asbestos scheduling order posted at https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon for all events up to and including Status Conference and Judge Noreika's form non-patent scheduling order posted at https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/judge-maryellen-noreika for all events including and following Case Dispositive Motions and shall include a chart of the deadlines as an exhibit to the proposed Scheduling Order. Regardless of the number of Daubert motions and case dispositive issues raised by a moving party, the moving party shall file only one opening brief with briefing subject to the page limitations set forth in Local Rule 7.1.3(4), 20 pages for the opening and answering briefs and 10 pages for the reply. These requirements shall be included in the proposed Scheduling Order. (4) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/29/2022. (lih)
September 19, 2022 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by ConocoPhillips Company.(Sunshine, Paul) Modified on 9/19/2022 (lih).
September 19, 2022 Filing 44 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips for ConocoPhillips Company filed by ConocoPhillips Company. (Sunshine, Paul)
September 16, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Sunshine on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company (Sunshine, Paul)
September 13, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by FMC Corporation.(Glenn, Neal)
September 13, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by McNally Industries, LLC.(Glenn, Neal)
September 13, 2022 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by FMC Corporation. (Glenn, Neal)
September 13, 2022 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC Corporation.(Glenn, Neal) Modified on 9/13/2022 (lih).
September 13, 2022 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by McNally Industries, LLC. (Glenn, Neal)
September 13, 2022 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by McNally Industries, LLC.(Glenn, Neal) Modified on 9/13/2022 (lih).
August 22, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Bifferato, Ian)
August 19, 2022 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US, Inc. filed by Flowserve US, Inc.. (Preston, Willard)
August 19, 2022 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Flowserve US, Inc..(Preston, Willard)
August 19, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Willard F. Preston, III on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Preston, Willard)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SO ORDERED re #30 Stipulation of Dismissal. Party A.W. Chesterton Company (a Massachusetts Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Massachusetts) terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/19/2022. (dlw)
August 19, 2022 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with with Jury demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Sullivan, Timothy)
August 18, 2022 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company by Francesco Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Michele Salvemini. (Bifferato, Ian) Modified on 8/19/2022 (dlw).
August 18, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of ITT LLC (Costello, Kelly)
August 18, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Goulds Pumps LLC (Costello, Kelly)
August 18, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Elliott Company (Costello, Kelly)
August 18, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal C. Glenn on behalf of McNally Industries, LLC (Glenn, Neal)
August 16, 2022 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Hess Corporation. (Beste, Robert)
August 16, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Hess Corporation.(Beste, Robert)
August 16, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Karl Beste, III on behalf of Hess Corporation (Beste, Robert)
August 16, 2022 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for Paramount Global filed by Paramount Global. (Texter, Allison)
August 16, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Paramount Global.(Texter, Allison)
August 8, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 8, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. McNally Industries, LLC served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 8, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. General Electric Company served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 8, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. Flowserve Corporation served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 8, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 3, 2022 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sullivan, Timothy)
August 3, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Sullivan, III on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Sullivan, Timothy)
August 3, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
August 3, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 2, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal C. Glenn on behalf of FMC Corporation (Glenn, Neal)
August 1, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. Redco Corporation served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. Paramount Global served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. ITT LLC served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 1, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. Hess Corporation served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 1, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. Goulds Pumps LLC served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 1, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. FMC Corporation served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 1, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. Flowserve US, Inc. served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 1, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. Elliott Company served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
August 1, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. ConocoPhillips Company served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
July 26, 2022 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (smg)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against A.W. Chesterton Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, ConocoPhillips Company, Elliott Company, FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Hess Corporation, ITT LLC, McNally Industries, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Paramount Global, Redco Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BDEDC-3922697.) - filed by Michele Salvemini, Mariangela Salvemini, Marco Salvemini, Francesco Salvemini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvemini et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Paul D. Sunshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Petroleum Company
Represented By: Paul D. Sunshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Represented By: Bernadette M. Plaza
Represented By: Willard F. Preston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Incorporated
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerada Hess Corporation
Represented By: Robert Karl Beste, III
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNally Industries, LLC
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Hess Corporation
Represented By: Robert Karl Beste, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Salvemini
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Michael Armitage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francesco Salvemini
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Michael Armitage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Salvemini
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Michael Armitage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariangela Salvemini
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Michael Armitage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?