ReCor Medical, Inc. v. Recora, Inc.
Plaintiff: ReCor Medical, Inc.
Defendant: Recora, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01118
Filed: August 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joshua A. Dalton for Recora, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
October 14, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua A. Dalton - filed by Recora, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joshua A. Dalton)(Dudash, Amy)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua A. Dalton, filed by Recora, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/14/2022. (nms)
October 4, 2022 Filing 6 FIRST Amended Complaint against Recora, Inc. - filed by ReCor Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Pascale, Karen) Modified on 10/5/2022 (nms).
August 31, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 29, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by ReCor Medical, Inc.: For Recora, Inc. waiver sent on 8/24/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. (Pascale, Karen)
August 25, 2022 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka Holdings Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Otsuka Medical Devices Co., Ltd. for ReCor Medical, Inc. filed by ReCor Medical, Inc.. (mpb)
August 25, 2022 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,355,782 ;90/471,601 ;97/306,871. (mpb)
August 25, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
August 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Recora, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3944654.) - filed by ReCor Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)
August 25, 2022 No Summons Issued. (mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ReCor Medical, Inc. v. Recora, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ReCor Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recora, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Michele Dudash
Represented By: Joshua A. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?