Sage Chemical, Inc. et al v. Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sage Chemical, Inc. and TruPharma, LLC
Defendant: Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Britannia Pharmaceuticals Limited, US WildMeds Partners, LLC, MDD US Enterprises, LLC, MDD US Operations, LLC, US WorldMeds Partners, LLC, USWM Enterprises, LLC, US WorldMeds, LLC, USWM, LLC, John Breckinridge Jones, Herbert Lee Warren, Jr., Henry van den Berg and Kristen L. Gullo
Case Number: 1:2022cv01302
Filed: October 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SO ORDERED, re #27 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint and Setting Forth Briefing Schedule and Word-Count Limits, filed by Britannia Pharmaceuticals Limited. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/17/2022. (kmd)
November 17, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Lipkin on behalf of MDD US Enterprises, LLC, MDD US Operations, LLC, Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Lipkin, Gary)
November 17, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler B. Burns on behalf of Britannia Pharmaceuticals Limited (Burns, Tyler)
November 17, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Moskow-Schnoll on behalf of Britannia Pharmaceuticals Limited (Moskow-Schnoll, Beth)
November 17, 2022 Filing 27 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint and Setting Forth Briefing Schedule and Word-Count Limits re #16 Amended Complaint,, by Britannia Pharmaceuticals Limited. (Moskow-Schnoll, Beth)
November 4, 2022 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #16 Amended Complaint,, Notification of Service of Defendants Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., MDD US Enterprises, LLC, and MDD US Operations, LLC Acknowledgement filed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Miller, Daniel)
November 4, 2022 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #16 Amended Complaint,, Notification of Service of Defendant Britannia Pharmaceuticals Acknowledgement filed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Miller, Daniel)
November 1, 2022 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #16 Amended Complaint,, Notification of Service of Defendants US WorldMeds, Partners, LLC, USWM, LLC, Paul Breckinridge Jones, Herbert Lee Warren, Jr., Henry van den Berg, and Kristen L. Gullo Acknowledgement filed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Miller, Daniel)
October 26, 2022 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Herbert Lee Warren, Jr on 10/26/2022. (mpb)
October 26, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Streifthau-Livizos on behalf of Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Streifthau-Livizos, Michelle)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Under Seal and for a Preliminary Protective Order, filed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/26/2022. (kmd)
October 26, 2022 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Kristen L. Gullo on 10/26/2022; John Breckinridge Jones on 10/26/2022; MDD US Enterprises, LLC on 10/26/2022; MDD US Operations, LLC on 10/26/2022; USWM, LLC on 10/26/2022; Henry van den Berg on 10/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to MDD US Operations, LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Henry van den Berg, #3 Summons Issued as to Kristen L. Gullo, #4 Summons Issued as to Paul Breckinridge Jones, #5 Summons Issued as to USWM, LLC)(mpb)
October 26, 2022 Filing 19 REDACTED VERSION of #16 Amended Complaint,, by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Miller, Daniel)
October 26, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Seal Document: #16 Amended Complaint,, Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Under Seal and for a Preliminary Protective Order - filed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Daniel)
October 26, 2022 Filing 17 EXHIBIT re #16 Amended Complaint,, Exhibits A-H to First Amended Complaint by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H)(Miller, Daniel)
October 26, 2022 Filing 16 [SEALED] First AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Defendants Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Britannia Pharmaceuticals Limited, US WorldMeds Partners, LLC, MDD US Enterprises, LLC (f/k/a USWM Enterprises, LLC), MDD US Operations, LLC (f/k/a US WorldMeds, LLC), USWM, LLC, Paul Breckinridge Jones, Herbert Lee Warren, Jr., Henry van den Berg, and Kristen L. Gullo against All Defendants - filed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Daniel)
October 13, 2022 Filing 15 DECLARATION re #14 Return of Service Executed, Declaration of Freya MacCormack in Support of Plaintiffs' Proof of Service by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Miller, Daniel)
October 13, 2022 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. Britannia Pharmaceuticals Limited served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G)(Miller, Daniel)
October 5, 2022 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. US WorldMeds Partners, LLC served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (Miller, Daniel)
October 5, 2022 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (Miller, Daniel)
October 5, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Susannah Torpey and W. Gordon Dobie for Sage Chemical, Inc. and TruPharma, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney W. Gordon Dobie filed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC, #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Susannah Torpey filed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/5/2022. (nmf)
October 5, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 4, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Susannah Torpey - filed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Miller, Daniel)
October 4, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney W. Gordon Dobie - filed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Miller, Daniel)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal and for a Preliminary Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/3/2022. (apk)
October 3, 2022 Filing 8 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Miller, Daniel)
October 3, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Britannia Pharmaceuticals Limited on 10/3/2022; Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 10/3/2022; US WorldMeds Partners, LLC on 10/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued)(apk)
October 3, 2022 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent TruPharma Holdings, L.P. for TruPharma, LLC filed by TruPharma, LLC. (apk)
October 3, 2022 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Sage Chemical, Inc. (apk)
October 3, 2022 Filing 4 EXHIBITS A-D to D.I. #2 Complaint by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)(apk)
October 3, 2022 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
October 3, 2022 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Britannia Pharmaceuticals Limited, Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., US WorldMeds Partners, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3973472.) - filed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)
October 3, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal and for a Preliminary Protective Order - filed by Sage Chemical, Inc., TruPharma, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(apk)
October 3, 2022 Remark: Exit Electronic Copies to Duty Judge (RGA) (apk)
October 3, 2022 Remark: Case Submitted for Routine Judicial Assignment. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sage Chemical, Inc. et al v. Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sage Chemical, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R. Miller
Represented By: Susannah Torpey
Represented By: W. Gordon Dobie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TruPharma, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R. Miller
Represented By: Susannah Torpey
Represented By: W. Gordon Dobie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Lipkin
Represented By: Michelle Streifthau-Livizos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britannia Pharmaceuticals Limited
Represented By: Beth Moskow-Schnoll
Represented By: Tyler B. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US WildMeds Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDD US Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Gary Lipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDD US Operations, LLC
Represented By: Gary Lipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US WorldMeds Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USWM Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Gary Lipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US WorldMeds, LLC
Represented By: Gary Lipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USWM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Breckinridge Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Lee Warren, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry van den Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen L. Gullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?