J-Hanna et al v. US Radiology Specialists, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ariann J-Hanna and Nicole Pyle
Defendant: US Radiology Specialists, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01384
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to a Date After Resolution of the Joint Motion to Stay, filed by US Radiology Specialists, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/2/2022. (kmd)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE. Motions terminated: #4 Joint MOTION to Stay, filed by US Radiology Specialists, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/2/2022. (kmd)
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to a Date After Resolution of the Joint Motion to Stay - filed by US Radiology Specialists, Inc.. (Lyons, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Stay - filed by US Radiology Specialists, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ariann J-Hanna, Nicole Pyle.US Radiology Specialists, Inc. served on 11/9/2022, answer due 11/30/2022. (deLeeuw, Peter)
October 25, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against US Radiology Specialists, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3988201.) - filed by Ariann J-Hanna, Nicole Pyle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)
October 21, 2022 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J-Hanna et al v. US Radiology Specialists, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariann J-Hanna
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Pyle
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Radiology Specialists, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?