Delta Hill (Deta) v. Knott et al
Plaintiff: Delta Hill (Deta)
Defendant: Stephen Knott, William Ashe and ILA
Case Number: 1:2022cv01397
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #14 MOTION Cease and Desist filed by William Ashe, ILA, Stephen Knott.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/27/2022. (Geren, Lance)
December 16, 2022 Filing 16 Letter to The Department of Labor, from Delta Hill, regarding appeal of election held at Longshoremen's Hall. (mpb) Modified on 12/19/2022 (nms).
December 5, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Dismiss, #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Ashe, ILA, Stephen Knott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Geren, Lance)
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Cease and Desist - filed by Delta Hill (Deta). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L)(twk)
November 28, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and #10 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Delta Hill (Deta). Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/5/2022. (twk) Modified on 11/29/2022 (nms).
November 15, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by William Ashe, ILA, Stephen Knott.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Geren, Lance)
November 9, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nicholas M. Graziano for ILA and Stephen Knott added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
November 9, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John P. Sheridan for ILA and Stephen Knott added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
November 4, 2022 Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by William Ashe.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/18/2022. (Geren, Lance) Modified on 11/4/2022 (nms).
November 4, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by William Ashe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Geren, Lance) Modified on 11/4/2022 (nms).
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicholas M. Graziano, filed by ILA, Stephen Knott, #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John P. Sheridan, filed by ILA, Stephen Knott. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/3/2022. (nms)
November 2, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas M. Graziano (D.I. #4 ), by ILA, Stephen Knott.(Geren, Lance) Modified on 11/2/2022 (nms).
November 2, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John P. Sheridan (D.I. #3 ), by ILA, Stephen Knott. (Geren, Lance) Modified on 11/2/2022 (nms).
November 2, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
November 2, 2022 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to ILA and Stephen Knott re #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Upon review it was determined these filing do not comply with Local Rule 5.2(b)(1). Defendants are requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate certificate of service for the filings. (nms)
November 2, 2022 CORRECTING ENTRY: The certificates of service filed at D.I. 8 and D.I. 9 have been removed from the docket. The filings lacked proper case captions. Counsel for defendants is to refile the certificates accordingly. (nms)
November 1, 2022 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/15/2022. (nms)
November 1, 2022 Filing 7 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by ILA, Stephen Knott.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/15/2022. (Geren, Lance) Modified on 11/2/2022 (nms).
November 1, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by ILA, Stephen Knott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Geren, Lance) Modified on 11/2/2022 (nms).
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Delta Hill (Deta). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(mpb)
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicholas M. Graziano - filed by ILA, Stephen Knott. (Geren, Lance)
October 26, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John P. Sheridan - filed by ILA, Stephen Knott. (Geren, Lance)
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs)
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of the State of Delaware, Case Number N22M-09-037 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3990090)- filed by Stephen Knott, William Ashe, and ILA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs)
October 25, 2022 Remark: Docket Sheet Mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff. (srs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Hill (Deta) v. Knott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Hill (Deta)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Knott
Represented By: Lance M. Geren
Represented By: Nicholas M. Graziano
Represented By: John P. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ashe
Represented By: Lance M. Geren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILA
Represented By: Lance M. Geren
Represented By: John P. Sheridan
Represented By: Nicholas M. Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?