Lavignani et al v. Eagleburgmann Industries Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Calogero Lavignani and Anna Maria Rosa Distefano
Defendant: Eagleburgmann Industries Inc., Eagleburgmann Industries LP, Paramount Global, United States Steel Corporation, Burgmann Seals America, Inc., Elliott Company, Occidental Petroleum Corporation, ViacomCBS Inc., CBS Corporation, Viacom, Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, USX Corporation and Does 1-500 Inclusive
Case Number: 1:2022cv01444
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint - filed by Eagleburgmann Industries Inc., Eagleburgmann Industries LP. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Florax, Joelle)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/28/2022. (Polito, Rebecca)
December 22, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenan S. Rand, Jr. - filed by Eagleburgmann Industries Inc., Eagleburgmann Industries LP. (Attachments: #1 Certification)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Florax, Joelle)
December 22, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric F. Falk - filed by Eagleburgmann Industries Inc., Eagleburgmann Industries LP. (Attachments: #1 Certification)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Florax, Joelle)
December 22, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Eagleburgmann Industries Inc., Eagleburgmann Industries LP (Florax, Joelle)
December 21, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by United States Steel Corporation.(Skiles, Nicholas)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re #16 Suggestion of Death: A Notice of Suggestion of Death of Plaintiff Calogero Lavignani having been filed on December 20, 2022, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before March 20, 2023, decedent's successor or representative shall file a motion for substitution. FAILURE OF DECEDENT'S SUCCESSOR OR REPRESENTATIVE TO TIMELY FILE A MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION SHALL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THE CASE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 25(a). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/21/2022. (Polito, Rebecca)
December 20, 2022 Filing 16 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Calogero Lavignani by Calogero Lavignani, Anna Maria Rosa Distefano. (Bifferato, Ian)
December 12, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Occidental Petroleum Corporation to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to January 6, 2023 - filed by Occidental Petroleum Corporation. (Pedi, Nicole)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Occidental Petroleum Corporation to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to January 6, 2023. Reset Answer Deadlines: Occidental Petroleum Corporation answer due 1/6/2023. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/12/2022. (lih)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on January 31, 2023 at 10:00 AM. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than January 26, 2023. (3) Counsel are instructed to use Judge Fallon's form asbestos scheduling order posted at https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon for all events up to and including Status Conference and Judge Noreika's form non-patent scheduling order posted at https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/judge-maryellen-noreika for all events including and following Case Dispositive Motions and shall include a chart of the deadlines as an exhibit to the proposed Scheduling Order. Regardless of the number of Daubert motions and case dispositive issues raised by a moving party, the moving party shall file only one opening brief with briefing subject to the page limitations set forth in Local Rule 7.1.3(4), 20 pages for the opening and answering briefs and 10 pages for the reply. These requirements shall be included in the proposed Scheduling Order. (4) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/9/2022.
November 23, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to December 12, 2022 - filed by Occidental Petroleum Corporation. (Pedi, Nicole)
November 23, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Elliott Company (Costello, Kelly)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to December 12, 2022. Reset Answer Deadlines: Occidental Petroleum Corporation answer due 12/12/2022. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/23/2022. (lih)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for Paramount Global filed by Paramount Global. (Texter, Allison)
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Paramount Global.(Texter, Allison)
November 9, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
November 9, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 4, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calogero Lavignani, Anna Maria Rosa Distefano.United States Steel Corporation served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calogero Lavignani, Anna Maria Rosa Distefano.Paramount Global served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calogero Lavignani, Anna Maria Rosa Distefano.Occidental Petroleum Corporation served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calogero Lavignani, Anna Maria Rosa Distefano.Elliott Company served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calogero Lavignani, Anna Maria Rosa Distefano.Eagleburgmann Industries LP served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calogero Lavignani, Anna Maria Rosa Distefano.Eagleburgmann Industries Inc. served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Bifferato, Ian)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Eagleburgmann Industries Inc., Eagleburgman Industries LP, Elliot Company, Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Paramount Global, and United States Steel Corporation on 11/2/2022. (mkr)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr)
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY PRODUCT LIABILITY filed with Jury Demand against Does 1-500 Inclusive, Eagleburgmann Industries Inc., Eagleburgmann Industries LP, Elliott Company, Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Paramount Global, and United States Steel Corporation (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3997063.) - filed by Calogero Lavignani and Anna Maria Rosa Distefano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mkr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavignani et al v. Eagleburgmann Industries Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagleburgmann Industries Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagleburgmann Industries LP
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgmann Seals America, Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Pedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USX Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-500 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calogero Lavignani
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Maria Rosa Distefano
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?